Salem N LLC v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Salem N LLC D.B.A. Nissan of Salem and Salem N LLC doing business as Nissan of Salem
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv00216
Filed: February 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #18 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 4/29/2024. (jk)
March 26, 2024 Filing 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings. Filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Kelso, Steven) Modified on 3/27/2024 to correct event type. NEF not regenerated. (bd)
March 8, 2024 Filing 17 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service Summons and Complaint Filed by Salem N LLC. (Isaak, Misha)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Scheduling Order: The Oral Argument set for 3/15/2024 at 09:00AM is VACATED. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting #14 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 27, 2024 Filing 14 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Notice of Extension of Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 . Filed by Salem N LLC. (Isaak, Misha)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings #12 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 3/29/2024. (jk)
February 22, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings. Filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Kelso, Steven) Modified to correct event type only on 2/23/2024 (NEF not regenerated) (jk).
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Scheduling Order regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 . Response is due by 2/27/2024. Reply is due by 3/12/2024. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 . Oral Argument is set for 3/15/2024 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 1 before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Motion is taken under advisement as of 3/15/2024. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 is referred to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jk)
February 9, 2024 Filing 8 Declaration of Misha Isaak . Filed by Salem N LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Misha Isaak) (Isaak, Misha)
February 9, 2024 Filing 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Salem N LLC. (Isaak, Misha)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 requested by attorney Steven Matthew Kelso. (jk)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order signed on 2/5/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
February 5, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Steven Matthew Kelso. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9262929 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/3/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/1/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 7/1/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
February 2, 2024 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Steven Matthew Kelso. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9262929. Filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Kelso, Steven)
February 1, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Starr, Adam)
February 1, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 24CV04361 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9261220 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Starr, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salem N LLC v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salem N LLC D.B.A. Nissan of Salem
Represented By: Misha Isaak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salem N LLC doing business as Nissan of Salem
Represented By: Misha Isaak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Adam M. Starr
Represented By: Steven Matthew Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?