CARFAGNO et al v. THE PHILLIES Featured Case

Plaintiff: KATHERINE M. CARFAGNO and MARK A. CARFAGNO
Defendant: THE PHILLIES
Case Number: 2:2006cv03737
Filed: August 23, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: LEGROME D. DAVIS
Referring Judge: TIMOTHY R. RICE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2006 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/05/06. 12/05/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(cls, )
October 19, 2006 8
NOTICE of Hearing:SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/4/2006 AT 9:30 A.M. IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. NOTICE FAXED TO COUNSEL ON 10/19/06.(cms)
October 12, 2006 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REFER THIS MATTER TO THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY RICE, FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE DATE AND TIME OF THE CONFERENCE SHALL BE SET BY JUDGE RICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 10/12/06. 10/12/06 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
September 21, 2006 6
Disclosure with Certificate of Service by all plaintiffs.(WOOLLEY, JACQUEINE)
September 20, 2006 5
NOTICE OF HEARING: RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR WEDNESDAY 10/11/2006 03:00 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS ROOM 6614 BEFORE HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS. (cls, )
September 13, 2006 3
ANSWER to Complaint by THE PHILLIES with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (KING, SAMUEL) Modified on 9/15/2006 (np).
August 23, 2006 1
COMPLAINT against THE PHILLIES ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 931721.), filed by MARK A. CARFAGNO, KATHERINE M. CARFAGNO.(tj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARFAGNO et al v. THE PHILLIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE M. CARFAGNO
Represented By: JACQUEINE M. WOOLLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK A. CARFAGNO
Represented By: NANCY O' MARA EZOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PHILLIES
Represented By: RICHARD L. STROUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?