Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH v. Young
Plaintiff: Dassault Systmes Deutschland GmbH and Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH
Defendant: Nelson Young
Case Number: 6:2023cv00220
Filed: February 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2023 Filing 16 Satisfaction re Consent Judgment, Permanent Injunction #14 by Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH. Filed by Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH. (Bailey, Elizabeth)
March 29, 2023 Filing 15 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (jk)
March 29, 2023 Filing 14 Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction signed on 3/29/2023 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING the parties' Stipulated Motion for Entry of Final Judgment by Consent and Permanent Injunction #11 . (jk)
March 23, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #11 Stipulation. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect event was used for the entry. The following corrections were made to the record: The entry and docket text have been corrected. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (jk)
March 22, 2023 Filing 11 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Final Judgment by Consent and Permanent Injunction by Nelson Young. Filed by Nelson Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on consent judgment) (Edmondson, Joseph) Modified to correct event type and docket text on 3/23/2023 (jk).
February 23, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH. (Chernoff, Michael)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice requested by attorney Michael Aaron Chernoff #7 , and Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice requested by attorney Glenn E. Forbis #8 . (jk)
February 17, 2023 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Glenn E. Forbis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8826477. Filed by Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH. (Forbis, Glenn)
February 17, 2023 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael Aaron Chernoff. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8826464. Filed by Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH. (Chernoff, Michael)
February 17, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael Aaron Chernoff. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8826464 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
February 17, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Glenn E. Forbis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8826477 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding #2 Order. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The name of the plaintiff was misspelled in the case caption. The following corrections were made to the record: The PDF has been replaced. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
February 15, 2023 Filing 5 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (bd)
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nelson Young. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/15/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/17/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 7/17/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Management Order signed on 2/15/2023 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/16/2023) (cw).
February 14, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8821922 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: TX 0008876682--CST Studio Suite 2018--Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH, TX0008889171--CST Studio Suite 2020--Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH. Filed by Dassault Systmes Deutschland GmbH against Nelson Young (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2). (Anderson-Dana, Lydia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dassault Systmes Deutschland GmbH
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Bailey
Represented By: Lydia Anderson-Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dassault Systemes Deutschland GmbH
Represented By: Lydia Anderson-Dana
Represented By: Michael Aaron Chernoff
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Bailey
Represented By: Glenn E. Forbis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Young
Represented By: Joseph Curtis Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?