REGIONAL EMPLOYERS' ASSURANCE LEAGUES VOLUNTARY EMPLOYEES' BENEFICIARY ASSOCIATION TRUST v. CASTELLANO et al

Case Number: 2:2003cv06903
Filed: December 29, 2003
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: C. DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: HENRY S. PERKIN
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2016 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT COUNTERCLAIMANT'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/10/2016. 2/11/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 25, 2015 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. COUNTERCLAIMANT CASTELLANO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE DECLARATORY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNTERCLAIMANT CASTELLANO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY J UDGMENT FOR RELIEF UNDER 502(a)(1)(B) OF ERISA IS GRANTED. CASTELLANO IS HEREBY AWARDED BENEFITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $750,000.00. IT IS ALSO ORDERED THAT COUNTERCLAIMANT MOTION TO AMEND THE COUNTERCLAIM IS GRANTED. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS, CASTELLANO 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE EQUITABLE ERISA CLAIM IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND THE MOTION IS DENIED WITH PREJUDICE WITH RESPECT TO THE COMMON LAW COUNTERCLAIMS AND THE CIVIL RICO CLAIMS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/24/2015. 8/25/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 18, 2013 334 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/17/2013. 9/18/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REGIONAL EMPLOYERS' ASSURANCE LEAGUES VOLUNTARY EMPLOYEES' BENEFICIARY ASSOCIATION TRUST v. CASTELLANO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?