SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 441 HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN et al v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv05898
Filed: December 17, 2004
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Referring Judge: JACOB P. HART
Presiding Judge: BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION (DOC #51) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/30/10. ) 10/1/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
September 8, 2010 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (DOC #249) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/7/10. ) 9/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 31, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/31/10. ) 3/31/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. ( FILED UNDER SEAL )(gn, )
November 3, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE DEFTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED WITH REPECT TO ALL ANTITRUST AND CONSUMER PROTECTION CLAIMS IN COUNTS I AND II OF THE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. THE DEFTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS D ENIED WITH RESPECT TO THE UNJUST ENRICHMENT CLAIMS ARISING UNDER ALABAMA AND ILLINOIS LAW; IT IS GRANTED WITH RESPECT TO ALL OTHER UNJUST ENRICHMENT CLAINS IN COUNT III, ETC. PLFF SIDNEY HILLMAN IS DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION. PLFFS AE GRANTED 30 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND THEIR COMPLAINT TO ENUMERATE THE STATES INTO WHICH REIMBURSEMENTS WERE SENT DURING THE RELEVANT PERIOD. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 11/2/09. ) 11/3/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 441 HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN et al v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?