HOFMANN v. PHILADELPHIA EAGLES et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: JOY HOFMANN
Defendant: PENN SPORTSERVICE,INC., PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB, SPORTSERVICE CORPORATION, DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES and EAGLES STADIUM OPERATOR, LLC
Cross Defendant: DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES, PENN SPORTSERVICE,INC. and SPORTSERVICE CORPORATION
Cross Claimant: EAGLES STADIUM OPERATOR, LLC and PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB
Case Number: 2:2006cv01252
Filed: March 23, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2006 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL. SIGNED BY JUDGE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/5/06. 9/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jpd)
June 30, 2006 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE IN ROOM 4006, ON SEPTEMBER 5, 2006, COMMENCNG AT 10:00 A.M. SIGNED BY JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 06/30/06. 06/30/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ac, )
June 14, 2006 16
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/30/2006 at 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. Copies of notice mailed to counsel by chambers.(sah)
June 13, 2006 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/3/2006. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANY DAUBERT MOTIONS OR OTHER DISPOSITVE MOTION DUE BY 1/19/2007. THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL ON MONDAY, JANUARY 29, 2007 AT 4:30 P.M.. SIGNED BY JUDGE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/13/06. 6/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mac, )
June 9, 2006 9
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SPORTSERVICE CORPORATION, DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES.(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE)
May 10, 2006 8
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. TYRRELL on behalf of EAGLES STADIUM OPERATOR, LLC, PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (TYRRELL, JOHN)
May 5, 2006 7
NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW on behalf of PENN SPORTSERVICE,INC., DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES with Certificate of Service (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE)
May 2, 2006 6
NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/7/2006 04:30 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE THE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THE CALL. JUDGE MCLAUGHLIN'S CHAMBERS TELEPHONE NUMBER IS 267-299-7600.(cps, )
April 24, 2006 2
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against EAGLES STADIUM OPERATOR, LLC, PENN SPORTSERVICE,INC., PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB, SPORTSERVICE CORPORATION, DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES , filed by JOY HOFMANN.(mac, ) Modified on 4/25/2006 (mac, ).
March 23, 2006 1
COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA EAGLES, SPORTSERVICE CORPORATION, DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 926918.), filed by JOY HOFMANN.(ti, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2006 (mac, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOFMANN v. PHILADELPHIA EAGLES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PENN SPORTSERVICE,INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: SPORTSERVICE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN SPORTSERVICE,INC.
Represented By: GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB
Represented By: JOHN E. TYRRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPORTSERVICE CORPORATION
Represented By: GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES
Represented By: GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLES STADIUM OPERATOR, LLC
Represented By: JOHN E. TYRRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: EAGLES STADIUM OPERATOR, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCSTRAVICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCSTRAVICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOY HOFMANN
Represented By: DANIEL S. SWEETSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?