Krauser v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leanna Krauser
Defendant: ; Outsource Receivables Management, Inc., Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, Capital One Bank (USA), National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion, LLC, Does 1 through 100 and Outsource Receivables Management, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00679
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Settlement Filed by Leanna Krauser. (Schumacher, Kyle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #16 . Equifax Information Services, LLC's Answer is due by 7/14/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
June 14, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, #1 . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #13 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
June 14, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nicholas Naum. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8116889 #13 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nicholas Naum. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8116889. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Naum, Nicholas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Outsource Receivables Management, Inc. served on 6/2/2021, answer due on 6/23/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due on 6/14/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to TransUnion, LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due on 6/14/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Capital One Bank (USA), National Association waiver sent on 6/2/2021. Filed by Leanna Krauser. (Schumacher, Kyle)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Outsource Receivables Management, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/2/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/4/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/4/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 5/4/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8068532 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Leanna Krauser against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krauser v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ; Outsource Receivables Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Represented By: Nicholas Naum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outsource Receivables Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanna Krauser
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?