Goade v. Bowtech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Daniel Goade
Defendant: Bowtech, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01600
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 32 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Bowtech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Stipulated Protected Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Proposed ESI Order) (Annis, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 31 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand. . Filed by Bowtech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Annis, Michael)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #27 admission requested by attorney Brendan G McDermott. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected;. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #26 admission requested by attorney Michael R. Annis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected;. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
November 15, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held. Joint Status Report is due by 12/15/2021. Ralph Krisher present as counsel for plaintiff. Michael R. Annis and Todd Johnston present as counsel for defendant. Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. (cp)
November 15, 2021 Filing 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brendan G McDermott. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8306726. Filed by Bowtech, Inc.. (McDermott, Brendan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael R. Annis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8305940. Filed by Bowtech, Inc.. (Annis, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael R. Annis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8305940 #26 . Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brendan G McDermott. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8306726 #27 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
November 8, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Michael K. Alston and Michael R. Annis, counsel for defendant regarding Scheduling Order 24 . (cp)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Rule 16 Conference is set for 11/15/2021 at 09:45AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The Court will provide the parties with the conference call-in number by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
November 3, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (eo) (NEF regenerated to counsel in sending district.)
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of Middle District of Tennessee. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon or were previously admitted pro hac vice in a specific case. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer (#21 ). (eo)
November 3, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-00330. Electronic file received.
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Bowtech's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under FRCP 12(b)(3), or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) (Doc. No. #8 ) is hereby GRANTED, and this case hereby TRANSFERRED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon, Eugene Division. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/3/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY filed by Bowtech, Inc. re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Bowtech, Inc., #18 Response to Motion, filed by Joseph Daniel Goade, #9 Memorandum in Support filed by Bowtech, Inc.. (Annis, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Joseph Daniel Goade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bowtech 2016 Dealer Policy Manual, #2 Exhibit Bowtech Dealers from Bowtech Website)(Krisher, Ralph) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer #8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for June 28, 2021 is CONTINUED, to be reset following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/21/2021. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bowtech, Inc. re #10 Business Entity Disclosure Statement (Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bowtech, Inc. re #9 Memorandum in Support (Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bowtech, Inc. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer (Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bowtech, Inc. re #7 MOTION for attorney Michael R. Annis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3388994) (Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bowtech, Inc. re #6 Notice of Appearance (Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 20, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael K. Alston admitted to this court. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 20, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 , #8 , #9 and 108]: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) Modified on 6/20/2021 (kc). Modified on 6/20/2021 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 20, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Michael R. Annis to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/14/2021. (lh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 11, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael K. Alston admitted to this court. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 11, 2021 MO State Bar status verified as active for Michael R. Annis not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bowtech, Inc.. (Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Bowtech, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration)(Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer by Bowtech, Inc.. (Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Michael R. Annis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3388994) by Bowtech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Alston on behalf of Bowtech, Inc. (Alston, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Bowtech, Inc. (Service packet returned to counsel.) (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/28/2021 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
April 26, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
April 26, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ralph Krisher admitted to this court. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bowtech, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503358766), filed by Joseph Daniel Goade. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goade v. Bowtech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Daniel Goade
Represented By: Ralph Krisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowtech, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Alston
Represented By: Michael R. Annis
Represented By: Todd R. Johnston
Represented By: Brendan G McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?