STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. LINCOW et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv05368
Filed: October 13, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C. ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2014 1158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE SURREPLY BRIEF (DOC. NO. 1155 ), IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MARK JUDGMENT SATISFIED IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/16/2014. 7/16/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SES AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
November 30, 2010 1068 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION IS GRANTED, ETC. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 11/30/10. ) 12/1/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 3, 2010 1039 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION (D0C $613) IS DENIED. PLFFS' MOTION TO ALTER AND AMEND THE JUDGMENT (DOC #615) IS GRANTED. PLFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (DOC #616) IS GRANTED. PLFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY (DOC #955) IS GRANTED. PLFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE (DOC #958) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/10. ) 6/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
December 1, 2009 942 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF LAWRENCE FORMAN, D.O. (DOC #924) IS GRANTED, ETC. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/1/09. ) 12/2/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 20, 2009 827 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION (DOC #786) IS GRANTRED AND PLFFS ARE PERMITTED TO EMPLOY A PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER TO SERVE ANY AND ALL WRITS OF EXECUTION IN THIS MATTER. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/20/09. ) 8/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. LINCOW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?