MEIJER, INC. et al v. EASTERN MUSHROOM MARKETING COOPERATIVE, INC. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00677
Filed: February 14, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: THOMAS N. ONEILL
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/14/14. 10/14/14 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 22, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE OBJECTIONS OF M.D. BASCIANI AND BFI ARE OVERRULED AND THE ORDER DATED 8/21/2012 IS AFFIRMED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/22/2012. 10/22/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
January 31, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL CERTAIN DISCOVERY FROM NON-PARTY BASCIANI FOODS, INC. IS GRANTED. BFI'S MOTION TO QUASH IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/31/12. 2/1/12 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 26, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF CAPPER-VOLSTEAD EXEMPTION FILED BY THE EMMC, THE MUSHROOM ALLIANCE, INC., KITCHEN PRIDE MUSHROOMS AND M.D. BASCIANI & SONS, INC. ARE DENIED. PLAINTIFFS CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMAR Y JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF CAPPER-VOLSTEAD IMMUNITY IS GRANTED. ALL OTHER MOTIONS TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS UNRELATED TO CAPPER-VOLSTEAD IMMUNITY ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE IS DISMISSED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 3/26/09. 3/26/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEIJER, INC. et al v. EASTERN MUSHROOM MARKETING COOPERATIVE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?