M.R. v. Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics
Plaintiff: M. R.
Defendant: Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics
Case Number: 6:2023cv01691
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #19 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 12, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Russell L. Taylor. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9232893 #19 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
January 11, 2024 Filing 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Russell L. Taylor. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9232893. Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Taylor, Russell)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #17 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Glen L Abramson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9230509. Filed by M. R.. (Abramson, Glen)
January 11, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Glen L Abramson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9230509 #17 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Gary M. Klinger. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9227543. Filed by M. R.. (Klinger, Gary)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #12 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #13 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 9, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tammy Beth Webb. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9225861 #13 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
January 9, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Gary M. Klinger. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9227543 #15 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
January 9, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Naoki Kaneko. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9225844 #12 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tammy Beth Webb. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9225861. Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Webb, Tammy)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Naoki Kaneko. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9225844. Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Kaneko, Naoki) Modified on 1/9/2024 to correct name of attorney requesting admission. NEF regenerated. (jw)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Bauer, Keith)
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 Request For Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Salem Health's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Bauer, Keith)
January 8, 2024 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Bauer, Keith)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 . Answer is due by 1/8/2024. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Bauer, Keith)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 Proof of Service Return of Service Executed as to Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics served on 11/17/2023, answer due on 12/8/2023. (DeJong, Timothy)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 11/16/2023 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Judge Ann L. Aiken and transferred to the Eugene Division. (cw)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/15/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/15/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 4/15/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9155100 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by M. R. against Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (DeJong, Timothy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/16/2023, with a flattened civil cover sheet) (cw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.R. v. Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. R.
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Glen L Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics
Represented By: Keith J. Bauer
Represented By: Naoki Stephen Kaneko
Represented By: Russell L. Taylor
Represented By: Tammy Beth Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?