BROOM et al v. HOGAN et al
Plaintiff: GLADYS MEDRANO, ROBIN HOSEY, DONNA HORTON, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, MELINDA BROWN, JOHN NMI DAVIS, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, BETTY K. WILSON, WANDA JONES LEE, STEPHANIE SURRETT, CHARLOTTE HENSON, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, WANDA DILL JACKSON, NANCY HUGHES, KENNETH KING, LURA EDNEY, KAREN PROSSER, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, IRENNER JOHNSON, MARY FRANKS, MARGIE BROOM, JAMES FULLER, GAYLIA THORPE, LATESIA DAVIS, PATRICIA ROGERS, BLANCHE SANDERS, MARJORIE STUDDARD, HENRY PERNELL, DIAHANNA PERKINS, BETTY TODD, SONJA MCCASKILL, LECRETIA BLACKMON, MARGARET GIBSON and NORMA HUNT
Defendant: JIM C. BARRETT, SHERIFF GLEN WARREN, SARA B. SCHRADER, M.D. ROBERT MCKINNEY, DR. HAYWOOD, TODD FULCHER, GARY REYNOLDS, STEPHAN FARRELL, FOREST BRATLEY, DR. HEARTLAND, SUSAN BODNEY, ERNEST (DECEASED) REEVES, DR. LUNFORD, INDEVUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DIANE FERGUSON, FRANK WADE, DENNIS ADAMS, HOWARD CLARK 1, FREEDMAN LOTT, ROBERT F. COOPER, WYETH, CHARLES CESARE, HOWARD CLARK, CHARLES TYLER, CHARLES BEAR, G. A. TUBB, DR. MILLER, KELVIN SHERMAN, MARCUS HOGAN, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, RAYMOND LOTT, WILLIAM TRULY, STEVEN HIMMELSTIEN, TONY HUNT, JOSEPH ROBERTS, R. F. COOPER, JIM C. BARNETT, "JOHN DOE SALES REPRESENTATIVE DEFENDANTS 1-25", KAREN MULLEN, C. K. WHITE, P. F. HOOPER and JOHN RUSSELL BARNES
Case Number: 2:2003cv20587
Filed: December 18, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2009 Filing 39 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8070 THAT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 41.1(b) AND THE AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL THE ACTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A AND B ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO ALL PARTIES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 1/14/09; 1/14/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND DISTRIBUTED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 108716 IN 11-MD-1203). (tjd)
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6858 THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41.1(b) AND THE AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL THE ACTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON EXHIBIT A INCLUDING ANY AND ALL CLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIMS, CROSS-CLAIMS, AND THIRD PARTY CLAIMS THEREIN ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO ALL PARTIES. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III ON 1/18/07; 1/18/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND DISTRIBUTED TO LIAISON COUSNEL. (SEE PAPER # 107474 IN 11-MD-1203). (tjd) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2007 (tjd, ).
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6611 THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41.1(B) AND THE AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL THE ACTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A AND B INCLUDING ANY AND ALL CLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIMS, CROSS-CLAIMS AND THIRD PARTY CLAIMS THEREIN ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO ALL PARTIES. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III. 10/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND DISTRIBUTED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. APPLIES TO THE AYLSTOCK, WITKIN & SASSER PLC CASES LISTED ON EXHIBITS A AND B. TO VIEW THIS DOCUMENT PLEASE REFER TO PAPER #107221 IN MDL 11-1203.(sc, )
October 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6597 THAT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(ii) THE ACTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A AND B ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND COUNSEL FEES. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III ON 10/5/06;. 10/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND DISTRIBUTED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 107207 IN 11-MD-1203). (tjd)
August 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6482 THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41.1(b) AND PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL, THE ACTIONS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A&B INCLUDING ANY AND ALL CLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIMS, CROSS-CLAIMS AND THIRD PARTY CLAIMS THERIN ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO ALL PARTIES. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III ON 8/22/06; 8/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND DISTRIBUTED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO THE LAW OFFICE OF BOBBY MOAK ACTIONS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A&B). (SEE PAPER NO. 107082 IN 11-1203).(rv, )
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6412 THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41.1(b) AND PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL, THE ACTIONS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A&B INCLUDING ANY AND ALL CLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIMS, CROSS-CLAIMS AND THIRD PARTY CLAIMS THERIN ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO ALL PARTIES. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III ON 7/7/06; 7/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND DISTRIBUTED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO THE LAW OFFICES OF BOBBY MOAK, P.C. ACTIONS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A&B). (ALSO APPLIES TO #107009 IN 11-1203).(rv, )
April 29, 2005 Filing 33 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by HEATHER MARIE ABY on behalf of WYETH, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS. Certificate of Service, Exhibit. (See Paper # 207959 in 12-md-1203). (Attachments: #1)(tjd)
February 2, 2005 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File ("Wyeth's Motion for Permission to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to "Reinstate" Doctor Defendants; Wyeth's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to "Reinstate" Doctor Defendants") filed by WYETH.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1)#2 Exhibit A (part 2)#3 Exhibit B)(SHAH, MILIND)
January 5, 2005 Filing 31 NOTICE by INDEVUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Joinder in Wyeth's Memorandum), Certificate of Service. (PACE, LANNY) Modified on 1/6/2005 (rv, ).
January 5, 2005 Filing 30 Reply in Support of Plaintiff's MOTION TO AMEND AND TO REINSTATE PHYSICIAN DEFENDANTS with Certificate of Service filed by MARY FRANKS, MARGARET GIBSON, DONNA HORTON, NORMA HUNT, WANDA DILL JACKSON, IRENNER JOHNSON, SONJA MCCASKILL, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, MARJORIE STUDDARD, LATESIA DAVIS, LURA EDNEY, JAMES FULLER, CHARLOTTE HENSON, NANCY HUGHES, MARGIE BROOM, GLADYS MEDRANO, DIAHANNA PERKINS, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, KAREN PROSSER, PATRICIA ROGERS, STEPHANIE SURRETT, GAYLIA THORPE, BETTY TODD, BETTY K. WILSON, ROBIN HOSEY, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, WANDA JONES LEE, KENNETH KING, LECRETIA BLACKMON, HENRY PERNELL, BLANCHE SANDERS, MELINDA BROWN, JOHN NMI DAVIS.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit B3#5 Exhibit B4#6 Exhibit C#7 Exhibit D#8 Exhibit E)(AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) Modified on 1/6/2005 (rv, ).
January 3, 2005 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct & Remand filed by WYETH, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(ABY, HEATHER)
December 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4249 THAT WYETH SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO JANUARY 3, 2005 TO SERVE A RESPONSE TO PLFFS' MOTION TO AMEND AND/OR TO REINSTATE PHYSICIAN DEFTS AS PARTIES TO THIS LAWSUIT, ETC. SEE PP#104739 IN MDL 11-1203. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III. 12/16/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct & Remand filed by MARGARET GIBSON, DONNA HORTON, NORMA HUNT, WANDA DILL JACKSON, IRENNER JOHNSON, SONJA MCCASKILL, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, MARJORIE STUDDARD, LATESIA DAVIS, LURA EDNEY, CHARLOTTE HENSON, MARGIE BROOM, GLADYS MEDRANO, DIAHANNA PERKINS, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, KAREN PROSSER, PATRICIA ROGERS, STEPHANIE SURRETT, GAYLIA THORPE, BETTY TODD, BETTY K. WILSON, ROBIN HOSEY, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, WANDA JONES LEE, KENNETH KING, LECRETIA BLACKMON, HENRY PERNELL, BLANCHE SANDERS, MELINDA BROWN, JOHN NMI DAVIS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 #2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B1#4 Exhibit B2#5 Exhibit C#6 Exhibit D1#7 Exhibit D2#8 Exhibit D3)(WITKIN, JUSTIN)
July 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3689 THAT THE MOTION OF PLFFS FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PRETRIAL ORDER 3532 OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR CERTIFICATION IS DENIED. SEE PP#104135 IN MDL 11-1203 SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III. 7/2/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3611 THAT THE MOTION OF DEFT ROBERT MCKINNEY TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT SEE PP#104045 IN MDL 11-1203. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III. 6/17/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3607 THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLFFS NANCY HUGHES, JAMES FULLER, AND MARY FRANKS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL NAMED DEFTS, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND COUNSEL FEES, ETC. SEE PP#104041 IN MDL 11-1203. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III. 6/16/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 1, 2004 Filing 23 Wyeth's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Interlocutory Appeal filed by WYETH, Certificate of Service. (KERRIGAN, PAUL) Modified on 6/2/2004 (np).
May 26, 2004 Filing 22 Entry of Appearance by LANNY R. PACE on behalf of INDEVUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INCORPORATED f/k/a INTERNEURON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Certificate of Service. (See Paper # 205766 in 12-md-1203). (tjd, )
May 21, 2004 Filing 21 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PTO #19 3532, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFFS' LECRETIA BLACKMON, MARGIE BROOM, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, MELINDA BROWN, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, JOHN NMI DAVIS, LATESIA DAVIS, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, LURA EDNEY, MARY FRANKS, JAMES FULLER, MARGARET GIBSON, CHARLOTTE HENSON, DONNA HORTON, ROBIN HOSEY, NORMA HUNT, WANDA DILL JACKSON, IRENNER JOHNSON, KENNETH KING, WANDA JONES LEE, SONJA MCCASKILL, GLADYS MEDRANO, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, KAREN PROSSER, PATRICIA ROGERS, BLANCHE SANDERS, MARJORIE STUDDARD, STEPHANIE SURRETT, GAYLIA THORPE, BETTY TODD, BETTY K. WILSON, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a-d#2 Exhibit E#3 Exhibit F#4 Exhibit G#5 Exhibit H1#6 Exhibit H2#7 Exhibit H3#8 Exhibit I-K#9 Exhibit L#10 Exhibit M) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) Modified on 5/25/2004 (np).
May 20, 2004 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by LANNY R. PACE on behalf of INDEVUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service (PACE, LANNY)
May 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3532 THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS IN C.A. 03-20587 TO REMAND TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF COAHOMA COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI IS DENIED; ALL CLAIMS IN 03-20587 AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS LISTED IN THIS ORDER ARE DISMISSED; THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS IN C.A. 03-20385 TO REMAND TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF PIKE COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI IS DENIED; ALL CLAIMS IN 03-20385 AGAINST DEFENDANTS EDSEL F. STEWART ESTATE, TERRY WESTBROOK, M.D., TERRY R. LOWE, M.D., LESLIE ENGLAND, M.D., CHARLIE PARKER, M.D., UNKNOWN SEFTALL, M.D., UNKNOWN KUMAH, M.D., FOREST BRATLEY, ADM SUSAN BODNEY ARE DISMISSED; THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS IN C.A. 03-20379 TO REMAND TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF LINCOLN COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI IS DENIED; ALL CLAIMS IN 03-20379 AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS LISTED IN THIS ORDER ARE DISMISSED; THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS IN C.A. 03-20590 TO REMAND TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF BOLIVAR COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI IS DENIED; ALL CLAIMS IN 03-20590 AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS LISTED IN THIS ORDER ARE DISMISED. SIGNED BY JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III ON 05/14/04;. 05/14/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (SEE PAPER # 103953 IN 11-MD-1203). (tjd, )
April 12, 2004 Filing 18 Rebuttal memo by ROBERT MCKINNEY in further support of motion to dismiss, certificate of service. See pp#205367 in MDL 12-1203. (sc, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 17 WYETH'S Response to Plaintiffs' Submissions of Supplemental Evidence. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (KERRIGAN, PAUL) Modified on 4/2/2004 (fh)
March 31, 2004 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Response to the Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Robert McKinney filed by MARGIE BROOM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Further Submission of Supplemental Evidence in Support of Remand and Reply to Wyeth's Response to Plaintiffs' Submissions of Supplemental Authority)(AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
March 22, 2004 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY ROBERT MCKINNEY.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBITS. (SEE PAPER # 205224 IN 12-MD-1203).(tjd, )
March 18, 2004 Filing 14 NOTICE by LECRETIA BLACKMON, MARGIE BROOM, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, MELINDA BROWN, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, JOHN NMI DAVIS, LATESIA DAVIS, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, LURA EDNEY, MARY FRANKS, JAMES FULLER, MARGARET GIBSON, CHARLOTTE HENSON, DONNA HORTON, ROBIN HOSEY, NANCY HUGHES, NORMA HUNT, WANDA DILL JACKSON, IRENNER JOHNSON, KENNETH KING, WANDA JONES LEE, SONJA MCCASKILL, GLADYS MEDRANO, DIAHANNA PERKINS, HENRY PERNELL, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, KAREN PROSSER, PATRICIA ROGERS, BLANCHE SANDERS, MARJORIE STUDDARD, STEPHANIE SURRETT, GAYLIA THORPE, BETTY TODD, BETTY K. WILSON of Filing Exhibit in Support of Remand, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1#2 Exhibit A2#3 Exhibit A3)(AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) Modified on 3/19/2004 (np).
March 17, 2004 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION for Order filed by LECRETIA BLACKMON, MARGIE BROOM, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, MELINDA BROWN, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, JOHN NMI DAVIS, LATESIA DAVIS, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, LURA EDNEY, MARY FRANKS, JAMES FULLER, MARGARET GIBSON, CHARLOTTE HENSON, DONNA HORTON, ROBIN HOSEY, NANCY HUGHES, NORMA HUNT, WANDA DILL JACKSON, IRENNER JOHNSON, KENNETH KING, WANDA JONES LEE, SONJA MCCASKILL, GLADYS MEDRANO, DIAHANNA PERKINS, HENRY PERNELL, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, KAREN PROSSER, PATRICIA ROGERS, BLANCHE SANDERS, MARJORIE STUDDARD, STEPHANIE SURRETT, GAYLIA THORPE, BETTY TODD, BETTY K. WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1#2 Exhibit A2#3 Exhibit B-F#4 Exhibit G-S)(AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
March 17, 2004 Filing 12 NOTICE by LECRETIA BLACKMON, MARGIE BROOM, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, MELINDA BROWN, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, JOHN NMI DAVIS, LATESIA DAVIS, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, LURA EDNEY, MARY FRANKS, JAMES FULLER, MARGARET GIBSON, CHARLOTTE HENSON, DONNA HORTON, ROBIN HOSEY, NANCY HUGHES, NORMA HUNT, WANDA DILL JACKSON, IRENNER JOHNSON, KENNETH KING, WANDA JONES LEE, SONJA MCCASKILL, GLADYS MEDRANO, DIAHANNA PERKINS, HENRY PERNELL, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, KAREN PROSSER, PATRICIA ROGERS, BLANCHE SANDERS, MARJORIE STUDDARD, STEPHANIE SURRETT, GAYLIA THORPE, BETTY TODD, BETTY K. WILSON (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
March 17, 2004 Filing 11 NOTICE by LECRETIA BLACKMON, MARGIE BROOM, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, MELINDA BROWN, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, JOHN NMI DAVIS, LATESIA DAVIS, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, LURA EDNEY, MARY FRANKS, MARGARET GIBSON, CHARLOTTE HENSON, DONNA HORTON, ROBIN HOSEY, NANCY HUGHES, NORMA HUNT, WANDA DILL JACKSON, IRENNER JOHNSON, KENNETH KING, WANDA JONES LEE, SONJA MCCASKILL, GLADYS MEDRANO, DIAHANNA PERKINS, HENRY PERNELL, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, KAREN PROSSER, PATRICIA ROGERS, BLANCHE SANDERS, MARJORIE STUDDARD, STEPHANIE SURRETT, GAYLIA THORPE, BETTY TODD, BETTY K. WILSON (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
March 15, 2004 Filing 10 NOTICE by LECRETIA BLACKMON, MARGIE BROOM, BILLY WAYNE BROWN, MELINDA BROWN, DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON, JOHN NMI DAVIS, LATESIA DAVIS, BILLIE DIGIOVANNI, LURA EDNEY, MARY FRANKS, JAMES FULLER, MARGARET GIBSON, CHARLOTTE HENSON, DONNA HORTON, ROBIN HOSEY, NANCY HUGHES, NORMA HUNT, WANDA DILL JACKSON, IRENNER JOHNSON, KENNETH KING, WANDA JONES LEE, SONJA MCCASKILL, GLADYS MEDRANO, DIAHANNA PERKINS, HENRY PERNELL, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, KAREN PROSSER, PATRICIA ROGERS, BLANCHE SANDERS, MARJORIE STUDDARD, STEPHANIE SURRETT, GAYLIA THORPE, BETTY TODD, BETTY K. WILSON (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
March 9, 2004 Filing 9 WYETH'S Response to Plaintiffs' Submissions of Supplemental Evidence. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (KERRIGAN, PAUL) Modified on 3/11/2004 (fh)
February 27, 2004 Filing 8 WYETH'S Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of WYETH'S Opposition to MOTIONS TO REMAND, MISSISSIPPI CASES, Certificate of Service. (FLOTRON, CAROLINE) Modified on 3/1/2004 (fh)
February 9, 2004 Filing 7 Declaration of Edward T. Arnold in support of Wyeth's opposition to Plffs' motion to remand, appendix. See pp#204948 in MDL 12-1203.(sc, )
February 9, 2004 Filing 6 Appendix of certain unreported cases in support of Wyeth's opposition to Plff's motion to remand. See pp#204947 in MDL 12-1203. (sc, )
February 9, 2004 Filing 5 Memorandum in Opposition Wyeth's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by WYETH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (KERRIGAN, PAUL)
December 18, 2003 Filing 4 PLFFS' MOTION FOR SUSPENSION OF ALL DISCOVERY INITIATION DATES AND DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sc, )
December 18, 2003 Filing 3 Plffs' NOTICE of pending motion to remand, certificate of service. (sc, )
December 18, 2003 Filing 1 Original record together with certified copy of docket entries received from District of ND/MS (Delta). (llb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOM et al v. HOGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM C. BARRETT
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF GLEN WARREN
Represented By: AMANDA CLEARMAN WADDELL
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARA B. SCHRADER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. ROBERT MCKINNEY
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: KENNETH D. MCLEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. HAYWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD FULCHER
Represented By: AMANDA CLEARMAN WADDELL
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY REYNOLDS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHAN FARRELL
Represented By: AMANDA CLEARMAN WADDELL
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOREST BRATLEY
Represented By: JENNIFER HAWKS BLAND
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. HEARTLAND
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN BODNEY
Represented By: JENNIFER HAWKS BLAND
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST (DECEASED) REEVES
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LUNFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDEVUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: LANNY R. PACE
Represented By: BRADLEY B. VANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE FERGUSON
Represented By: MICHAEL VERDIER CORY, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK WADE
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS ADAMS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD CLARK 1
Represented By: MICHAEL VERDIER CORY, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREEDMAN LOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT F. COOPER
Represented By: AMANDA CLEARMAN WADDELL
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH
Represented By: PAUL B. KERRIGAN
Represented By: CAROLINE A. FLOTRON
Represented By: J. ROBERT RAMSAY
Represented By: HEATHER MARIE ABY
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN L. ROBINSON
Represented By: JEFFREY A. BURT
Represented By: MILIND M. SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES CESARE
Represented By: MICHAEL VERDIER CORY, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD CLARK
Represented By: MICHAEL VERDIER CORY, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES TYLER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES BEAR
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. A. TUBB
Represented By: JOHN G. WHEELER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELVIN SHERMAN
Represented By: AMANDA CLEARMAN WADDELL
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCUS HOGAN
Represented By: AMANDA CLEARMAN WADDELL
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: J. ROBERT RAMSAY
Represented By: HEATHER MARIE ABY
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND LOTT
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM TRULY
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN HIMMELSTIEN
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY HUNT
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH ROBERTS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. F. COOPER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM C. BARNETT
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "JOHN DOE SALES REPRESENTATIVE DEFENDANTS 1-25"
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN MULLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. K. WHITE
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. F. HOOPER
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN RUSSELL BARNES
Represented By: MICHAEL VERDIER CORY, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: L. CARL HAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLADYS MEDRANO
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN HOSEY
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA HORTON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH PINKSTON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA BROWN
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN NMI DAVIS
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY WAYNE BROWN
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY K. WILSON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA JONES LEE
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE SURRETT
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE HENSON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY HOLLINGSWORTH CLAYTON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA DILL JACKSON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY HUGHES
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH KING
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LURA EDNEY
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN PROSSER
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLIE DIGIOVANNI
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENNER JOHNSON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY FRANKS
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGIE BROOM
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES FULLER
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAYLIA THORPE
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATESIA DAVIS
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA ROGERS
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLANCHE SANDERS
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARJORIE STUDDARD
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY PERNELL
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIAHANNA PERKINS
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY TODD
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONJA MCCASKILL
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LECRETIA BLACKMON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET GIBSON
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA HUNT
Represented By: BRYAN F. AYLSTOCK
Represented By: JUSTIN G. WITKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?