VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. v. CEPHALON, INC. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv01833
Filed: May 1, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2015 527 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON THE RULE 23(f) APPEAL IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK 06-1833 CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/17/2015. 12/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 14, 2015 520 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE FRAUDULENT PATENT THEORY FROM PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/2015. 12/15/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 5, 2015 486 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF MR. STONER AND DRS. COOPER AND BARANSKI ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/5/2015. 11/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
October 5, 2015 468 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' JOINT MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/5/2015. 10/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 10, 2015 438 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/10/2015. 6/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 28, 2015 389 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/2015. 1/28/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 23, 2014 367 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FILED BY CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN, AND THE MOTION FILED BY THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/23/2014. 6/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 13, 2014 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE END PAYOR CLASS PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED IN THE OPION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/13/2014. 3/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 29, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (DOC. #86); AND "GENERIC DEFENDANTS'" MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINTS (DOC. #87) ARE GRANTE D IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS ON OR BEFORE 4/19/2010; A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10:00 A.M., ON THURSDAY, 4/22/2010 IN A COURTROOM TO BE ASSIGNED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/2010. 3/29/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(tomg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. v. CEPHALON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?