LASSOFF v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case

Plaintiff Samuel Lassoff sued defendants Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. and IAC Interactive Corporation for fraud, breach of contract, negligence, unjust enrichment, and unfair business practices. Plaintiff Samuel Lassoff alleges that defendants engaged in a scheme to hide its negligent handling of plaintiff\'s advertising account and never warned plaintiffs of fraudulent clicks or made any recovery efforts for the plaintiffs.

Plaintiff: SAMUEL LASSOFF
Defendant: YAHOO!, INC.
Case Number: 2:2006cv03542
Filed: August 10, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2007 32
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO Yahoo, Inc. filed by SAMUEL LASSOFF..(LASSOFF, SAMUEL) Modified on 5/18/2007 (afm, ).
May 3, 2007 31
RESPONSE in Support re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), (3) and (6) filed by YAHOO!, INC., Certificate of Service. (PALUMBOS, ROBERT) Modified on 5/4/2007 (np).
April 27, 2007 30
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SAMUEL LASSOFF As To IAC Interactive Corp(LASSOFF, SAMUEL)
April 20, 2007 28
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SAMUEL LASSOFF As To Google, Inc.(LASSOFF, SAMUEL)
April 3, 2007 26
Disclosure Statement Form filed by GOOGLE, INC.(mac, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2007 (bj, ).
March 22, 2007 23 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DENNIS L. WILSON, ESQUIRE TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/22/07.3/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(mac, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2007 (mac, ).
March 21, 2007 21
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. PALUMBOS on behalf of YAHOO!, INC. with Certificate of Service(PALUMBOS, ROBERT)
March 8, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER BE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TWENTY (20) DAYS IN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.'S FIRST MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY JUDGE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/8/07. 3/8/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (ac, ).
March 6, 2007 17
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAMUEL LASSOFF, ANSWER DUE 4/30/07 FOR IAC INTERACTIVE CORP. (LASSOFF, SAMUEL) Modified on 3/7/2007 (afm, ).
February 23, 2007 16
STIPULATION re 14 Stipulation by SAMUEL LASSOFF. (LASSOFF, SAMUEL) Modified on 3/7/2007 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
February 15, 2007 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S LETTER REQUESTING AND EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO ANSWER THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. YAHOO SHALL RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MARCH 23, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/15/07. 2/16/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mac, )
January 29, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL INFORM THE COURT WITHIN TWO WEEKS WHETHER SERVICE HAS BEEN MADE ON THE DEFENDANTS ADDED BY HIS AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND IF SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN MADE, WHEN HE INTENDS TO EFFECT SERVICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/26/07. 1/29/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mac, )
January 19, 2007 11
AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against IAC INTERACTIVE CORP, YAHOO!, INC., GOOGLE, INC. , filed by SAMUEL LASSOFF.(mac, )
January 16, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. . SIGNED BY JUDGE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/12/07.1/17/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (lvj, )
January 12, 2007 8
AMENDED DOCUMENT by SAMUEL LASSOFF. Amendment to 1 Complaint, [7] Status Conference. (LASSOFF, SAMUEL) Modified on 1/16/2007 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, WILL SEND IN ORIGINAL DOCUMENT)
November 15, 2006 6
NOTICE of Hearing:RULE 16 STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/8/2007 04:30 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS, ROOM 13614, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA, BEFORE THE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN. (cps, )
September 26, 2006 3
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAMUEL LASSOFF. GOOGLE, INC. waiver sent on 8/16/2006, answer due 10/16/2006. (LASSOFF, SAMUEL)
August 10, 2006 1
COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 931391.), filed by SAMUEL LASSOFF.(ti, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2006 (bj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LASSOFF v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL LASSOFF
Represented By: SAMUEL JARRAD LASSOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YAHOO!, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT M. PALUMBOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?