WILSON v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al

Plaintiff: HAROLD C. WILSON
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RONALD CASTILLE, LYNNE ABRAHAM, JOHN JACK MCMAHON, JANES DOE and JOHN DOES
Case Number: 2:2004cv05396
Filed: July 31, 2007
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: THOMAS N. ONEILL
Referring Judge: L. FELIPE RESTREPO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2016 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO 212) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/8/16. 4/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
March 26, 2014 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED; THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY SHALL HAVE THE OPPORTUNITY TO AMEND BY 3/31/14, ETC; IF HE ELECTS HE SHALL PRODUCE THE JURY SELECTION NOTES THAT PLFF HAS REQUESTED BY 4/18/14 AND PLFF SHALL BE ENTITLED TO DEPOSE THE NEW WITNESSES BY 5/2/14. IF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY WISHES TO RAISE OBJECTIONS HE SHALL FILE AN APPROPRIATE MOTION BY 4/11/14. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 3/25/14. 3/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(lvj, )
May 9, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE REMAINING CLAIMS AGAINST THE INDIVIDUAL DISTRICT ATTORNEY DEFTS CONCERNING THE DA DEFTS' ALLEGED ACTIONS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 5/8/13. 5/10/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(lvj, ) Modified on 5/10/2013 (lvj, ).
February 22, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART;. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 2/22/12. 2/23/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(lvj, )
March 31, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERTHAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRNATED TO THE EXTENT THAT THEY REQUEST THAT PLFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST LYNNE A BRAHAM BE DISMISSED, ETC; DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT THEY REQUEST THAT PLFF'S CLAIMS ALLEGING CONDUCT TAKEN IN THE MOVING DEFTS' BE DISMISSED; THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT DEFTS REQUEST THAT PLFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST JACK MCMAHON BE DISMISSE D; DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT DEFTS REQUEST THAT THE STATE LAW CLAIMS AGAINST THE MOVING DEFTS IN THEIR OFFICIAL CAPACITIES BE DISMISSED; THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 3/31/10. 4/1/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(lvj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD C. WILSON
Represented By: RICHARD F. OSTRIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: LYNNE A. SITARSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD CASTILLE
Represented By: JENNIFER NICOLE DONALDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNNE ABRAHAM
Represented By: JENNIFER NICOLE DONALDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN JACK MCMAHON
Represented By: JENNIFER NICOLE DONALDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANES DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?