Cascadia Wildlands et al v. David Warnack et al
Plaintiff: Cascadia Wildlands, Oregon Wild and Willamette Riverkeeper
Defendant: David Warnack and United States Forest Service
Case Number: 6:2021cv01227
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 5 U.S.C. ยง 706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 25 Declaration of Rebecca White . Filed by Cascadia Wildlands, Oregon Wild, Willamette Riverkeeper. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(11 in 6:21-cv-01227-MC).)Associated Cases: 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 6:21-cv-01228-MC (Darzen, Meriel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 24 Second Declaration of Oliver J.H. Stiefel . Filed by Cascadia Wildlands, Oregon Wild, Willamette Riverkeeper. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(11 in 6:21-cv-01227-MC).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 15, #2 Exhibit Ex. 16, #3 Exhibit Ex 17, #4 Exhibit Ex. 18, #5 Exhibit Ex. 19, #6 Exhibit Ex. 20)Associated Cases: 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 6:21-cv-01228-MC (Darzen, Meriel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 23 Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support(11 in 6:21-cv-01227-MC) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Cascadia Wildlands, Oregon Wild, Willamette Riverkeeper.Associated Cases: 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 6:21-cv-01228-MC (Darzen, Meriel)
October 14, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaints. Filed by All Defendants.Associated Cases: 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 6:21-cv-01228-MC (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
October 14, 2021 Filing 21 Third Declaration of Andy Stahl in Support of Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Forest Service Employees for Environmental Ethics. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (14 in 6:21-cv-01228-MC).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A CE AR Part A, #2 Exhibit B CE AR Part B, #3 Exhibit C Road sign)Associated Cases: 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 6:21-cv-01228-MC (Bechtold, Timothy)
October 14, 2021 Filing 20 Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support(14 in 6:21-cv-01228-MC) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Forest Service Employees for Environmental Ethics.Associated Cases: 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 6:21-cv-01228-MC (Bechtold, Timothy)
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support(11 in 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 11 in 6:21-cv-01227-MC), Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support(14 in 6:21-cv-01228-MC, 14 in 6:21-cv-01228-MC). Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Gustavson Decl., #2 Warnack Decl.)Associated Cases: 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 6:21-cv-01228-MC (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction(11 in 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 11 in 6:21-cv-01227-MC). Response is due by 10/8/2021. Reply is due by 10/15/2021. Oral Argument is set for 10/27/2021 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 2 before Judge Michael J. McShane. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane.Associated Cases: 6:21-cv-01227-MC, 6:21-cv-01228-MC (cp)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Motion to Consolidate #9 with Forest Serv. Employees for Envtl. Ethics v. Warnack, USDC No. 6:21-cv-01228-MC. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 Declaration of Oliver Stiefel . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14) (Stiefel, Oliver)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 Declaration of Travis Williams . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 .) (Stiefel, Oliver)
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 Declaration of Chandra LeGue . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 .) (Stiefel, Oliver)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 Declaration of Samantha Krop . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 .) (Stiefel, Oliver)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Bethany Cotton . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 .) (Stiefel, Oliver)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stiefel, Oliver)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stiefel, Oliver)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases. Filed by David Warnack, United States Forest Service. (Carpenter, Hayley)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Hayley A. Carpenter appearing on behalf of David Warnack, United States Forest Service. Filed by David Warnack, United States Forest Service. (Carpenter, Hayley)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Krystal-Rose Perez appearing on behalf of David Warnack, United States Forest Service. Filed by David Warnack, United States Forest Service. (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stiefel, Oliver)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Forest Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stiefel, Oliver)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to David Warnack. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/16/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/18/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/18/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8198122 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cascadia Wildlands, Willamette Riverkeeper, Oregon Wild against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Stiefel, Oliver)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascadia Wildlands et al v. David Warnack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascadia Wildlands
Represented By: Meriel L. Darzen
Represented By: Oliver J. Stiefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Wild
Represented By: Meriel L. Darzen
Represented By: Oliver J. Stiefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willamette Riverkeeper
Represented By: Meriel L. Darzen
Represented By: Oliver J. Stiefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Warnack
Represented By: Hayley A. Carpenter
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Hayley A. Carpenter
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?