Smith v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Steven Smith
Defendant: United States of America and U.S. Department of Transportation
Case Number: 6:2022cv00732
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by United States of America. (Feldman, Sarah)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #9 . Answer is due by 8/1/2022. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 6/23/2022.) (jk)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Count Two of Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Feldman, Sarah)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Sarah Feldman appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by U.S. Department of Transportation, United States of America. (Feldman, Sarah)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Sarah Feldman appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by U.S. Department of Transportation, United States of America. (Feldman, Sarah)
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Original Summons deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 05/25/2022.) (bd)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Department of Transportation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Original Summons deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 05/25/2022.) (bd)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/22/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/24/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 10/24/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 05/25/2022.) (bd)
May 25, 2022 Filing Fee in amount of $402.00 collected; Receipt No. 14289 issued. (et)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order signed on 5/23/2022 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/23/2022.) (jk)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 05/20/2022.) (bd)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Steven Smith against U.S. Department of Transportation, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Proposed Summons U.S. Department of Transportation, #19 Proposed Summons United States of America.) (bd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Transportation
Represented By: Sarah Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?