UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ex rel. YOASH GOHIL v. AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ex rel. YOASH GOHIL
Defendant: AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC., AVENTIS, INC. and JOHN DOES #1-50
Case Number: 2:2002cv02964
Filed: May 17, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MEMORANDUM re: 394 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/12/20. 11/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 REDACTED MEMORANDUM 415 RE: EXPLANATION OF 373 ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 7/21/20. 7/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, )
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER RE: MEMORANDUM 391 ; denying 379 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/16/20. 4/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, )
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MEMORANDUM RE: 379 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/16/20. 4/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, )
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 183 , THE RELATOR'S RESPONSE THERETO 185 , AND THE DEFENDANTS' REPLY 186 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/9/17. 1/10/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS, DOC NO. 91 , IS GRANTED IN PART; COUNTS III AND IV ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; THE MOTION IS OTHERWISE DENIED; AND RELATOR HAS LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/30/15. 3/31/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ex rel. YOASH GOHIL v. AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ex rel. YOASH GOHIL
Represented By: SUSAN DEIN BRICKLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM R. CRUSE
Represented By: NICHOLAS CARL HARBIST
Represented By: DAVID C. KISTLER
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: CARL D. POPLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: ELLEN C. BROTMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL B. HAYES
Represented By: JENNIFER L. HERBST
Represented By: MICHAEL L. KOON
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCCULLY
Represented By: RICHARD L. SCHEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL B. HAYES
Represented By: JENNIFER L. HERBST
Represented By: MICHAEL L. KOON
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCCULLY
Represented By: RICHARD L. SCHEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL B. HAYES
Represented By: JENNIFER L. HERBST
Represented By: MICHAEL L. KOON
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCCULLY
Represented By: RICHARD L. SCHEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?