FELDMAN v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case

Plaintiff Lawrence Feldman d/b/a Lawrence Feldman & Associates alleges that he contracted with Google to purchase advertisements on the Internet, and that Google breached the contract and violated other laws by overcharging him for those ads.

Plaintiff: LAWRENCE FELDMAN
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2006cv02540
Filed: June 14, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JAMES T. GILES
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2009 27 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SWISS REAL ESTATE INTERNATIONAL HOLDING IS STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S TIME WITHIN WHICH TO SERVE THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT SACHO TODOROV DERMENDJIEV IS EXTENDED BY 60 DAYS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/30/09. 11/2/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(FILED IN ERROR)(stb, ) Modified on 11/2/2009 (stb, ).
May 10, 2007 Copy of Letter from U.S. District Court No. Dist. of CA. at San Jose acknowledging receipt of reord on 5/7/07. (fdc)
April 30, 2007 Original record together with certified copy of docket entries forwarded to U.S. District Court Northern District of California at San Jose. (fdc)
April 3, 2007 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GOOGLE, INC.(fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2007 (bj, ).
March 29, 2007 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ATTACHED MEMORANDUM. ACCORDINGLY, THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, SAN JOSE DIVISION. SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES ON 3/28/07. (Attachments: # 1 order) 3/29/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 26, 2007 24 Plaintiff's Reply to Google's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Certificate of Service. (fdc)
January 8, 2007 23 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Certificate of Service)(LINDY, JEFFREY)
January 3, 2007 22 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. SHALL HAVE UNTIL 1/8/07 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES ON 1/3/07. 1/3/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (fdc, ).
December 26, 2006 21 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by LAWRENCE FELDMAN, Certificate of Service. (ac, )
December 12, 2006 20 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE TEN (10) DAYS IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES ON 12/11/06.12/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (fdc)
December 6, 2006 19 PLAINTIFF, LAWRENCE FELDMAN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (bj, ).
November 21, 2006 18 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF, LAWRENCE E. FELDMAN. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED.(nda, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2006 (llk, ).
November 20, 2006 17 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES ON 11/17/06. 11/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc)
November 16, 2006 16 Memorandum in Support re 8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Certificate of Service)(LINDY, JEFFREY)
November 9, 2006 15 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(c) and Consolidated Memorandum of Law filed by GOOGLE, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order # 4 Certificate of Good Faith# 5 Certificate of Service)(LINDY, JEFFREY)
November 6, 2006 14 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 11/1/06 before Judge Giles. (fdc)
November 2, 2006 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JAMES T. GILES : Hearing - Oral Argument held on 11/1/06 at 3:00 pm. (fdc)
November 2, 2006 12 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL PROVIDE TO THE COURT INFORMATION SPECIFIED BY THE COURT AT ORAL ARGUMENT WITHIN FIFTEEN (15) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THE ORAL ARGUMENT. THE COURT SHALL THEN CONSIDER THE AFOREMENTIONED MOTION TO DISMISS AS A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DECIDE THE MATTER ACCORDINGLY. THE PARTIES ARE NOT REQUIRED TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH FURTHER ARGUMENT. SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES ON 11/2/06. 11/2/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
October 13, 2006 11 Featured Case ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENTS SHALL BE HELD ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS ON 11/1/2006 AT 3:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JAMES T. GILES. SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES ON 10/12/06. 10/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
September 22, 2006 10 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Google's MOTION to Dismiss filed by LAWRENCE FELDMAN. Certificate of Service.(jjf, )
September 13, 2006 9 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Google's Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer, Certificate of Service. (fdc) Modified on 9/14/2006 (fdc, ).
August 28, 2006 8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by GOOGLE, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Text of Proposed Order One# 3 Text of Proposed Order Alternative# 4 Certificate of Service# 5 Exhibit A)(LINDY, JEFFREY)
August 23, 2006 7 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer the complaint. GOOGLE, INC. answer due 8/30/2006, with Clerk's approval. (fdc, )
August 9, 2006 6 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. , filed by LAWRENCE FELDMAN.(fdc, )
August 4, 2006 5 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER SHALL HAVE UNTIL 8/9/06 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES ON 8/4/06. 8/4/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(fdc)
July 28, 2006 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jcz, )
July 10, 2006 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by GOOGLE, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(LINDY, JEFFREY)
June 30, 2006 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GOOGLE, INC.. (LINDY, JEFFREY)
June 14, 2006 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GOOGLE, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number March Term 2006 No. 000735. Certificate of Service, (Filing fee $350 receipt number 929730) (ks, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2006 (bj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FELDMAN v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY M. LINDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE FELDMAN
Represented By: LAWRENCE E. FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?