DIMEO v. MAX Featured Case

Plaintiff Anthony DiMeo, III alleged that defendant Tucker Max published defamatory statements about himn at www.tuckermax.com.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: ANTHONY DIMEO, III
Defendant: TUCKER MAX
Case Number: 2:2006cv01544
Filed: April 12, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: STEWART DALZELL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0151 Communications Act of 1934
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2006 17
Copy of TPO Form re: Notice of Appeal. (ac, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2007 (jl, ).
June 22, 2006 16
Clerk's Notice to USCA re: Notice of Appeal. (ac, )
May 25, 2006 12 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO REMAND IS DENIED AND DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ON 05/25/06. 05/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS 05/25/06.(ac, )
May 12, 2006 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE REQUEST FOR A HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS IS DENIED. BY NOON ON MAY 12, 2006, PLAINTIFF MAY SUBMIT A CONSOLIDATED SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM NO TO EXCEED TEN PAGES IN LENGTH. SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ON 05/10/06. 05/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS 05/10/06.(ac, )
May 8, 2006 9
Deft's OPPOSITON to Plff's Petition for Remand to the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County and STAY Deft's Pending Motion to Dismiss filed by TUCKER MAX. Cert. of Service. (pr, )
May 3, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT BY NOON ON 5/9/06, DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND BY THE SAME TIME AND DATE, DEFENDANT MAY FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ON 5/3/06. 5/4/06 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(jl, )
April 30, 2006 5
RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION to Dismiss proposed Order filed by ANTHONY DIMEO, III. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
April 12, 2006 1
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TUCKER MAX from Philadelphia CCP, case number March 2006 No. 1576. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 927450-51), Certificate of Service. (tj, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2006 (tj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIMEO v. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY DIMEO, III
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUCKER MAX
Represented By: MICHAEL K. TWERSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?