BROWN v. NUTRITION MANAGEMENT SERVICES CO. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02034
Filed: May 15, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: NORMA L. SHAPIRO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family Medical Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2010 264 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 7/22/10. 7/22/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 30, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 172 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART FOR REASONS STATED IN THE MEMORANDUM., THE JUDGMENT WILL BE AMENDED TO AWARD PLAINTIFF $6,655.82 IN INTEREST AND $80,655.82 IN LIQUIDATED DAMAGES., THE JUDGMENT WILL NOT BE AMENDED TO AWARD PLAINTIFF FRONT PAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 1/30/09. 2/2/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 26, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 173 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART FOR REASONS STATED IN ATTACHED MEMORANDUM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED A TOTAL OF $145,104 IN ATTORNEY'S FEES AND $11,639.81 IN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 1/26/09. 1/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 21, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART FOR REASONS STATED IN THE ATTACHED MEMORANDUM., THE JUDGMENT WILL BE AMENDED TO AWARD PLAINTIFF $6,655.82 IN INTEREST AND $80,655.82 IN LIQUIDATED DAMAGES., THE JUDGMENT WILL NOT BE AMENDED TO AWARD PLAINTIFF FRONT PAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NORMA L. SHAPIRO ON 1/21/09. 1/22/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. NUTRITION MANAGEMENT SERVICES CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?