MCLAUGHLIN v. PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES Featured Case

Plaintiff: KIMBERLY MCLAUGHLIN
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES
Case Number: 2:2004cv06003
Filed: December 23, 2004
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2005 15 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b)SIGNED BY JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 10/14/05. 10/14/05 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
October 13, 2005 14 Minute Entry/Report of Settlement Conference held before Judge CHARLES B. SMITH on 10/13/05. (jpd)
September 27, 2005 13 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/24/2006 AT 10:00 A.M. IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS 8614 BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK. A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/13/2005 AT 1:00 P.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES B. SMITH. DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/1/2006. MOTIONS DUE BY 3/13/2006. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 4/3/2006 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 8-A BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK.SIGNED BY JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 9/27/05. 9/27/05 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
September 26, 2005 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R. BARCLAY SURRICK : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/26/2005. (le, )
September 26, 2005 11 Featured Case ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR AT 10/13/2005 01:00 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES B. SMITH. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES B. SMITH ON 9/26/2005. 9/26/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(le, )
September 21, 2005 10 STATUS REPORT (Joint Case Report) by PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES. (STROUSE, RICHARD)
September 21, 2005 9 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by KIMBERLY MCLAUGHLIN.(LUONGO, MICHAEL)
August 24, 2005 8 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 9/26/2005 AT 10:00 A.M. IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS ROOM 8614 BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK. SIGNED BY JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/24/05. 8/24/05 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
July 21, 2005 7 ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses by PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES, Certificate of Service. (STROUSE, RICHARD) Modified on 7/22/2005 (np).
July 12, 2005 6 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT PHILADELHIA PHILLIES TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 07/12/05.07/13/05 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ac, )
March 24, 2005 5 Opposition re 4 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by KIMBERLY MCLAUGHLIN, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (LUONGO, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/25/2005 (np).
March 2, 2005 4 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(STROUSE, RICHARD)
February 2, 2005 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES. PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES waiver sent on 1/7/2005, answer due 3/8/2005. (jpd, )
January 11, 2005 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD L. STROUSE on behalf of PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES with Certificate of Service (STROUSE, RICHARD)
December 23, 2004 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KIMBERLY MCLAUGHLIN. (gtk, )
December 23, 2004 One Original Summons Issued as to PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES. Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/27/2004 (gtk, )
December 23, 2004 1 COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 912039.), filed by KIMBERLY MCLAUGHLIN.(gtk, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2005 (bj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCLAUGHLIN v. PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES
Represented By: RICHARD L. STROUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY MCLAUGHLIN
Represented By: MICHAEL R. LUONGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?