APOTEX, INC. v. CEPHALON, INC. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02768
Filed: June 26, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2017 1197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT THE LIABILITY PORTION OF THE UPCOMING TRIAL WILL BE DIVEDED INTO TWO PHASES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/8/2017. 6/8/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
May 31, 2017 1165 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-10 (DOC. NO. 963 ), ARE DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/31/2017. 5/31/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
May 19, 2017 1136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF APOTEX, INC.'S EXPERT DR. HAL SINGER, IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION IS GRANTED SUCH THAT DR. SINGER'S DAMAGES CALCULATIONS 2 AND 3 ARE EXCLUDED. THE MOTION IS DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/18/2017. 5/19/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
December 17, 2015 997 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD. AND RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (DOC. NO. 923 ), IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO THE DIRECT PURCHASERS AND APOTEX. IN LIGHT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE PARTIES, THE MOTION IS GRANTED WITH RESPECT TO THE END PAYORS ONLY AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK C.A. NO. 06-1833 CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THAT MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/17/2015. 12/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
December 14, 2015 982 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE (DOC. NO. 956 ), IS GRANTED, SUCH THAT PLAINTIFFS' MAY NOT ARGUE A PER SE THEORY OF LIABILITY BASED ON THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS' "KNOWLEDGE OF FRAUD" AT TRIAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/2015. 12/14/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
November 5, 2015 942 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF MR. STONER AND DRS. COOPER AND BARANSKI IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION TO EXCLUDE CEPHALON'S EXPERT OPINIONS ON INFRINGEMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, AND THE MOTI ON NO. 1 OF PLAINTIFF APOTEX, INC IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CEPHALON'S TEN PATENT EXPERTS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/5/2015. 11/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
October 5, 2015 917 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF GREGORY K. BELL (DOC. NO. 697 ), IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/5/2015. 10/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 28, 2015 844 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS OUTLINED HEREIN ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/2015. 1/28/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
October 2, 2014 812 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF APOTEX, INC.'S FED. R. EVID. 701 WITNESS, GORDON FAHNER (DOC. NO. 683 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/1/2014. 10/2/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
October 1, 2014 811 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/1/2014. 10/2/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Main Document 811 replaced on 10/2/2014) (amas, ).
June 23, 2014 793 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS OUTLINED HEREIN FILED BY CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED. THE MOTION OUTLINED HEREIN FILED BY THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/23/2014. 6/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 13, 2014 675 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DIRECT PURCHASERS' MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART, AS OUTLINED IN THE OPINION. THE END PAYORS' MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART, AS OUTLINED IN THE OPINION. APOTEX'S MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART, AS OUTLINED IN THE OPINION. THE MONOPOLY POWER PORTION OF APOTEX'S MOTION WILL BE RESOLVED SEPARATELY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/13/2014. 3/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 28, 2012 547 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFT CEPHALON, INC'S MOTION TO PRECLIUDE (DOC #465) IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFT CEPHALON, INC'S MOTION FOR AN ADVERSE INFERENCE (DOC #468) AND (DOC#470) ARE DENIED; AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLFF, APOTEX, INC. AS TO COUNT I II OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC #195), ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/28/12. ) 3/29/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 3/29/2012 (gn, ). Modified on 3/29/2012 (afm, ). (DUPLICATE FILING OF ORDER #546)
November 7, 2011 516 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/7/11. ) 11/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 31, 2011 514 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFT CEPHALON, INC,'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PARTIAL FINDINGS (DOC #449) IS DENIED. UNITED STATES REISSUE PATENT NUMBER RE 37,516 IS DECLARED INVALID AND UNENFORCEABLE. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLFF, APOTEX, INC., AS TO COUNTS I AND II OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC #195). ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/31/11. ) 10/31/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 7, 2010 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DISPUTED CLAIM TERMS "ABOUT 95% OF THE CUMULATIVE TOTAL OF MODAFINIL PARTICLES IN SAID COMPOSITION" MEAN: APPROXIMATELY 95% OF THE AGGREGATE OF THE INDIVIDUAL PERCENT VALUES FOR ALL MEASURABLE PARTICLES IN THE COMPOSITION BASED ON A VOLUME DISTRIBUTION, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/6/10. ) 10/7/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 29, 2010 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS FOLLOWS: IN THE APOTEX LITIGATION 06-2768, DEFT CEPHALON, INC,'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNST III THROUGH XIII OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC #157) AND GENERIC DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS APOTEX'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC #158) AR E DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFTS SHALL FILE ANSWERS TO PLFFS' COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 4/19/10. A FULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 4/22/10 AT 10:00AM, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/10. ) 3/29/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 23, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFT CEPHALON INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO COUNTS III - V OF PLFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED. CEPHALON, INC. SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO COUNTS I - V OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 3/8/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/23/2010. 2/24/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ems) (Main Document 205 replaced on 3/2/2010) (ems, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APOTEX, INC. v. CEPHALON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?