Bell-Alanis et al v. J.H. Baxter & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Matthews, Erin Neel, Tiffany Bell-Alanis and Sarah Pedersen
Defendant: Jeanne Olson, J.H. Baxter & Co. and J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00885
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 Motion to Appoint Interim Lead Plaintiffs and Interim Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Christopher Nidel, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Lisa Arkin, #3 Exhibit 3 Class Action Notice Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 Hart Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 Class Member Release, #6 Exhibit 6 Notice of Class Action Settlement, #7 Exhibit 7 Ross Settlement Agreement) (O'Leary, Leslie)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 Response to Motion to Consolidate #12 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie)
August 9, 2021 Filing 15 Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Miles Hart, Elizabeth Tanenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Kahl, Nicholas)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate #12 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Miles Hart, Elizabeth Tanenbaum. (Kahl, Nicholas)
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jonathan B Nace. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8185870. Filed by Tiffany Bell-Alanis, Sharon Matthews, Erin Neel, Sarah Pedersen. (Nace, Jonathan)
August 9, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jonathan B Nace. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8185870 #13 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to Consolidate . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 . Answer is due by 7/26/2021. (jk)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 requested by attorney Jonathan Weissglass. (jk)
July 7, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jonathan Weissglass. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8144367 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jonathan Weissglass. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8144367. Filed by Tiffany Bell-Alanis, Sharon Matthews, Erin Neel, Sarah Pedersen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Federal Court Admissions) (Weissglass, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 . Answer is due by 7/19/2021. (jk)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Ramfjord, Per)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order signed on 6/14/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc.. (Ramfjord, Per)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/12/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 11/8/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by J.H. Baxter & Co.. (Ramfjord, Per)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV19874 from Oregon Circuit Court, Lane County. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8118181 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Jeanne Olson, J.H. Baxter & Co., J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ramfjord, Per)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell-Alanis et al v. J.H. Baxter & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Matthews
Represented By: Derek C. Johnson
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Represented By: Jonathan B Nace
Represented By: Jonathan Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Neel
Represented By: Derek C. Johnson
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Represented By: Jonathan B Nace
Represented By: Jonathan Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Bell-Alanis
Represented By: Derek C. Johnson
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Represented By: Jonathan B Nace
Represented By: Jonathan Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Pedersen
Represented By: Derek C. Johnson
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Represented By: Jonathan B Nace
Represented By: Jonathan Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Olson
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. Baxter & Co.
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?