Cheney v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Cheney
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 6:2023cv01576
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Referring Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Scheduling Order: Status Conference is reset from 1/9/2024 to 1/17/2024 at 11:00AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/19/2023 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 19, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (eo)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #18 . Christopher J. Kaufman on behalf of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
December 11, 2023 Filing 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Christopher J Kaufman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9190922. Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Kaufman, Christopher)
December 11, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Christopher J Kaufman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9190922 #18 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Scheduling Order. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/9/2024 at 10:00AM in Medford by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Teleconference information to be provided in a separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Estok, Michael)
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance of Michael J. Estok appearing on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Filed by on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Estok, Michael)
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (cw)
October 26, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the Eastern District of Louisiana. Our records indicate that you are not generally admitted to practice in the District of Oregon or are only admitted pro hac vice. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. (eo)
October 26, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (eo)
October 26, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-03698. Electronic file received.
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Oregon. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC. 16511)(my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. JOINT DESIGNATION OF GENERAL AND CASE-SPECIFIC MDL RECORDS TO BE INCLUDED UPON REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ratliff, Harley) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc. (tm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
May 18, 2017 Filing 6 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT by Linda Cheney. Party Sanofi US Services Inc. added. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bowersox, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/19/2017) (tm). Modified on 5/19/2017 (tm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Short Form Complaint, Cover Sheet, and Summons. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then select Print and PDF Printer. Clerk took corrective action. (tm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6094346) filed by Linda Cheney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Aventis Pharm SA, #3 Summons Sanofi SA, #4 Summons Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC)Attorney Jeffrey A. Bowersox added to party Linda Cheney(pty:pla).(Bowersox, Jeffrey) (Main Document 1 and Attachment 1-4 replaced on 4/21/2017, because filing attorney did not properly format pdf) Modified text on 4/21/2017 (tm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/26/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheney v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cheney
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bowersox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?