PHILADELPHIA 76ERS L.P. v. TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Philadelphia 76ers L.P. alleges that defendant New Jersey Nets Basketball LLC had signed Todd MacCulloch and applied for Temporary Total Disability Insurance coverage with defendant Trustmark Insurance Co. The Nets later traded MacCulloch and assigned the insurance coverage to the Philadelphia 76ers. After MacCulloch was diagnosed with Charcot-Marie Tooth disease, Trustmark denied coverage based on the Nets\' purported failure to disclose that MacCulloch was suffering from a transitory case of mild plantar fasciitis.

Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA 76ERS L.P.
Defendant: NEW JERSEY NETS BASKETBALL LLC and TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2004cv04972
Filed: October 22, 2004
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: EDMUND V. LUDWIG
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2004 21 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES.SIGNED BY JUDGE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 12/22/04. 12/22/04 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(cdd, )
December 15, 2004 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT.SIGNED BY JUDGE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 12/15/04.12/15/04 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (stb, )
December 10, 2004 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER-MEMORANDUM THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFF TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS DENIED, THE MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE OF DEFENDANT TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 12/10/04.12/13/04 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (mac, )
December 9, 2004 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY A. ROSENTHAL, ESQUIRE AND JAMES D. MATHEWS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS HEREBY GRANTED.SIGNED BY JUDGE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 12/7/04.12/10/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (cdd, )
December 6, 2004 12
MOTION PRO HOC VICE FOR LIMITED ADMISSION OF JEFFREY A. ROSENTHAL AND JAMES D. MATHEWS BY TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY.STATEMENTS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(le, )
December 2, 2004 8
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 3 MOTION to Compel, 6 MOTION to Dismiss, 7 MOTION to Stay: MOTION HEARING ON OUTSTANDING MOTIONS SET FOR 12/7/2004 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 12-A BEFORE HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG. SEE ATTACHED STANDING ORDER ON ORAL ARGUMENT.(kc, )
November 22, 2004 7
MOTION FILED BY TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY TO STAY THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(cdd, )
November 3, 2004 3
MOTION to Compel filed by PHILADELPHIA 76ERS L.P..Motion to Compel Arbitration, Brief, Order and Rule to Show Cause, Certificate of Service. (JACKSON, LAWRENCE) Modified on 11/4/2004 (np).
October 25, 2004 2
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by PHILADELPHIA 76ERS L.P. against NEW JERSEY NETS BASKETBALL LLC, TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY.(cdd, )
October 22, 2004 1
COMPLAINT against NEW JERSEY NETS BASKETBALL LLC, TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 910011.), filed by PHILADELPHIA 76ERS L.P.(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILADELPHIA 76ERS L.P. v. TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY NETS BASKETBALL LLC
Represented By: ROBERT J. KHEEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUSTMARK INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JEFFREY A. ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA 76ERS L.P.
Represented By: ROBERT W. HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?