ALL AMERICAN MUSHROOM, INC. v. EASTERN MUSHROOM MARKETING COOPERATIVE, INC. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv01464
Filed: April 6, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: THOMAS N. ONEILL
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION IS DENIED TO THE EXTENT THAT IT SEEKS RECONSIDERATION OF MY DECISION OF 3/26/2009. THIS ORDER DENYING RECONSIDERATION OF MY DECISION OF 3/26/2009 IS CERTIFIED FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) BECAUSE IT INVOLVES CONTROLLING QUESTIONS OF LAW AS TO WHICH THERE IS SUBSTANTIAL GROUND FOR DIFFERENCE OF OPINION AND BECAUSE AN IMMEDIATE APPEAL FROM THIS ORDER MAY MATERIALLY ADVANCE THE ULTIMATE TERMINATION OF THE LITIGATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/14/14. 10/15/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 10/15/2014 (ti, ). (Main Document 104 replaced on 10/15/2014) (ti, ).
October 22, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE OBJECTIONS OF M.D. BASCIANI AND BFI ARE OVERRULED AND THE ORDER DATED 8/21/2012 IS AFFIRMED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/22/2012. 10/22/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
January 31, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED AND BFI'S MOTION TO QUASH IS DENIED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/31/12. 2/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
March 26, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF CAPPER-VOLSTEAD EXEMPTION FILED BY THE EMMC, THE MUSHROOM ALLIANCE, INC., KITHCEN PRIDE MUSHROOMS AND, M.D. BASCIANI & SONS, INC., JM FARMS, FRANKLIN FARMS, INC. ARE DENIED. P LAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF CAPPER-VOLSTEAD IMMUNITY IS GRANTED. ALL OTHER MOTIONS TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS UNRELATED TO CAPPER-VOLSTEAD IMMUNITY ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 3/26/09. 3/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALL AMERICAN MUSHROOM, INC. v. EASTERN MUSHROOM MARKETING COOPERATIVE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?