United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America et al v. Harms
Plaintiff: United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America and Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters
Defendant: Jeff Harms
Case Number: 6:2022cv01477
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 501 Fiduciary responsibility of officers of labor organizations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Filing 17 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #11 . Filed by Jeff Harms. (Lewinter, Andrew)
November 7, 2022 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #11 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America. (Shanley, Daniel)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 3, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Laura Bradley-Hufford. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8710094 #14 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
November 2, 2022 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Laura Bradley-Hufford. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8710094. Filed by Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America. (Bradley-Hufford, Laura)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss #11 . Response is due by 11/7/2022. Motion is taken under advisement as of 11/28/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #11 . Filed by Jeff Harms. (Lewinter, Andrew)
October 18, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Filed by Jeff Harms. (Lewinter, Andrew)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Marcelle Obeid. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8675738. Filed by Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America. (Obeid, Marcelle)
October 4, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Marcelle Obeid. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8675738 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 3, 2022 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel M. Shanley. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8674638. Filed by Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America. (Shanley, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeff Harms. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 10/3/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/31/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/2/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 3/2/2023. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
October 3, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel M. Shanley. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8674638 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America. (Malmsheimer, Matthew)
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America. (Malmsheimer, Matthew)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8673729 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America, Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters against Jeff Harms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Malmsheimer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America et al v. Harms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America
Represented By: Matthew E. Malmsheimer
Represented By: Laura Bradley-Hufford
Represented By: Marcelle Obeid
Represented By: Daniel M. Shanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Matthew E. Malmsheimer
Represented By: Daniel M. Shanley
Represented By: Laura Bradley-Hufford
Represented By: Marcelle Obeid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Harms
Represented By: Andrew S. Lewinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?