Amador v. Desert Fire LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chantelle Armador and Chantelle Amador
Defendant: Desert Fire LLC doing business as Silver Dollar Club, Damon Shrader, Desert Fire LLC an Oregon Limited Liability Company doing business as Silver Dollar Club and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 6:2021cv01166
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 11/30/2021 at 09:30AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by e-mail the day before the hearing. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the Court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. All deadlines are VACATED and will be reset at the Rule 16 Conference. The parties and counsel are encouraged to advise the Court of their pronouns. People appearing before this Court may do so in writing and when appearing for conferences, hearings or trials. Attorneys are encouraged to identify their pronouns in their signature lines when submitting documents for filing. All parties and counsel are instructed to address each other in all written documents and court proceedings by those pronouns previously identified. (jk)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Desert Fire LLC. (Kuchulis, Anthony)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Desert Fire LLC, Does 1 through 10, Damon Shrader. (Kuchulis, Anthony)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 requested by attorney John P. Kristensen. (jk)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Chantelle Amador. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Marshall, S.)
August 17, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney John P. Kristensen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8195171 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney John P. Kristensen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8195171. Filed by Chantelle Amador. (Kristensen, John)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Damon Shrader served on 8/15/2021, answer due on 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service, #2 Certificate of Service) (Marshall, S.)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Desert Fire LLC served on 8/15/2021, answer due on 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service, #2 Certificate of Service) (Marshall, S.)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order signed on 8/10/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Desert Fire LLC, Damon Shrader. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Damon Shrader) (jw)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/7/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/7/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8185879 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Chantelle Armador against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Marshall, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amador v. Desert Fire LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantelle Armador
Represented By: S. Amanda Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantelle Amador
Represented By: S. Amanda Marshall
Represented By: John P. Kristensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Fire LLC doing business as Silver Dollar Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Shrader
Represented By: Anthony D. Kuchulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Fire LLC an Oregon Limited Liability Company doing business as Silver Dollar Club
Represented By: Anthony D. Kuchulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Represented By: Anthony D. Kuchulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?