REYNOLDS et al v. THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv01237
Filed: March 22, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: THOMAS N. ONEILL
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL IS DENEID; THE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW IS GRANTED, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE JUDGMENT ENTERED 6/22/2010 IS VACATED AND JUDGEMENT IS ENTER ED IN FAVOR OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA AND AGAINST FRANK REYNOLDS; THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND THE JUDGEMENT TO ADD PREJUDGEMENT INTEREST IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/25/2010. 10/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
June 2, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO ANURAG HARSH IS DENIED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 6/2/10. 6/2/10 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 27, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE JUDGMENT ENTERED 10/6/09 IS VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW IS DENIED AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL IS GRANTED. TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 3/15/10 AT 10:00 IN COURTROOM 4A. ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE OR OTHER MATTERS REQUIRING THE COURT'S ATTENTION SHOULD BE FILED BY 2/16/10; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/27/10. 1/27/10 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REYNOLDS et al v. THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?