CONSTAND v. COSBY
Case Number: 2:2005cv01099
Filed: March 8, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C. ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER THAT THE ANY FURTHER OBJECTIONS TO THE UNSEALING OF THE DOCUMENTS AT ISSUE (ECF NOS: 48,49,50,52,54,55,57,58,60,61,63,64,65,66,67,68) ARE MOOT AND THE DOCUMENTS SHALL NOT BE RESEALED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 09/23/2016. 09/23/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER of USCA as to 115 Notice of Appeal filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR., THAT THE ORDER OF THE DISTRICT COURT DATED 7/6/2015, IS HEREBY VACATED AND THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. (sg, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER THAT THE MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE (DOC. 109 ) AND MOTION TO STRIKE (DOC. 113 ) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/21/2015.12/21/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES HAVE WITHDRAWN AND REQUEST DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND OTHER SANCTIONS (DOC. NO. 107 ), DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (DOC. NO. 112 ), AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S BREACHES OF THE PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (DOC. NO. 114]). SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/17/2015. 12/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas )
December 10, 2015 Filing 126 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JENNIFER B. JORDAN on behalf of NATIONAL INQUIRER(JORDAN, JENNIFER)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER THAT GLORIA ALLRED, ESQUIRE, IS ADMITTED IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/3/2015. 12/3/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ahf)
August 10, 2015 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 125695 re 115 Notice of Appeal filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (sg, )
July 30, 2015 Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re 113 MOTION to Strike the Motions of Non-Parties Beth Ferrier and Rebecca Cooper for Lack of Standing filed by BETH FERRIER. (COLLIER, JOYCE)
July 30, 2015 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re 113 MOTION to Strike the Motions of Non-Parties Beth Ferrier and Rebecca Cooper for Lack of Standing filed by REBECCA COOPER. (COLLIER, JOYCE)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER THAT M. EUGENE GIBBS-SQUIRES' MOTION TO INTERVENE (DOC. 121 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/29/2015.7/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
July 29, 2015 Filing 121 MOTION TO INTERENVE, filed by M. EUGENE GIBBS-SQUIRE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, )
July 29, 2015 USCA Case Number 15-2797 for 115 Notice of Appeal filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.. (sg, )
July 28, 2015 Filing 120 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 119 Transcript - PDF, 7/28/2015 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (sg, )
July 28, 2015 Filing 118 RESPONSE to Motion re 114 MOTION to Enforce - Defendant's Motion Regarding Plaintiff's Breaches of the Parties' Settlement Agreement filed by ANDREA CONSTAND. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion Regarding Plaintiff's Alleged Breach of the Parties' Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)(TROIANI, DOLORES)
July 28, 2015 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Motion For Injunctive Relief filed by ANDREA CONSTAND. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Certificate of Service)(TROIANI, DOLORES)
July 27, 2015 Filing 116 Clerk's Notice to USCA re 115 Notice of Appeal : (sg, )
July 27, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 106 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion),, by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (O'CONNOR, PATRICK) Modified on 7/27/2015 (afm, ).
July 23, 2015 Filing 114 MOTION to Enforce - Defendant's Motion Regarding Plaintiff's Breaches of the Parties' Settlement Agreement filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
July 21, 2015 Filing 113 MOTION to Strike the Motions of Non-Parties Beth Ferrier and Rebecca Cooper for Lack of Standing filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
July 21, 2015 Filing 112 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Motion For Injunctive Relief filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
July 17, 2015 Filing 111 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ANDREW D. SCHAU on behalf of WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR(SCHAU, ANDREW)
July 13, 2015 Filing 110 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR GLORIA ALLRED, by REBECCA COOPER AND BETH FERRIER. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, PROPOSED ORDER. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 124188. (sg, ) Modified on 7/14/2015 (afm, ).
July 13, 2015 Filing 109 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND OTHER SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATIONS OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE FOOTNOTE 5 IN DEFENDANT'S BRIEF FILED AT DOCUMENT NUMBER 102, filed by REBECCA COOPER AND BETH FERRIER. EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, PROPOSED ORDER.(sg, ) Modified on 7/14/2015 (afm, ).
July 13, 2015 Filing 108 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR JANE DOE WITNESS NO. 5 BETH FERRIER AND NO. 11 REBECCA COOPER by JOYCE L. COLLIER on behalf of REBECCA COOPER AND BETH FERRIER. CERTFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, ) Modified on 7/14/2015 (afm, ).
July 10, 2015 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 6/26/2015, before Judge EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Court Reporter/Transcriber VERITEXT LEGAL SOLUTIONS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2015. (sg, )
July 8, 2015 Filing 107 MOTION for Sanctions filed by ANDREA CONSTAND.Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief and Other Sanctions for Violations of Confidential Settlement Agreement and Motion to Strike Footnote 5 in Defendant's Brief Filed at Document Number 102; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(TROIANI, DOLORES)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER THAT THE ASSOCIATED PRESS'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND OBTAIN ACCESS TO DOCUMENTS FILED UNER SEAL IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL LIFT THE SEAL ON THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS: ECF NOS. 48, 49, 50, 52, 54, 55, 57, 58, 60, 61, 63, 64, 65, 66, 67, 68. THE MOTION TO ADMIT JOSEPH CAMMARATA ESQ. AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PROPOSED INTERVENORS GREEN, SEIGNESE, AND TRAITZ IS GRANTED. THE MOTION OF TAMARA GREEN, THERESE SERIGNESE, AND LINDA TRITZ TO INTERVENE AND LATE-FILE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF LIFTING SEAL IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/6/2015. 7/6/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 6, 2015 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/6/2015. 7/6/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 1, 2015 Filing 104 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Cammarata filed by TAMARA GREEN, THERESE SERIGNESE, LINDA TRAITZ.certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SACHS, ROBERT) $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 123873. Modified on 7/7/2015 (sg, ).
June 29, 2015 Filing 103 MOTION to Intervene filed by TAMARA GREEN, THERESE SERIGNESE, LINDA TRAITZ.certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service certificate of service)(SACHS, ROBERT)
June 24, 2015 Filing 102 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO LIFTING THE SEAL re 99 Order, filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR..(GOWEN, GEORGE) Modified on 6/25/2015 (afm, ).
June 24, 2015 Filing 101 Memorandum re: Response to Court Order of June 18, 2015 100 , with Certificate of Service filed by THE ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SPROUL, GAYLE) Modified on 6/25/2015 (afm, ).
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON THE AP MOTIONS, AND COSBY'S OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE WILL BE HELD ON FRIDAY, 6/26/2015 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 15A. PARTIES TO THIS ACTION OR RELATED ACTION (06-CV-00483), THE AP AS THE PUTATIVE INTERVENOR AND ANY OTHER INTERESTED PARTY SEEKING ACCESS TO DOCUMENTS SEALED BY THE COURT, MAY FILE A BRIEF OR OTHER MATERIALS IN SUPPORT OR OPPOSITION TO THE LIFTING OF THE SEAL IMPRESSED BY THE COURT, NO LATER THAN NOON, WEDNESDAY, 6/24/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/18/2015. 6/18/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER THAT THE LETTER ADDRESSED TO JUDGE ROBRENO DATED 6/17/2015 FROM GAYLE C. SPROUL, COUNSEL FOR THE ASSOCIATED PRESS, RE: SEALED DOCUMENTS, BE FILED OF RECORD. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/18/2015. 6/18/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 11, 2015 Filing 98 Objections by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR, LETTER DATED 3/10/2015, RE: DEFT WILLIAM H. CROSBY'S OBJECTION TO UNSEALING OF DOCUMENTS. (sg, )
January 12, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: LRCP 5.1.5. 1/12/2015. COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHPREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/8/06. 11/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(afm, ) (as, ).
July 20, 2006 Filing 95 Response to National Enquirer's Affirmative Defenses by ANDREA CONSTAND. (TROIANI, DOLORES)
July 13, 2006 Filing 94 STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/13/06. 7/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jpd) (as, ).
July 7, 2006 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service by NATIONAL INQUIRER.(JORDAN, JENNIFER)
June 23, 2006 Filing 92 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Complaint filed in Civil Action No. 06-483 and consolidated for pretrial purposes with Civil Action 05-1099) by MARTIN D. SINGER.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
June 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT NATIONAL ENQUIRER'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER IS GRANTED. THE NATIONAL ENQUIRER SHALL HAVE UNTIL 7/7/06 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/20/06. 6/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc) (as, ).
June 20, 2006 Filing 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by NATIONAL INQUIRER.Certificate of Service.(JORDAN, JENNIFER)
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED AS MOOT; DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED AS MOOT; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IS DENIED AS MOOT, ETC.... SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/9/06.6/9/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (afm, )
June 8, 2006 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN C. LEBOWITZ on behalf of ANDREA CONSTAND with Certificate of Service (LEBOWITZ, ANN)
June 7, 2006 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION to Compel, 85 MOTION to Compel Specific Responses and to Strike Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
June 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING IS DENIED; HEARING WILL BEGIN AT 8:30 A.M.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/5/06. 6/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. FAXED BY CHAMBERS 6/5/06(afm, ) (as, ).
May 24, 2006 Filing 85 MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC RESPONSES AND TO STRIKE OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES FILED BY ANDREA CONSTAND,CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(afm, )
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC RESPONSES SHALL BE ADDRESSED AT THE HEARING ON 6/9/06; DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION COMPEL BY 6/7/06.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/24/06. 5/24/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
May 22, 2006 Filing 83 MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC RESPONSES AND TO STRIKE OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES FILED BY ANDREA CONSTAND,CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(afm, ) (as, ).
May 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, TO CONSOLIDATE AND DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND FOR INTERNATIONAL LETTER OF REQUEST WILL BE HELD ON 6/9/2006 AT 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/15/06. 5/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
May 2, 2006 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of His Motion for the Issuance of International Letters of Request filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
April 26, 2006 Filing 80 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF INTERNATIONAL LETTERS OF REQUEST filed by ANDREA CONSTAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (afm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2006 (afm, ).
April 12, 2006 Filing 79 MOTION to Issue International Letters of Request filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit K)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
March 14, 2006 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re 77 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of Plaintiff Andrea Constand To Consolidate along with Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
February 28, 2006 Filing 77 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of Plaintiff Andrea Constand To Consolidate along with Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate filed by ANDREA CONSTAND.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1)(TROIANI, DOLORES)
January 31, 2006 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ETC. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE NATIONAL ENQUIRER IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 01/31/06. (Attachments: # 1 Order)01/31/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ac, )
January 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE NATIONAL INQUIRER IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO NATIONAL INQUIRER'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE NATIONAL INQUIRER IS GRANTED; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO THE LIFTING OF THE SEAL IS GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/18/06.1/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (afm, )
January 16, 2006 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Partial Opposition to the Lifting of the Seal Established by Case Management Order 2 filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply Brief)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
January 13, 2006 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/9/06 before Judge ROBRENO. Court Reporter: JOSEPH MATKOWSKI. HEARING (jl, )
January 13, 2006 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOVANT ASSOCIATED PRESS'S MOTION TO INTERVENE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/13/06.1/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. FAXED BY CHAMBERS 1/13/06. (afm, )
January 10, 2006 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/26/05 before Judge ROBRENO. Court Reporter: J. MATKOWSKI. HEARING (jl, )
January 6, 2006 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL BERRY on behalf of THE ASSOCIATED PRESS with Certificate of Service (BERRY, MICHAEL)
January 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON 1/9/2006 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A WILL ADDRESS FOLLOWING MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS #48, COMPEL DISCOVERY #50, TO STRIKE #52, ASSOCIATED'S MOTION TO INTERVENE #51, MOTION TO COMPEL NATIONAL #61.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/4/06. 1/5/06 ENTERED. COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS 1/5/06.(afm, ) (as, ).
January 5, 2006 Filing 68 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFF' SREPLY TO THE NATIONAL ENQUIRER'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'W MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY ANDREA CONSTAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL)..(afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
January 4, 2006 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THE LIFTING OF THE SEAL ESTABLISHED BY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 2 filed by ANDREA CONSTAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL). (afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
January 4, 2006 Filing 66 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MEMO IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE NATIONAL ENQUIRER'S COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS ANDREA CONSTAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL)..(afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 27, 2005 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by NATIONAL INQUIRER (FILED UNDER SEAL). (afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 22, 2005 Filing 64 DEFENDANT'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE NATIONAL ENQUIRER'S COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENT AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RESOLUTION filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (afm, ) Modified on 12/28/2005 (cdd, ). (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 21, 2005 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO THE LIFTING OF THE SEAL ESTABLISHED BY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 2 by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 19, 2005 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 Second MOTION to Intervene and to Unseal filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
December 8, 2005 Filing 61 MOTION TO COMPEL THE NATIONAL ENQUIRER'S COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENT AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RESOLUTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY ANDREA CONSTAND (FILED UNDER SEAL)..(afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 8, 2005 Filing 60 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION CONCERNING CONDUCT OF DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILE BY ANDREA CONSTAND (FILE UNDER SEAL). (afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 6, 2005 Filing 58 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND MEMORANDUM CONCERNING OVERARCHING ISSUES filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (afm, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 5, 2005 Filing 59 RESPONSE TO THE MOTION OF THE ASSOCIATED PRESS TO INTERVENE AND TO LIFT SEAL FILED BY ANDREA CONSTAND, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 MEMO)(afm, )
December 5, 2005 Filing 57 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S REQUESTS TO COMPEL AND MEMORANDUM CONCERNING OVERARCHING ISSUES by ANDREA CONSTAND. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO INTERVENE AND LIFT THE SEAL BY 12/19/2005. A HEARING IS SET FOR 1/9/2006 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11-A BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/2/05. 12/5/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
December 2, 2005 Filing 55 PAGES 8 AND 9 OF THE REDACTED TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON TELEPHONE CONFERENCE DATED 11/4/05. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 2, 2005 Filing 54 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/4/05 before Judge HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Court Reporter: ESR. (afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
December 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THE ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT OF THE THELEPHONE CONFERENCE HELD ON 11/4/05 SHALL BE FILED OF RECORD EXCEPT LINES 9-10 OF PAGE 8 AND LINES 1-2 OF PAGE 9 SHALL BE REDACTED; PAGES 8 AND 9 UNREDACTED SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL; LEAVE IS GRANTED TO COUNSEL TO RECIEVE THE UNREDACTED PARTS OF ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT FILED UNDER SEAL.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/2/05. 12/5/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
November 28, 2005 Filing 52 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION CONCERNING CONDUCT OF DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.,MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL).(afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
November 23, 2005 Filing 51 Second MOTION to Intervene and to Unseal filed by THE ASSOCIATED PRESS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Intervene and Unseal# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 3 Certificate of Service)(SPROUL, GAYLE)
November 21, 2005 Filing 50 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY ANDREA CONSTAND,CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(afm, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
November 21, 2005 Filing 49 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO COMPEL AND MEMO CONCERNING OVERARCHING ISSUES by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems).
November 21, 2005 Filing 48 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS CONCERNING CONDUCT OF DEFENDANT AT DEPOSITION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY ANDREA CONSTAND (FILED UNDER SEAL)..(afm, ) (ems). (UNSEALED PER DOC. NO. 106 ) Modified on 7/6/2015 (ems). Modified on 7/6/2015 (nd, ).
November 4, 2005 Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER THAT EACH PARTY SHALL FILE ANY REQUEST TO COMPEL BY 11/21/05, RESPONSES THERETO DUE 12/6/05. ANY PARTY OPPOSING THE LIFTING OF THE SEAL SHALL SHOW CAUSE WHY THE SEAL SHOULD NOT BE LIFTED BY 12/21/05. ANY PARTY SUPPORTING THE LIFTING OF THE SEAL SHALL FILE A MEMORANDUM BY 1/9/06. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL REQUESTS FOR DISCOVERY, RESPONSES AND LEGAL MEMORANDA FILED PURSUANT TO THIS ORDER SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/4/05. 11/4/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(stb, )
November 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/4/2005 AT 09:00 AM, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SHALL CALL CHAMBERS.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/2/05. 11/4/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
September 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT AFTER A HEARING DISCUSSING DISCOVERY MATTERS RAISED IN PLAINTIFF'S LETTERS DATED8/25/05 AND 9/8/05 AND DEFENDANT'S LETTERS DATED 9/2/05 AND9/12/05 TO THE COURT, THE MATTER HAVE BEEN RESOLVED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S RULING ON RECORD.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/26/05. 9/27/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
September 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/23/05 IS CONTINUED TO 9/26/05 AT 10:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/21/05. 9/21/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
September 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT A DISCOVERY CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/23/2005 AT 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/9/05. 9/12/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2005 (afm, ).
September 8, 2005 Filing 42 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
August 24, 2005 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR , filed by ANDREA CONSTAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(afm, )
August 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ASSERTING THE CITIZENSHIP OF THE PARTIES BY 8/29/05; PLAINTIFF SHALL JOIN ANY ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS BY 11/17/05; ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/30/06; ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 6/30/06; PRETRIAL MEMORANDA AND AMY MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 9/15/06; AND THE CASE SHALL BE PLACED IN THE TRIAL POOL ON 10/1/06, ETC.SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/17/05. 8/19/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(cdd, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2005 (afm, ).
July 22, 2005 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 6/22/05 before Judge Robreno. (fdc)
July 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND STRIKE OBJECTIONS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT TO THE COURT A F.R.C.P. 26(f) REPORT BY 8/8/05.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/8/05.7/12/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (afm, )
July 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF JANE DOE WITNESSES TO PROTECT DISCLOSURE OF THEIR NAMES OUTSIDE OF THIS LITIGATION IS DENIED; AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND THE SUSPENSION PERIOD OF THE COURT'S ORDER REGARDING THE IDENTITY OF JANE DOE WITNESSES AS TO JANE DOE NO.8 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/6/05. 7/7/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (fdc)
June 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM DATED 6/2/05 IS AMENDED SO THAT THE FOLLOWING SENTENCE ON PAGE 12 IS DELETED AND INSERTED IN LIEU THEREOF SHALL BE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE: RULE 3.6 OF THE PENNSYLVANIA RULES OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT, IN ITS ORIGINAL INCARNATION, INCLUDING WHAT IS NOW COMMENT 5, ETC....... SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/24/05. 6/24/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
June 21, 2005 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order as to Jane Doe No. 8, 33 MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Doe Witnesses filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick J.O'Connor)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
June 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT A HEARING TO ADDRESS PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND SUSPENSION PERIOD OF COURT'S ORDER REGARDING THE IDENTITY OF JANE DOE WITNESSES AND TO PROTECT DISCLOSURE OF THEIR NAMES WILL BE HELD ON 6/22/05 AT 2:00P.M. IN COURTROOM 11A. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/14/05. 6/15/05 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. FAXED BY CHAMBERS 6/14/05.(afm, )
June 13, 2005 Filing 33 MOTION TO PROTECT DISCLOSURE OF THEIR NAMES OUTSIDE OF THIS LITIGATION FILED BY JANE DOE WITNESSES,MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(afm, )
June 10, 2005 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order as to Jane Doe No. 8 filed by ANDREA CONSTAND.Certificate of Service.(KIVITZ, BEBE)
June 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT A CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/22/2005 AT 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM 11A.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/05. 6/3/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
June 2, 2005 Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 1 THAT PENNSYLVANIA RULE OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT 3.6 SHALL BE ADOPTED GOVERNING THE CONDUCT OF COUNSEL, THE VIOLATIONS OF THIS ORDER SHALL BE SUBJECT TO SANCTIONS, ETC..... SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/05. 6/3/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
June 2, 2005 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL DISCLOSURES IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER TO PROTECT THE IDENTITY OF HER RULE 415 JANE DOE WITNESS IS DENIED; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURE IS GRANTED; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORDEUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED; AND THE ASSOCIATED PRESS'S MOTION TO INTERVENE IS DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/05.6/2/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (afm, )
May 27, 2005 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Intervene filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
May 24, 2005 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Support re 26 MOTION to Intervene of the Associated Press filed by ANDREA CONSTAND, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (KIVITZ, BEBE) Modified on 5/26/2005 (md, ).
May 13, 2005 Filing 26 MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY THE ASSOCIATED PRESS,MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 MEMO# 2 COS# 3 EXHIBIT A# 4 EXHIBIT B# 5 EXHIBIT C)(afm, )
May 13, 2005 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/11/05 before Judge HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Court Reporter: ESR. (afm, )
May 12, 2005 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Protective Order and Memorandum of Law filed by ANDREA CONSTAND. (KIVITZ, BEBE)
May 11, 2005 Filing 23 Response re 21 Answer to Complaint to Affirmative Defenses by ANDREA CONSTAND, Certificate of Service. (KIVITZ, BEBE) Modified on 5/13/2005 (np).
May 10, 2005 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Protective Order filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
May 9, 2005 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
May 9, 2005 Filing 20 RESPONSE to defendant's MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by ANDREA CONSTAND, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (afm, )
May 9, 2005 Filing 19 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' GENERAL OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FILED BY ANDREA CONSTAND,MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(afm, )
April 27, 2005 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support of 13 MOTION for Protective Order to Protect the Identity Rule 415 Jane Doe Witnesses and in Opposition to PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PRECT THE IDENTITY OF RULE 415 JANE DOE WITNESSES FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (O'CONNOR, PATRICK) Modified on 4/29/2005 (np).
April 27, 2005 Filing 17 MOTION for Protective Order filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Memorandum# 3 Exhibits)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
April 25, 2005 Filing 16 RESPONSE to defendant's MOTION FOR LEAV TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by ANDREA CONSTAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (afm, )
April 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 5/11/2005 AT 12:00 PM.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/20/05. 4/22/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. XC BY CHAMBERS 4/22/05.(afm, )
April 22, 2005 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
April 19, 2005 Filing 13 MOTION for Protective Order to Protect the Identity Rule 415 Jane Doe Witnesses filed by ANDREA CONSTAND.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(KIVITZ, BEBE)
April 19, 2005 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures , Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service filed by ANDREA CONSTAND. (KIVITZ, BEBE)
April 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LIMITED ADMISSION IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/18/05.4/18/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (afm, ) (as, ).
April 15, 2005 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Memorandum)(O'CONNOR, PATRICK)
April 12, 2005 Filing 9 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW D. SCHAU, ESQUIRE FILED BY WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR.,APPLICATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(afm, )
April 12, 2005 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/3/2005 12:30 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS, Room 11614, BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. (to, )
April 6, 2005 Filing 7 Report Of Plaintiff following Rule 26 Conference of Parties by ANDREA CONSTAND, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Preliminary Scheduling Order) (KIVITZ, BEBE) Modified on 4/8/2005 (np).
April 4, 2005 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE M. GOWEN, III on behalf of WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR (GOWEN, GEORGE)
April 4, 2005 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. O'CONNOR on behalf of WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR., Certificate of Service. (O'CONNOR, PATRICK) Modified on 4/5/2005 (np).
March 31, 2005 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE M. GOWEN, III on behalf of WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR with Certificate of Service (GOWEN, GEORGE) (DOCKETED IN ERROR ATTORNEY DELETED) Modified on 4/4/2005 (afm, ).
March 23, 2005 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANDREA CONSTAND. WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR waiver sent on 3/9/2005, answer due 5/9/2005. (afm, ) (as, ).
March 8, 2005 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DOLORES M. TROIANI on behalf of ANDREA CONSTAND (TROIANI, DOLORES)
March 8, 2005 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANDREA CONSTAND. (ss, )
March 8, 2005 Summons Issued, One original mailed as to WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR. Forwarded To: Counsel on 3/8/05 (ss, )
March 8, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM H. COSBY, JR ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 914383.), filed by ANDREA CONSTAND.(ss, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONSTAND v. COSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?