BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC et al v. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC and Blackwater Lodge and Training Center, Inc. alleged that defendants Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company, Fidelity and Casualty Company of New York, and Liberty Insurance Underwriters breached their insurance contracts with plaintiffs by failing to indemnify plaintiff for defense costs and expenses in Nordan v. Blackwater Security Consulting LLC, et al..

Plaintiff: BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC. and BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC
Defendant: CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY and LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS
Case Number: 2:2005cv06020
Filed: November 16, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B. TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RE-SCHEDULED FOR 9/5/08 AT 11:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/14/08. 7/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 30, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS NEED NOT RESPOND TO WESTCHESTER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNTIL APRIL 4, 2008. ( RESPONSES DUE BY 4/4/2008.). SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/14/2008. 7/1/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ap, ) Modified on 7/1/2008 (afm, ).
May 27, 2008 88 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE BOTH DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND DEFENDANT'S SUR-REPLY SHALL BE STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD AND WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 5/27/08.5/28/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 16, 2008 87
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC D. FREED on behalf of WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(FREED, ERIC)
April 14, 2008 86
NOTICE by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC. Stipulation of Plaintiffs and Ace/Westchester (CARTY, CAROL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/15/2008 (nd).
March 17, 2008 85
STIPULATION Enlarging Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Westchester's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum of Law and Written Discovery by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC.. (CARTY, CAROL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 3/18/2008 (nd).
March 12, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY SHALL BE STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD AND WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED BY THE COURT. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/11/08. 3/12/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 31, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY IS DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT EVANSTON'S COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST THE PLAINTIFF IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE DUTY TO DEFEND IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. EACH PARTY IS TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 1/31/08. 1/31/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 28, 2008 78
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL F. SCHLEIGH on behalf of WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL)
December 14, 2007 77
STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims Between Plaintiffs and Evanston Insurance Company by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (BURNS, FRANCIS) Modified on 12/20/2007 (fh)
December 5, 2007 76
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN A. COZEN on behalf of WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(COZEN, STEPHEN)
November 15, 2007 75
AMENDED DOCUMENT by LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS. Amendment to 38 Statement Pursuant to L.R. 7.1. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
October 29, 2007 74
RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC., Certificate of Service. (CARTY, CAROL) Modified on 11/1/2007 (fh)
October 22, 2007 73
RESPONSE in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Strike 70 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Summary Judgment filed by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC.. (CARTY, CAROL) (Document stricken from the Record pursuant to Court Order (#84)) Modified on 3/12/2008 (fdc, ).
September 12, 2007 70
RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment against BLACKWATER Sur-Reply to Liberty's Motion filed by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC., Certificate of Service. (CARTY, CAROL) Modified on 9/13/2007 (ac, ). (Document stricken from the Record pursuant to Court Order (#84)) Modified on 3/12/2008 (fdc, ).
September 10, 2007 68
REPLY to Response to Motion re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Evanston Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (BURNS, FRANCIS) Modified on 9/11/2007 (afm, ).
September 7, 2007 66
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/4/07. 9/7/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 31, 2007 65
REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Westchester filed by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC.. (CARTY, CAROL)
August 8, 2007 56 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH RESPONSE BRIEFS, REPLY BRIEFS AND SUR REPLY BRIEFS MUST BE FILED SHALL BE EXTENDED AS FOLLOWS: RESPONSE BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DUE 8/10/07. REPLY BRIEF OF PLAINTIFFS IS DUE 8/31/07. SUR REPLY BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS IS DUE 9/12/07. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/3/07. 8/8/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 24, 2007 54
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL F. SCHLEIGH on behalf of WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2007 50
NOTICE of Appearance by CAROL CHOATE CARTY on behalf of BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC. with Certificate of Service(CARTY, CAROL)
July 6, 2007 49
NOTICE OF WITHDRAW OF COUNSEL by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC AND BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC. (BARTLE, HARVEY) Modified on 7/9/2007 (afm, ).
June 27, 2007 48
NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE J. ROSENBLUM on behalf of FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK with Certificate of Service(ROSENBLUM, NICOLE)
June 1, 2007 47
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/27/2007 09:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER.(adr)
March 30, 2007 46 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC'S MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF HOWARD T. WEIR, III, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/27/07.3/30/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2007 (fdc, ).
March 27, 2007 45
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, Certificate of Service.(fdc)
March 26, 2007 43 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT EVANSTON'S MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF L.D. SIMMONS, II AND BRIAN A. KAHN ARE GRANTED. L.D. SIMMONS, II, ESQ AND BRIAN A. KAHN, ESQ. ARE ADMITTED IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL PRO HA VICE FOR EVANSTON. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/22/07. ) 3/26/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, )
March 22, 2007 41
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Howard T. Weir, III filed by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC.STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(fdc)
March 20, 2007 40
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by all plaintiffs.(BARTLE, HARVEY)
March 15, 2007 38
Statement Pursuant to L.R. 7.1 by LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
March 12, 2007 37
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Paul Vitrano and substitution of Appearance of Thomas T. Locke and Rebecca Woods as counsel for Defendant Fidelity and Casualty Company of New York, Certificate of Service. (fdc)
March 9, 2007 36
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca Woods, Esquire filed by FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK.Certificate of Service.(CARLSON, MICHAEL)
March 7, 2007 34
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK.(CARLSON, MICHAEL)
March 6, 2007 33
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK.(CARLSON, MICHAEL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY) Modified on 3/7/2007 (np).
March 5, 2007 32 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDA ARE GRANTED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 2/28/07.3/6/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 27, 2007 31
MOTION to Substitute Party and Notice of Hearing filed by FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CARLSON, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2007 30
NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD P. SCHILLER on behalf of FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK with Certificate of Service(SCHILLER, RONALD)
May 31, 2006 28
DEFENDANT, WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2006 (fdc, ).
May 8, 2006 24 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE BY 5/12/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 5/3/06. 5/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc) (mk, ).
May 4, 2006 23
Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim of Evanston Insurance Company by BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC..(BARTLE, HARVEY)
May 1, 2006 22
DEFENDANT, WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY'S Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, Certificate of Service. (fdc)
April 17, 2006 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY'S COUNTERCLAIM IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDES THURSDAY, MAY 4, 2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 4/17/06. 4/17/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(mac, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2006 (fdc, ).
March 31, 2006 18
APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (BURNS, FRANCIS)
March 16, 2006 17
ANSWER to Complaint, with COUNTERCLAIMS against all plaintiffs by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Certificate of Service.(BURNS, FRANCIS) Modified on 3/17/2006 (md).
March 14, 2006 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDES 3/16/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/14/06. 3/15/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(fdc) (mk, ).
March 9, 2006 15
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (BURNS, FRANCIS) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 3/10/2006 (np).
February 23, 2006 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 2/21/2006 TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 2/22/06. 2/23/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc) (mk, ).
February 21, 2006 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT, WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY MUST FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 2/9/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 2/17/06. 2/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(fdc) (mk, ).
February 17, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, LIBERTY INTERNATIONL UNDERWRITERS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 2/21/2006 TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 2/9/06. 2/17/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc) (mk, ).
February 10, 2006 8
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint Until February 21, 2006 by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC., FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK. (VITRANO, PAUL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/14/2006 (np).
February 9, 2006 7
Answer to Complaint by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(fdc)
February 6, 2006 5
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint by LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS. (SULLIVAN, JOHN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/7/2006 (np).
January 27, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/30/2006; DEFENDANT FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 2/15/2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 1/27/06. 1/30/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (jpd)
December 20, 2005 2
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. DALY, FRANCIS J. DEASEY on behalf of WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY with jury demand (fdc, )
November 16, 2005 1
COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 923368.), filed by BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC, BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC..(ks, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC et al v. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT CARLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEPHEN A. COZEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS
Represented By: JOHN C. SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLACKWATER LODGE AND TRAINING CENTER, INC.
Represented By: DENNIS J. VALENZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLACKWATER SECURITY CONSULTING, LLC
Represented By: HOWARD T. WEIR, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?