THE RITZ HOTEL, LIMITED v. SHEN MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

Case Number: 2:2005cv04730
Filed: September 1, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: NORMA L. SHAPIRO
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHEN MANUFACTURING CO., INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE MEMORANDUM FILED THIS DAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 6/25/09. 6/26/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 4, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHEN MANUFACTURING CO., INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF 3/18/09 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 6/4/09. 6/5/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 27, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THE SHEN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. RHL'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT III OF SHEN'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM IS GRANTED WITH REGARD TO RHL'S UNITED STATES TRADEMARK REGISTRATION NOS. 2,728,529 (RITZ PARIS WITH CREST DESIGN FOR FABRICS) AND 2,895,080 (RITZ PARIS FOR LINOLEUM AND WALL COVERINGS). SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 4/27/09. 4/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 18, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT SHEN MANUFACTURING CO., INC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT I OF ITS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM FOR CANCELLATION IS GRANTED AS TO THE FOLLOWING THE RITZ HOTEL, LTD. ("RHL") U.S. TRADEMARK REGISTRATION S: 2,731,375 - RITZ PARIS (LEATHER); 2,791,094 - RITZ PARIS (LAMPS); 2,974,982 - PUTTING ON THE RITZ (SHOWER CURTAINS). THE DIRECTOR OF THE U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE IS DIRECTED TO CANCEL THESE REGISTRATIONS. SHEN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUM MARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT I OF ITS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM FOR CANCELLATION IS DENIED AS TO THE FOLLOWING RHL U.S. TRADEMARK REGISTRATIONS: 2,669,712 - RITZ ESCOFFIER (SPECIALTY FOODS), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 3/17/09. 3/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 10, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE RITZ HOTEL, LTD'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT III OF SHEN'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED AS MOOT, IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 3/9/09. 3/11/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE RITZ HOTEL, LIMITED v. SHEN MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?