Thompson v. Inman
Plaintiff: Randy Mr. Thompson
Defendant: Walker Patterson Inman, III
Case Number: 6:2021cv01231
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Request for Relief. Filed by Randy Mr. Thompson. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #11 .) (Attachments: #1 Attachment.) (bd)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order on motion to remand, Order on Motion for Imposition of Sanctions, Order on Motion to Supplement, Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply, Order on Motion - Miscellaneous 13 sent to Walker Patterson Inman, III on 09/28/2021 returned as undeliverable. (bd)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Defendant's motion to withdraw as counsel #11 is GRANTED. The Court will hold Plaintiff's pending motion to remand #6 and motion to supplement #8 in abeyance for 90 days while Defendant secures new counsel. Defendant's motion for an extension of time to file a response to Plaintiff's motion to remand #9 is denied as MOOT. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/28/2021.) (jk)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Ryan S. Gibson in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Filed by Walker Patterson Inman, III. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #11 .) (Gibson, Ryan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Filed by Walker Patterson Inman, III. (Gibson, Ryan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration of Ryan S. Gibson in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. Filed by Walker Patterson Inman, III. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion #9 .) (Gibson, Ryan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Remand to State CourtMotion for Imposition of Sanctions #6 . Filed by Walker Patterson Inman, III. (Gibson, Ryan)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Defendant's motion for a protective order #4 is GRANTED and discovery in this case is STAYED pending further order from the Court. Defendant is instructed to file any responsive pleading to the Complaint concurrent with its response to Plaintiff's motion to remand #6 . (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/15/2021.) (jk)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to Supplement (Titled "Rule 15 Motion to Supplement Case Records on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 28 U.S. Code 1447 and Response to Defendants Notice of Removal and Rule 11 Sanctions"). Filed by Randy Mr. Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9.) (bd)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Remand to State Court, Motion for Imposition of Sanctions (Titled "Motion to Remand 28 U.S. Code 1447 and Response to Defendants Notice of Removal and Rule 11 Sanctions"). Filed by Randy Mr. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8.) (bd)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 Declaration of Ryan Gibson in Support of Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Walker Patterson Inman, III. (Related document(s): Motion for Protective Order #4 .) (Gibson, Ryan)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Walker Patterson Inman, III. (Gibson, Ryan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order signed on 8/20/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/20/2021.) (jk)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/17/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/18/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/18/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 08/19/2021.) (bd)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV15496 from Lincoln County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8200719 issued.. Filed by Walker Patterson Inman, III (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Gibson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Mr. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Patterson Inman, III
Represented By: Ryan S. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?