PETITION OF FRESCATI SHIPPING COMPANY, LTD., as owner of the M/T ATHOS I and TSAKOS SHIPPING & TRADING, S.A., as manager of the ATHOS I for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability

Case Number: 2:2005cv00305
Filed: January 21, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: JOHN P. FULLAM
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46:0183 Exoneration, Limitation of Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2016 873 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DRAW ADVERSE INFERENCES BECAUSE OF PLFFS' SPOLIATION OF VESSEL RECORDS (DOC. NO. 754) IS DENIED. DEFTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE THE BEST EVIDENCE RULE AND TO EXCLUDE AND DISREGARD SECONDARY EVIDENCE & TESTIMONY OFFERED INSTEAD OF ORIGINAL EVIDENCE LOST OR DESTROYED IN BAD FAITH (DOC NO. 755) IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/25/16.7/25/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
April 12, 2011 618 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF CITGO ASPHALT REFINING COMPANY, CITGO PETROLEUM CORPORATION, & CITGO EAST COAST OIL CORPORATION & AGAINST FRESCATI SHIPPING COMPANY, LTD., AS OWNER OF THE M/T ATHOS I AND TSAKOS SHIPPING & TRADING, S.A., AS MANAGER OF THE ATHOS I.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/12/11. 4/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
August 9, 2010 404 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT FRESCATI PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED TRIAL TESTIMONY OF OSCAR CASTILLO IS HEREBY GRANTED. IF THE FRESCATI PLAINTIFFS WISH TO PRESENT THE VIDEOTAPE TESTIMONY OF OSCAR CASTILLO AT TRIAL, THEY MAY DO SO, AND THE TRIAL DEPOSITION MAY PROCEED IN HOUSTON, TEXAS, AT A TIME CONVENIENT TO ALL PARTIES, PROVIDED THAT THE FRESCATI PLAINTIFFS SHALL REIMBURSE CARCO'S COUNSEL FOR THE ACTUAL EXPENSE OF ATTENDING THE DEPOSITION. (TRAVEL, LODGING AND MEALS). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 8/9/2010. 8/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
October 8, 2009 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT MOTIONS BY CITGO TO STRIKE & BAR EXPERT REPORTS ARE DENIED, CONDITIONED UPON THE FULFILLMENT OF THE COMMITMENTS MADE BY FRESCATI'S COUNSEL AT ORAL ARGUMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 10/8/09. 10/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETITION OF FRESCATI SHIPPING COMPANY, LTD., as owner of the M/T ATHOS I and TSAKOS SHIPPING & TRADING, S.A., as manager of the ATHOS I for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?