NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Number: 2:2005cv00281
Filed: January 20, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: RONALD L. BUCKWALTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDATION IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO CERTIFY COURTS 2/17/11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IS GRANTED, ETC. FURTHER ORDERED THAT PROCEEDINGS IN THIS CASE ARE STAYED PENDING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL.SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/23/11. 3/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
February 18, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANYS CROSS-MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TH E EXPERT REPORTS OF STUART EBBY IS DENIED AS MOOT FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN FOOTNOTE 5 OF THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED APPEAR OF A STATUS CONFERENCE BEFORE THIS COURT ON 3/9/11 10:00AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 2/17/11. 2/18/11 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
February 17, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINIONSIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 2/17/11. 2/18/11 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
January 20, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S EXPERT J. BUSH NIELSEN 40 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 1/20/11. 1/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?