Good Clean Love, Inc. et al v. Epoch NE Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Good Clean Love, Inc. and Vaginal Biome Science, Inc.
Defendant: Epoch NE Corporation and Lawrence Luo
Case Number: 6:2021cv01294
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #6 upon Lawrence Luo served on 9/30/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mina, Gregory)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Epoch NE Corporation served on 9/28/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mina, Gregory)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (bd)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lawrence Luo. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Epoch NE Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/30/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/31/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/31/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 9/1/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Good Clean Love, Inc., Vaginal Biome Science, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. for Trademark Infringement, Trade Dress Infringement, Conversion, Unfair Competition, Unfair Trade Practices, Breach of Contract, Tortious Interference with Contract Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8215144 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 6024806--3/31/2020--Good Clean Love, Inc., 5517668--7/17/2018--Good Clean Love, Inc., 5817530--7/30/2019--Vaginal Biome Science, Inc.. Filed by Good Clean Love, Inc., Vaginal Biome Science, Inc. against Epoch NE Corporation, Lawrence Luo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Epoch NE Corporation, #4 Proposed Summons Lawrence Luo). (Rothauge, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Good Clean Love, Inc. et al v. Epoch NE Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Clean Love, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Julia E. Markley
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaginal Biome Science, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Julia E. Markley
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epoch NE Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?