STAMM-NORTHUP v. DUGGAR Featured Case

Plaintiff: ASHLEY STAMM-NORTHUP
Defendant: JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR
Case Number: 2:2015cv06776
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: MARK A. KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2016 25 Featured Case ORDER THE THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED UNDER AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES AND FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL AND ALL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/5/16. 2/5/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 5, 2016 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ASHLEY STAMM-NORTHUP. (FRUMER, MARC)
February 1, 2016 23 MOTION to Withdraw Complaint Without Prejudice filed by ASHLEY STAMM-NORTHUP.Certificate of Service.(FRUMER, MARC)
January 27, 2016 22 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jl, )
January 26, 2016 21 Plaintiff's Stipulation of Undisputed Facts by ASHLEY STAMM-NORTHUP. (FRUMER, MARC) Modified on 1/27/2016 (fb).
January 22, 2016 20 Featured Case ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/31/16 AT 9:30 AM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 1/22/16. 1/25/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 21, 2016 19 Featured Case ORDER THAT ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/28/16. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEFFLEY FOR ALL SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 4/8/16. NO LATER THAN 5/3/16, EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 5/6/16. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/20/16 AT 4:30 PM IN COURTROOM 5-D. COUNSEL IS ATTACHED FOR JURY SELECTION FOLLOWED BY A 3 DAY TRIAL ON 5/25/16 AT 9:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/21/16. 1/22/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 21, 2016 18 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE REQUEST FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A PRIVATE STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/21/16. 1/22/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 21, 2016 17 Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/21/16 before Judge Kearney. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
January 19, 2016 16 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 14 Order on Motion to Compel, 15 Discovery Plan Pursuant to LR 26.1(f) by JEFFREY A. CONRAD on behalf of JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR(CONRAD, JEFFREY)
January 19, 2016 15 Discovery Plan by JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR.(CONRAD, JEFFREY)
January 19, 2016 14 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL DISCLOSURES IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/19/16. 1/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 19, 2016 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support Venue by ASHLEY STAMM-NORTHUP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (FRUMER, MARC)
January 19, 2016 12 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Re Jurisdiction / Notice of Removal by JEFFREY A. CONRAD on behalf of JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR(CONRAD, JEFFREY)
January 19, 2016 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Notice of Removal by Defendant by JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR. (CONRAD, JEFFREY)
January 18, 2016 10 Second MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CONRAD, JEFFREY)
January 11, 2016 9 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND MINDFUL OF FRCP 11, EACH COUNSEL AND PARTY SHALL SIGN AND FILE A SWORN CERTIFICATION ON OR BEFORE 1/19/16 SPECIFICALLY IDENTIFYING THEIR GOOD FAITH FACTUAL BASIS FOR VENUE IN THIS DISTRICT UNDER 28 USC 1391(b)(2) DEMOSTRATING A SUBSTANTIAL PART OF THE EVENTS GIVING RISE TO THE CLAIM OCCURRED IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/11/16. 1/11/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 8, 2016 8 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/8/16. 1/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 8, 2016 6 First MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(CONRAD, JEFFREY)
January 7, 2016 7 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE COURT'S 12/28/15 ORDER IS AMENDED TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE HER RULE 26 DISCLOSURES ON OR BEFORE 1/15/16. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A MEMORANDUM CONCERNING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ON OR BEFORE 1/19/16 AND THE PARTIES WILL ADDRESS PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/6/16. 1/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 7, 2016 5 Defendant Duggar's ANSWER to Complaint with Cert of Service, Verification by JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR.(CONRAD, JEFFREY)
January 6, 2016 4 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IS DENIED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWSER THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/20/16. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/6/16. 1/6/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 30, 2015 3 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR.Memorandum, certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CONRAD, JEFFREY)
December 28, 2015 2 Featured Case ORDER THAT INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/21/2016 02:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/28/15. 12/28/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
December 23, 2015 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR. (jwl, )
December 23, 2015 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR from Comon Pleas Philadelphia, case number 1511035393. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 132764) (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Track Form, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Designation Form)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STAMM-NORTHUP v. DUGGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY STAMM-NORTHUP
Represented By: MARC J. FRUMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA JAMES DUGGAR
Represented By: JEFFREY A. CONRAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?