Cavan et al v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marie Elaine Cavan and Donald Cavan
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 6:2023cv00768
Filed: May 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance of Marilyn A. Heiken appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs . Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Heiken, Marilyn)
June 15, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Defendants. (Baehr, Jordan)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #20 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
June 7, 2023 Filing 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Harley Ratliff. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8967526. Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Ratliff, Harley)
June 7, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Harley Ratliff. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8967526 #20 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #17 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 31, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Related Actions Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Estok, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Filing 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jordan Carmichael Baehr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8958320. Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Baehr, Jordan)
May 31, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jordan Carmichael Baehr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8958320 #17 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 26, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Estok, Michael)
May 26, 2023 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Connor Jay Sears. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8954337. Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Sears, Connor)
May 26, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of Michael J. Estok appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Estok, Michael)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 5/26/2023 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 26, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Connor Jay Sears. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8954337 #14 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
May 25, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (eo)
May 25, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the Eastern District of Louisiana. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website.. (eo)
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-17209. Electronic file received.
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Oregon. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/12/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 15836)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Filing 7 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. General (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71, #72 72, #73 73, #74 74, #75 75, #76 76, #77 77, #78 78, #79 79, #80 80, #81 81, #82 82, #83 83, #84 84, #85 85, #86 86, #87 87, #88 88, #89 89, #90 90, #91 91, #92 92, #93 93, #94 94, #95 95, #96 96, #97 97, #98 98, #99 99, #100 100, #101 101, #102 102, #103 103, #104 104, #105 105, #106 106, #107 107, #108 108, #109 109, #110 110, #111 111, #112 112, #113 113, #114 114, #115 115, #116 116)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6539304) filed by Marie Elaine Cavan, Donald Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Donald Cavan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Marie Elaine Cavan(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/25/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavan et al v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Connor Sears
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L. Byard
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Jordan Carmichael Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Adrienne L. Byard
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Connor Sears
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Jordan Carmichael Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Connor Sears
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L. Byard
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Represented By: Jordan Carmichael Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Elaine Cavan
Represented By: Gibbs C. Henderson
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Erin M. Wood
Represented By: Marilyn A. Heiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cavan
Represented By: Gibbs C. Henderson
Represented By: Erin M. Wood
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Marilyn A. Heiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?