E. et al v. SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF EDUCATION

Case Number: 2:2005cv02535
Filed: May 27, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: GENE E.K. PRATTER
Referring Judge: TIMOTHY R. RICE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET NO. 165). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/20/14. 10/21/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rab, )
July 21, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR A JURY TRIAL IS GRANTED. THE CASE WILL PROCEED AS OUTLINED IN THE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/18/14. 7/21/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
August 13, 2012 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT AFFIDAVIT OF MR. RONALD CHAMBERS AND ALL SUPPORTING EXHIBITS NOT PART OF THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT RECORD AS OF 10/24/2011 (DOC. NOS. 136, 146, 147) ARE STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. THE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT/RECONSIDER FIL ED BY THE CHAMBERS PLAINTIFFS (DOC. NO. 141) IS DENIED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ENTER JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF EDUCATION, AND AGAINST THE CHAMBERS PLAINTIFFS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/10/2012. 8/13/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
October 24, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET NO. 94) IS DENIED; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO PERMIT TESTIMONY OF HEARING OFFICER ROSEMARY MULLALY AT TRIAL (DOCKET NO. 95) IS DENIED; AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFFS' RIGHTS TO APPLY FOR LEAVE TO REOPEN AND SUPPLEMENT THESE SUMMARY JUDGMENT PAPERS TO THE EXTENT THEY ERRED IN THEIR UNDERSTANDING AS TO THE "RECORD" ON WHICH THEY COULD OR SHOULD BAS E THEIR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AND/OR AS TO THEIR OBLIGATIONS TO RAISE SUCH ISSUES. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ENTER JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT AND AGAINST THE PLAINTIFFS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/24/11. 10/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. et al v. SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?