KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC vs. CEPHALON, INC., ET AL

Case Number: 2:2006cv01797
Filed: April 27, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 1006 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE BASED UPON DEFENDANTS INVOCATION OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILGE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/22/16. 1/22/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 17, 2015 946 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD AND RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON THEIR RULE 23 (f) APPEAL IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO THE DIRECT PURCHASERS AND APOTEX; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/17/15. 12/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 14, 2015 930 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE "GENERIC DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE 'FRAUDULENT PATENT' THEORY FROM PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM", WHICH I CONSTRUED AS A MOTION TO ESTABLISH THE LEGAL STANDARD THAT WILL GOVERN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS AT TRIAL, AND THE RESPONSES THERETO, AND FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS' MOTION IS GRANTED, SUCH THAT PLAINTIFFS' MAY NOT ARGUE A PER SE THEORY OF LIABILITY BASED ON THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS' "KNOWLEDGE OF FRAUD" AT TRIAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/15. 12/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gs)
November 5, 2015 888 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF MR. STONER AND DRS. COOPER IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CEPHALON'S EXPERT OPINIONS ON I NFRINGEMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFF APOTEX, INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION NO.1 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE FTC'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CEPHALON'S TEN PATENT EXPERTS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/5/15. 11/5/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 5, 2015 862 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF GREGORY BELL AND DIRECT PURSCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS AND PROPOSED TRIAL TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS JERRY HAUSMAN AND EDWARD SNYDER ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/5/15. 10/5/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 27, 2015 830 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE "KING DRUG DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS (DOC. NO. 662) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/27/2015. 7/27/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
January 28, 2015 737 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, BARR AND TEVA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS IS DENIED. MOTION OF THE MYLAN DEFENDANTS ON ALL CLAIMS UNDER FTC VS ACTAVIS IS DENIED.RANBAXY DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/15. 1/28/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 23, 2014 706 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FILED BY CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE MOTION FILED BY THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/23/2014. 6/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
March 13, 2014 601 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE PATENT ISSUES IS GRANTED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/13/14. 3/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 9, 2014 581 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DIRECT PURCHAER PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/9/14. 1/9/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
September 11, 2013 517 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO COMPEL FILED BY THE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. CEPHALON, INC. SHALL PRODUCE AN UNREDACTED VERSION OF CHALLENGE NO.20 WITHIN TEN DAYS; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/11/13. 9/11/13 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, )
July 5, 2011 425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF KING DRUG DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO COMPEL BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHHELD ON PRIVILEGE GROUNDS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/5/11. 7/5/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 29, 2010 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE DIRECT PURCHASERS' FIRST CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THE RITE AID COMPLAINT; GENERIC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINTS OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS A ND END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS; DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE WALGREEN COMPLAINT AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FILED BY WALGREEN CO., ET AL ARE DENIED. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS ON OR BEFORE 4/19/10. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SHEDULED FOR 10:00 ON 4/22/10; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/10. 3/29/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS.(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC vs. CEPHALON, INC., ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?