IN RE: METHYL METHACRYLATE (MMA) ANTITRUST LITIGATION - DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE Featured Case

Case Number: 2:2006md01768
Filed: June 21, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2009 186 Featured Case ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH ALL DEFENDANTS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION (DOCKET NO. 179), AND THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES, AND FOR INCENTIVE AWARD PAYMENT FOR CLASS REPRESENTATIVES (DOCKET NO. 184) ECT. ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/23/09. 9/24/9 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kk, )
September 23, 2009 185 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. 9/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kk)
September 21, 2009 184 MOTION for Attorney Fees Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, and for Incentive Award Payments to Class Representatives filed by PLAINTIFF.Certificate of Service.(GRABAR, JOSHUA)
September 18, 2009 183 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF Notice of Filing of Additional Individual Plaintiffs' Firm Delcarations in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursment of Expenses. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Declaration of John K. Weston, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Sohmer)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/21/2009 (tjd).
September 9, 2009 182 Declaration Notice of Filing of Individual Plaintiffs' Firm Delcarations in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursment of Expenses by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Bolognese & Associates, LLC, # 2 Exhibit Berger & Montague, P.C., # 3 Exhibit Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC, # 4 Exhibit Hausfeld LLP, # 5 Exhibit Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC, # 6 Exhibit Barrack Rodos & Bacine, # 7 Exhibit Cafferty Faucher LLP, # 8 Exhibit Cohn Lifland Pearlman Herrmann & Knopf LLP, # 9 Exhibit Criden & Love, P.A., # 10 Exhibit Edelson & Associates, LLC, # 11 Exhibit Fine, Kaplan & Black, R.P.C., # 12 Exhibit Finkelstein Thompson LLP, # 13 Exhibit Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg & Ibes, P.A., # 14 Exhibit The Furth Firm LLP, # 15 Exhibit Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP, # 16 Exhibit Goldman Scarlato & Karon, P.C., # 17 Exhibit Gustafson Gluek PLLC, # 18 Exhibit Hagens Berman Sobol & Shapiro LLP, # 19 Exhibit Heins Mills & Olson, P.L.C., # 20 Exhibit Kaplan, Fox & Kilsheimer LLP, # 21 Exhibit Kohn Swift & Graf, P.C., # 22 Exhibit Law Office of Nathan Neuman, # 23 Exhibit Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P., # 24 Exhibit Meredith Cohen Greenfogel & Skirnick, P.C., # 25 Exhibit Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield, # 26 Exhibit RodaNast, P.C., # 27 Exhibit Sacks & Weston, # 28 Exhibit Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, P.C., # 29 Exhibit Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards, LLC, # 30 Exhibit Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher, LLC)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/10/2009 (tjd).
September 9, 2009 181 Memorandum in Support re 179 MOTION for Approval (Final) of the Proposed Settlements With All Defendants and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Approval (Final) of the Proposed Settlements With All Defendants and Plan of Allocation MOTION for Approval (Final) of the Proposed Settlements With All Defendants and Plan of Allocation Memorandum of Law in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, and For Incentive Award Payments for Class Representatives filed by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-K, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/10/2009 (tjd).
September 9, 2009 180 Declaration Joint Declaration of Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Class Counsel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for: (1) Final Approval of the Proposed Settlements With All Defendants and Proposed Distribution of Approved Settlement Funds; and (2) an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, and For Incentive Award Payments to the Plaintiff Class Representatives by PLAINTIFF. (GRABAR, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2009 179 MOTION for Approval (Final) of the Proposed Settlements With All Defendants and Plan of Allocation filed by PLAINTIFF. Memorandum. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Final Approval of the Proposed Settlements With All Defendants and Plan of Allocation, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlements, # 3 Text of Proposed Order re: Distribution of Approved Settlement Funds)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/10/2009 (tjd).
August 24, 2009 178 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF of Filing of Affidavit of Publication in Wall Street Journal. Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 8/31/2009 (tjd).
August 24, 2009 177 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF of Filing of Affidavit of Edward J. Sincavage. Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 8/24/2009 (nd). Modified on 8/31/2009 (tjd).
August 17, 2009 176 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF Of Filing Of Request For Exclusion of Singapore Methyl Methacrylate Pte. Ltd.. Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 8/18/2009 (tjd).
June 24, 2009 175 Featured Case ORDER THAT DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH ALL DEFENDANTS IS GRANTED AND THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT IS PRELIMINARILY APPROVED; THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SEPARATE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS WITH THE LISTED DEFENDANTS IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC.; NO LATER THAN AUGUST 24, 2009 CLASS COUNSEL SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF COURT AND SERVED UPON COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AFFIDAVITS OR DECLARATIONS OF THE PERSON UNDER WHOSE GENERAL DIRECTION THE MAILING OF THE NOTICE AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE SUMMARY NOTICE WERE MADE, ETC.; ALL REQUESTS FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE SETTLEMENT CLASS MUST BE RECEIVED ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 31, 2009, ETC.; ANY MEMBER OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS WHO OBJECTS TO THE SETTLEMENT MUST DO SO ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 31, 2009; NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 9, 2009 CLASS COUNSEL SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED DISTRIBUTION OF THE SETTLEMENT FUNDS, ETC.; A FINAL APPROVAL HEARING PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 23(e) WILL BE HELD ON SEPTEMBER 23, 2009; ANYONE WISHING TO APPEAL AND TO BE HEARD AT THE HEARING MUST FILE A NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPEAR WITH THE CLERK BY SEPTEMBER 9, 2009; THE ESTABLISHMENT OF ESCROW ACCOUNTS IS APPROVED; HEFFLER, RADETICH & SAITTA, LLC IS APPROVED AS SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR AND CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/24/09; 6/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
June 8, 2009 174 Featured Case ORDER THAT A HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SHOULD NOT BE PRELIMINARILY APPROVED SHALL BE HELD ON JUNE 23, 2009 AT 2:30 PM IN COURTROOM 9A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/8/09; 6/8/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
April 24, 2009 173 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CURTIS JOHN LEGEYT on behalf of IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768.(ah)
April 22, 2009 172 MOTION for Approval of the Proposed Separate Settlements With All Defendants filed by PLAINTIFF. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Degussa Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Arkema Settlement Agreement, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Lucite Settlement Agreement, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - ICI Settlement Agreement, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Proposed Order with Notices and Proof of Claim Form)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 4/23/2009 (tjd).
March 17, 2009 171 NOTICE of Change of Address by LANDON Y. JONES(JONES, LANDON)
March 4, 2009 170 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ANNETTE C. RIZZI on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768).(tjd)
February 5, 2009 169 Featured Case ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON ICI'S MOTION SHALL BE HEARD ON MARCH 4, 2009 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 9A, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/4/09; 2/5/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
December 8, 2008 168 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Settlement Between Plaintiffs and Degussa Defendants filed by PLAINTIFF. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 1- Escrow Agreement, # 4 Exhibit B- Proposed Order, # 5 Exhibit B-1, # 6 Exhibit B-2, # 7 Exhibit C- Proposed Final Judgment)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 12/9/2008 (tjd).
December 4, 2008 167 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE FIRST PARAGRAPH OF THE ORDER IS REPLACED WITH THE FOLLOWING: ANTHONY BOLOGNESE OF BOLOGNESE & ASSOCIATES, LLC; MICHAEL D. HAUSFELD OF HAUSFELD LLP; STEVEN A KANNER OF MUCH SHELIST FREED DENEBERG AMENT & RUBENSTEIN, P.C.; AND H. LADDIE MONTAGUE OF BERGER & MONTAGUE, P.C. ARE APPOINTED INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS IN THE DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS; THE ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL SHALL OTHERWISE REMAIN UNCHANGED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/3/08; 12/4/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
December 3, 2008 166 RESPONSE to Motion re 164 MOTION Motion to Amend the Order re 32 Order, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll's Response to Motion for Amendment of Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel filed by PLAINTIFFS. (GORDON, RUTHANNE) Modified on 12/4/2008 (tjd).
December 2, 2008 165 EXHIBITS to Docket Entry No. 164 by PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E)(HAUSFELD, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/3/2008 (tjd).
December 1, 2008 164 MOTION Motion to Amend the Order re 32 Order, filed by PLAINTIFFS. Motion to Amend Order. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(HAUSFELD, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/2/2008 (tjd).
November 18, 2008 163 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation of Michael D. Hausfeld, William Butterfield and Megan Jones (GRABAR, JOSHUA)
November 14, 2008 162 NOTICE by PLAINTIFFS Notice of Firm Name Change and Notice of Appearance (OLSON, STEIG) **(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY.)** Modified on 11/17/2008 (tjd). Modified on 11/17/2008 (fh)
October 17, 2008 161 Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority re 160 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by METHYL METHACRYLATE (MMA) ANTITRUST LITIGATION - DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service) (GOODWIN, CHARLES)
October 16, 2008 160 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARKEMA FRANCE, ARKEMA, INC. re 141 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Complaint, 142 Memorandum, 140 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (In re Air Cargo Shipping Services Antitrust Litig.), # 2 Exhibit (In re Digital Music Antitrust Litig.), # 3 Certificate of Service)(SCHER, HOWARD) Modified on 10/17/2008 (ah).
May 12, 2008 159 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by OLIVIER N. ANTOINE on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768).(tjd) Modified on 5/13/2008 (tjd).
May 5, 2008 158 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES P. GOODWIN on behalf of PLAINTIFFS. Certificate of Service. (GOODWIN, CHARLES) Modified on 5/6/2008 (tjd).
May 2, 2008 157 Supplemental Reply Memorandum Filed Under Seal of ARKEMA FRANCE and ARKEMA, INC. in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff's Second Consolidated Complaint. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
May 2, 2008 156 Reply Memorandum Filed Under Seal in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complanit and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Complaint. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
May 2, 2008 155 Letter Re: REPLY to Response to Motion re 141 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Complaint Filed Under Seal filed by CYRO INDUSTRIES. (EVERETT, J.) Modified on 5/5/2008 (tjd).
May 2, 2008 154 Reply Memorandum Filed Under Seal in Support of Defendant Lucite International Limited's Motion to Dismiss the Complaints For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tjd)
May 2, 2008 153 RESPONSE in Support re 139 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC. (KITTREDGE, PATRICK)
May 2, 2008 152 RESPONSE in Support re 140 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC. (KITTREDGE, PATRICK)
April 16, 2008 151 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO ALL PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING MAY 2, 2008, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/16/08; 4/17/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
April 8, 2008 150 PLAINTIFFS' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition Filed Under Seal to Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
April 8, 2008 149 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' Memorandum of Law in Opposition Filed Under Seal to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
April 8, 2008 148 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' Opposition Filed Under Seal to the Arkema Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
March 17, 2008 147 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO ALL PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED TO APRIL 8, 2008 AND THE DEFENDANTS' REPLIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE PENDING MOTIONS SHALL BE DUE ON OR BEFORE APRIL 22, 2008, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/12/08; 3/18/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
March 13, 2008 146 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFT IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLFFS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINTS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION IN WHICH DEFT IS MOVING TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, IS DENIED AS MOOT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. 3/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(sc, ) Modified on 3/14/2008 (sc, ). Modified on 3/14/2008 (sc, ).
March 13, 2008 145 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFT IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS PLFFS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE CLAIMS AGAINST ICI UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. 3/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sc, ) Modified on 3/14/2008 (sc, ).
March 13, 2008 144 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFT LUCITE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED'S MOTION TO DIMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. 3/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(sc, )
March 13, 2008 143 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFT IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLFFS' CONSLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICITION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. 3/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(sc, )
March 7, 2008 142 Supplemental Memorandum Filed Under Seal of ARKEMA FRANCE and ARKEMA, INC. in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Complaint. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
March 7, 2008 141 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by CYRO INDUSTRIES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk of Court)(EVERETT, J.)
March 7, 2008 140 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC.Proposed Order, Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Motion, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2)(DONLEY, JOSEPH)
March 7, 2008 139 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC.Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Motion, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit 1)(DONLEY, JOSEPH)
March 7, 2008 138 NOTICE of Appearance by CANDICE ENDERS on behalf of PLAINTIFFS with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ENDERS, CANDICE) Modified on 3/10/2008 (tjd).
March 7, 2008 137 Documents (Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum of Law, Declaration) to be Filed Under Seal by LUCITE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (FILED UNDER SEAL).**(FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE COPY)** (tjd) Modified on 3/10/2008 (tjd).
March 7, 2008 136 Documents (Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum of Law, Declaration) to be Filed Under Seal by LUCITE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
March 4, 2008 135 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KENNETH R. DAVID on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (tjd) Modified on 3/6/2008 (tjd).
February 5, 2008 134 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNETTE C. RIZZI on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768).(tjd)
January 28, 2008 133 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL DEFENDANTS HAVE UNTIL MARCH 7, 2008 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/25/08; 1/29/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
January 21, 2008 131 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Statement Re: Filing of Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 1/22/2008 (tjd).
January 19, 2008 132 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED UNDER SEAL. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
December 19, 2007 130 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINTS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN JANUARY 21, 2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/19/07; 12/19/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
December 18, 2007 129 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF PETER E. HALLE PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; PETER E. HALLE, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANTS DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, CYRO INDUSTRIES, INC., ROEHM GMBH & CO. KG, AND ROEHM AMERICAS LLC FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/18/07; 12/19/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS). (tjd)
December 13, 2007 128 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER PARTIES TO EXTEND BY ONE WEEK THE DEADLINE FOR SUBMITTING THEIR STIPULATION OF UNCONTESTED FACTS RELEVANT TO CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED AND THE DIRECT PURCHASER PARTIES SHALL FILE A STIPULATION OF UNCONTESTED FACTS NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 21, 2007. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/13/07; 12/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
December 12, 2007 127 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Uncontested Facts Relevant to Class Certification filed by CYRO INDUSTRIES.Certificate of Service.(EVERETT, J.)
November 20, 2007 126 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF of Recent Authority Relevant to Pending Motion for Class Certification Exhibit, Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 11/21/2007 (tjd).
November 5, 2007 125 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Their MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL, Declaration, Exhibits Volumes I-III, Certificate of Service. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (nd)
November 5, 2007 124 Reply Affidavit of John C. Beyer, Ph.D. Regarding Class Certification with Binders 1-4 Containing Exhibits 1 to 71 of documents cited in reply affidavit of John C. Beyer, PH.D regarding class certification. (sc, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 11/7/2007 (nd).
October 18, 2007 123 Entry of Appearance filed by CHRISTINE A. SEBOURN on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (tjd)
October 18, 2007 122 NOTICE by ARKEMA S.A. Notice of Name Change and Corporate Disclosure Statement for Defendant Arkema S.A.. Certificate of Service. (BIZAR, STEVEN) Modified on 10/19/2007 (tjd).
October 18, 2007 121 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ARKEMA, INC. Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement for Defendant Arkema Inc.. Certificate of Service. (BIZAR, STEVEN) Modified on 10/19/2007 (tjd).
October 1, 2007 120 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF PETER E. HALLE ON BEHALF OF CYRO INDUSTRIES, DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, AND ROHM AMERICAS LLC. AFFIDAVIT, PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS). (tjd)
September 17, 2007 119 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID MARSTON, ESQUIRE TO ADMIT PETER E. HALLE, ESQUIRE PRO HAC VICE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/17/07; 9/17/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(tjd)
September 14, 2007 118 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF PETER E. HALLE ON BEHALF OF CYRO INDUSTRIES, DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, ROHM AMERICAS LLC. PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (tjd)
September 6, 2007 117 EXHIBITS Filed Under Seal to DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
September 6, 2007 116 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' Memorandum of Law in Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority re 48 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/7/2007 (tjd).
September 6, 2007 115 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by ARKEMA S.A., ARKEMA, INC. re 50 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, 49 MOTION to Dismiss Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints Supplemental Authority. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit In re Elevator Antitrust Litigation# 2 Certificate of Service)(BIZAR, STEVEN) Modified on 9/7/2007 (tjd).
August 31, 2007 114 Notice of Filing of Expert Report Filed Under Seal of Dr. Gary Dorman. Certificate of Service. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
August 31, 2007 113 DEFENDANTS' Memorandum of Law Filed Under Seal in Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel. Exhibits A-E, Volumes I-II Filed Under Seal, Certificate of Service. (All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
August 30, 2007 112 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN RESPONSE TO THE "NOTICE OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM THE EUROPEAN COMMISSION" IS GRANTED; THE NOTICE OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM THE EUROPEAN COMMISSION SHALL NOT BE CONSIDERED IN DISPOSING OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINTS. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/30/07; 8/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS, 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
August 8, 2007 111 Response To Direct Purchaser Plainitffs' Notices of Recent Authority and Defendants' Notice of Recent Authority re 110 Notice (Other), 109 Notice (Other) ,Certificate of Service by CYRO INDUSTRIES, ATOFINA CHEMICALS, INC., LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARKEMA S.A., DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, CYTEC INDUSTRIES, ROHM AMERICAS LLC, ALTUGLAS INTERNATIONAL, ARKEMA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D part 1# 5 Exhibit D part 2# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F) (WAYLAND, JOSEPH)
August 3, 2007 110 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF of Recent Authority Relevant to Pending Motion to Dismiss. Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 8/6/2007 (tjd).
August 2, 2007 109 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF of Recent Authority Relevant to Pending Motion to Dismiss. Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 8/3/2007 (tjd).
July 31, 2007 108 FOURTH DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER THAT THE DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PROCEEDINGS IS GRANTED; THE THIRD DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IS AMENDED IN THE FOLLOWING RESPECTS: NO LATER THAN AUGUST 31, 2007 DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR CLASS CERTIFICATION OPPOSITION BRIEF, EXPERT REPORTS OR AFFIDAVITS, AND RULE 26(a)(2) EXPERT DISCLOSURES FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION EXPERTS; NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 5, 2007 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR CLASS CERTIFICATION REPLY BRIEF AND EXPERT REBUTTAL REPORTS OR AFFIDAVITS; THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A COMPLETE STIPULATION OF UNCONTESTED FACTS RELEVANT TO THE DISPOSITION OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 14, 2007; A CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING SHALL COMMENCE ON FEBRUARY 4, 2008 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 9A, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/30/07; 7/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
July 27, 2007 107 Joint MOTION to Modify /Enlarge the Time for Class Certification Proceedings filed by ARKEMA, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)(JONES, LANDON)
July 18, 2007 106 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOSHUA H. GRABAR. Certificate of Service. (GRABAR, JOSHUA) Modified on 7/19/2007 (tjd).
July 5, 2007 105 NOTICE of Change of Address by RICHARD J. KILSHEIMER(KILSHEIMER, RICHARD)
June 4, 2007 104 Corrected EXHIBITS (Volume 2 only) Filed Under Seal to the Report of Professor E. Bruce Nauman filed on 4/23/07. Certificate of Service. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tjd)
May 31, 2007 103 THIRD DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER THAT THE DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS PARTIES' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PROCEEDINGS IS GRANTED; THE SECOND DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IS AMENDED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER; A CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING SHALL COMMENCE ON DECEMBER 13, 2007 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 9A. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/31/07; 5/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
May 29, 2007 102 Joint MOTION To Enlarge The Time For Class Certification Proceedings filed by PLAINTIFF.Certificate of Service.(GRABAR, JOSHUA)
May 24, 2007 101 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS BASF CORPORATION IS GRANTED AND ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT BASF CORPORATION ARE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/23/07; 5/24/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768, C.A. 07-976).(tjd)
May 24, 2007 100 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. MANNING on behalf of ARKEMA S.A. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MANNING, THOMAS)
May 24, 2007 99 NOTICE of Appearance by LANDON Y. JONES on behalf of ARKEMA S.A., ARKEMA, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(JONES, LANDON)
May 22, 2007 98 NOTICE of Appearance by IAN R. DATTNER on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (tjd)
May 22, 2007 97 Entry of Appearance by OLIVIER N. ANTOINE on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (tjd)
May 22, 2007 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS re 95 Notice (Other) Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (GORDON, RUTHANNE) Modified on 5/23/2007 (tjd).
May 22, 2007 95 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' Response to re 94 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (GORDON, RUTHANNE) Modified on 5/23/2007 (tjd).
May 21, 2007 94 Report Of Supplemental Authority by ARKEMA, INC. Certificate of Service. (SCHER, HOWARD) Modified on 5/22/2007 (tjd).
May 3, 2007 93 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PLAINTIFF As To Plaintiff TallyHo Plastics, Inc.(GRABAR, JOSHUA)
April 24, 2007 92 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PLAINTIFF As To Arrow True Value Hardware(GRABAR, JOSHUA)
April 23, 2007 91 Declaration of Candice Enders Filed Under Seal re 85 MOTION for Class Certification and Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
April 23, 2007 90 Four Volume Compendium of Exhibits Filed Under Seal Re Documents Cited in Affidavit of John C. Beyer, PH.D. Regarding Class Certification. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser ACtions). (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tjd)
April 23, 2007 89 AFFIDAVIT of John C. Beyer, PH.D Filed Under Seal Regarding Class Certification. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
April 23, 2007 88 Report of Professor E. Bruce Nauman (Volumes 1-2) and Accompanying Exhibits Filed Under Seal re 85 MOTION for Class Certification and Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
April 23, 2007 87 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' Memorandum of Law in Support Filed Under Seal re 85 MOTION for Class Certification and Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel. Exhibits to Memorandum Filed Under Seal. (Applies to All Direct Purchaser Actions). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
April 23, 2007 86 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CURTIS J. LEGEYT IS GRANTED AND HE IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY; COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ECF SYSTEM AND FOLLOW JUDGE SAVAGE'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/23/07; 4/24/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
April 23, 2007 85 MOTION to Certify Class filed by DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS. Certificate of Service. (Applies to All Actions).(Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(GORDON, RUTHANNE) Modified on 4/24/2007 (tjd).
April 20, 2007 Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 400 938715 for Application of Curtis J. LeGeyt Pro Hac Vice. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (tjd)
April 19, 2007 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Application of Curtis J. LeGeyt filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC.certificate of service.(KITTREDGE, PATRICK)
April 2, 2007 83 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF Notice of Change of Attorney Information (SIMON, BRUCE)
March 29, 2007 82 MOTION to Dismiss BASF Corporation filed by BASF CORP... (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Certificate of Service)(HAMILTON, MATTHEW)
February 21, 2007 81 Featured Case ORDER THAT ALAN M. WISEMAN, ESQUIRE AND JOSEPH A. OSTOYICH, ESQUIRE ARE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY; THE APPLICATION OF CURTIS J. LEGEYT, ESQUIRE FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/21/07; 2/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
February 16, 2007 80 NOTICE by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC re 43 Application/Petition Attaching Exhibit 1 to Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan M. Wiseman (KITTREDGE, PATRICK)
February 14, 2007 79 SECOND DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PROCEEDINGS IS GRANTED; THE FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: NO LATER THAN APRIL 23, 2007 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR OPENING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEF, EXPERT REPORTS OR AFFIDAVITS, AND RULE 26(a)(2) EXPERT DISCLOSURES FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION EXPERTS, ETC; A CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING SHALL COMMENCE ON OCTOBER 16, 2007 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 9A. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/14/07; 2/14/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
February 13, 2007 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification Proceedings (Corrected Version) filed by PLAINTIFF.Certificate of Service.(GRABAR, JOSHUA)
February 13, 2007 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification Proceedings filed by PLAINTIFF.Certificate of Service.(GRABAR, JOSHUA)
February 13, 2007 76 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS OF ANDREW S. MAROVITZ, ESQUIRE AND DEBRA BOGO-ERNST, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/12/07; 2/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
February 12, 2007 75 Reply Memorandum Filed Under Seal In Support of Defendant LUCITE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (Applies to 10-md-1768). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
February 12, 2007 74 Memorandum in Further Support re 50 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC. (KITTREDGE, PATRICK)
February 2, 2007 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re 63 MOTION Notice of Correspondence from the European Commission Filed by Defendants Degussa AG and Rohm Gmbh filed by PLAINTIFF. (GRABAR, JOSHUA)
February 2, 2007 72 Response to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Recent Authority by CYRO INDUSTRIES, ATOFINA CHEMICALS, INC., LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC., DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, CYTEC INDUSTRIES, ROHM AMERICAS LLC, ALTUGLAS INTERNATIONAL, ARKEMA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (WAYLAND, JOSEPH)
January 31, 2007 71 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED AND CADIO ZIRPOLI, ESQUIRE AND R. ALEXANDER SAVERI, ESQUIRE ARE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE PLAINTIFFS FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/31/07; 2/1/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
January 26, 2007 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re 63 MOTION filed by DEGUSSA AG, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C (Part 1)# 4 Exhibit C (Part 2)# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F)(HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
January 25, 2007 69 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION TO ADMIT J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR. PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED FOR THE REPRESENTATION OF DEFENDANTS DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, CYRO INDUSTRIES, CYTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., ROEHM AMERICAS, LLC AND ROEHM GMBH & CO. KG IN THIS ACTION ONLY; COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ECF SYSTEM AND FOLLOW JUDGE SAVAGE'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/25/07;. 1/26/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
January 25, 2007 68 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; JOSEPH M. BARTON, WILLIAM P. BUTTERFIELD, MICHAEL D. HAUSFELD, MEGAN E. JONES, STEVEN A. KANNER, WILLIAM H. LONDON AND KEVIN B. LOVE ARE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE PLAINTIFFS FOR PURPOSE OF THIS ACTION ONLY; DOUGLAS A. MILLEN'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/25/07; 1/26/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL.(tjd)
January 23, 2007 67 NOTICE by METHYL METHACRYLATE (MMA) ANTITRUST LITIGATION - DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE re 55 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(GORDON, RUTHANNE)
January 19, 2007 66 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 49 MOTION to Dismiss Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints filed by CYRO INDUSTRIES, LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARKEMA S.A., DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, CYTEC INDUSTRIES, ROHM AMERICAS LLC, ALTUGLAS INTERNATIONAL, ARKEMA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(WAYLAND, JOSEPH) Modified on 1/22/2007 (np).
January 19, 2007 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, 48 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and Certificate of Service filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC. (KITTREDGE, PATRICK)
January 12, 2007 64 Memorandum in Response to the "Notice of Correspondence From the European Commission" Filed by Defendants Degussa AG and Rohm GmbH & Co. Kg and in Support of MOTION FOR RELATED RELIEF filed by DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS'. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (np)
January 12, 2007 63 MOTION IN RESPONSE TO THE "NOTICE OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM THE EUROPEAN COMMISSION" FILED BY DEFENDANTS DEGUSSA AG AND ROHM GMBH & CO. KG filed by DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS(np)
January 12, 2007 62 COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS SUPPORTING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (np)
January 12, 2007 61 Memorandum in Opposition to MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTIONfiled by DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS'. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (np)
January 11, 2007 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DESIGNATION AND FILING OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC.; MOTION FOR THE ENTRY OF A STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/10/07; 1/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS).(tjd)
January 11, 2007 59 FINDINGS OF FACT SUR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/11/07;. 1/11/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
January 8, 2007 58 MOTION for Protective Order filed by CYRO INDUSTRIES, LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARKEMA S.A., DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, CYTEC INDUSTRIES, ROHM AMERICAS LLC, ARKEMA, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Stipulated Protective Order# 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum# 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum)(WAYLAND, JOSEPH)
January 3, 2007 57 NOTICE of Appearance by RUTHANNE GORDON on behalf of METHYL METHACRYLATE (MMA) ANTITRUST LITIGATION - DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE with Certificate of Service (GORDON, RUTHANNE)
December 28, 2006 56 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF of Intention To Seek Leave To File Response To The "Notice of Correspondence From The European Commission" (GRABAR, JOSHUA)
December 21, 2006 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, 49 MOTION to Dismiss Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints filed by METHYL METHACRYLATE (MMA) ANTITRUST LITIGATION - DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(GORDON, RUTHANNE)
December 21, 2006 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 MOTION to Dismiss Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints filed by METHYL METHACRYLATE (MMA) ANTITRUST LITIGATION - DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(GORDON, RUTHANNE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY RE-FILED CORRECT DOCUMENT) Modified on 12/22/2006 (np).
December 11, 2006 53 NOTICE by CYRO INDUSTRIES of Correspondence from the European Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit European Commission Letter)(HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
December 8, 2006 52 APPLICATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLFFS, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments)(sc, )
December 8, 2006 51 APPLICATION OF CARDIO ZIRPOLI FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLFFS, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments)(sc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2006 (sc, ).
November 10, 2006 50 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC.Certificate of Service.(KITTREDGE, PATRICK)
November 8, 2006 49 MOTION to Dismiss Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints filed by CYRO INDUSTRIES, LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARKEMA S.A., DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, CYTEC INDUSTRIES, ROHM AMERICAS LLC, ALTUGLAS INTERNATIONAL, ARKEMA, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(WAYLAND, JOSEPH) Modified on 11/15/2006 (tjd).
November 8, 2006 48 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(KITTREDGE, PATRICK)
November 7, 2006 Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 400 934315 for Motion Pro Hac Vice J. Clayton Everett, Jr. (tjd)
November 7, 2006 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of J. Clayton Everett, Jr. filed by CYRO INDUSTRIES, DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, CYTEC INDUSTRIES, ROHM AMERICAS LLC.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
November 7, 2006 46 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTOFOR T. HENNING on behalf of CYRO INDUSTRIES, DEGUSSA AG, DEGUSSA CORPORATION, ROHM GMBH & CO. KG, CYTEC INDUSTRIES, ROHM AMERICAS LLC with Certificate of Service (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
November 3, 2006 Filing fee: $ 320.00, receipt number 400 934248 for Motion Pro Hac Vice filed on 11/3/06. (tjd)
November 3, 2006 45 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice J. Barton, W. Butterfield, M. Hausfeld, M. Jones, S. Kanner, W. London, K. Love, D. Millen filed by METHYL METHACRYLATE (MMA) ANTITRUST LITIGATION - DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE.Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GORDON, RUTHANNE)
November 2, 2006 44 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION (PAPER COPY ONLY) TO EXTEND TIME IS APPROVED; NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS SHALL BE GRANTED; DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE AN ANSWER OR MOTION TO DISMISS, OTHER THAN A MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 8, 2006; DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 9, 2006; DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ANY RESPONSES TO ANY OF THE ABOVE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OTHER THAN MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 21, 2006; DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ANY REPLIES ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 19, 2007; DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND THE DEFENDANTS SHALL COMPLETE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 21, 2006 . SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/2/06; 11/3/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(tjd)
October 19, 2006 43 APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ALAN M. WISEMAN, JOSEPH A. OSTOYICH, AND CURTIS J. LEGEYT FOR IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC. PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768). (tjd)
October 13, 2006 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PLAINTIFF As To All Defendants (MONTAGUE, H.)
October 6, 2006 41 MOTION TO DISMISS PLFFS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINTS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, FILED BY IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC., MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Applies to 10-md-1768).(gn) Modified on 10/10/2006 (tjd). Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2006 (tjd, ).
October 6, 2006 40 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by LUCITE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED.Proposed Order, Memorandum, Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(WAYLAND, JOSEPH)
October 5, 2006 39 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK W. KITTREDGE on behalf of IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, PLC, Certificate of Service. (gn, )
September 15, 2006 38 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, Certificate of Service. (np)
August 31, 2006 37 NOTICE of Appearance by NOAH AXLER on behalf of PLAINTIFF (AXLER, NOAH)
August 25, 2006 36 NOTICE of Appearance by MINDEE J. REUBEN on behalf of PLAINTIFF (REUBEN, MINDEE)
August 25, 2006 35 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. ASHER on behalf of PLAINTIFF (ASHER, STEVEN)
August 22, 2006 34 Featured Case ORDER FOR DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/22/06; 8/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
August 21, 2006 33 FIRST DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/21/06; 8/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(tjd)
August 21, 2006 32 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 (DOCUMENT NO. 17) IS GRANTED; PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.23(g)(2)(A) ANTHONY J. BOLOGNESE, MICHAEL D. HAUSFELD, STEVEN A. KANNER, AND H. LADDIE MONTAGUE ARE APPOINTED INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS IN THE DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/21/06; 8/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(tjd)
August 21, 2006 31 PROCEDURAL ORDER THAT THIS MULTIDISTRICT MATTER SHALL PROCEED ON TWO SEPARATE TRACKS (a) "DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS" AND (b) "INDIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS"; THE CLERK SHALL MAINTAIN TWO CASE DOCKETS AND CASE FILES ONE FOR EACH TRACK AS FOLLOWS: (a) THE DOCKET AND CASE FILE FOR MATTERS RELATING TO ALL DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS SHALL BE 06-md-1768 ("DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE") AND THE DOCKET AND CASE FILE FOR MATTERS RELATING TO ALL INDIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS SHALL BE 10-md-1768 ("INDIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE"), ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/21/06; 8/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO 10-MD-1768).(tjd)
August 18, 2006 30 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. MANNING on behalf of ARKEMA, INC. with Cert. of Service (MANNING, THOMAS)
August 17, 2006 29 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 8/16/06 before The Honorable Timothy J. Savage. (tjd)
August 14, 2006 28 Proposed Case Management Plan Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum In Support Of Unopposed Motion For Entry Of Proposed CMO No.2 by PLAINTIFF. (GRABAR, JOSHUA)
August 14, 2006 27 Proposed Case Management Plan Direct Puchaser Plaintiffs' Designation of Liason Counsel by PLAINTIFF. (GRABAR, JOSHUA)
August 14, 2006 26 Proposed Case Management Plan Parties' Joint Supplemental Submission Pursuant to Paragraph 16 of the Court's Practice and Procedure Order and [Proposed] Case Management Order by PLAINTIFF. (GRABAR, JOSHUA)
August 11, 2006 25 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH R. DAVID on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
August 11, 2006 24 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES E. KOOB on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
August 8, 2006 23 APPLICATION AND STATEMENT IN SUPPORT FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY DEBRA BOGO-ERNST ON BEHALF OF BASF CORPORATION. PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(tjd)
August 8, 2006 22 APPLICATION AND STATEMENT IN SUPPORT FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY ANDREW S. MAROVITZ ON BEHALF OF BASF CORPORATION. PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(tjd)
August 8, 2006 21 Entry of Appearance by EDWARD W. MADEIRA, JR on behalf of BASF CORP. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
August 8, 2006 20 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. HAMILTON on behalf of BASF CORP. with Certificateof Service (HAMILTON, MATTHEW)
August 7, 2006 19 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by ROHM & HAAS COMPANY.(HARKINS, JOHN)
August 7, 2006 18 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN G. HARKINS, JR on behalf of ROHM & HAAS COMPANY with Certificate of Service (HARKINS, JOHN)
August 2, 2006 17 Proposed Case Management Plan Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry of Proposed Case Management Order No. 2 and [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 2 by PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit F)(GRABAR, JOSHUA)
August 2, 2006 16 Proposed Case Management Plan - The Parties' Joint Submission Pursuant To Paragraph 16 Of The Court's Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Persuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407(a) by PLAINTIFF. (GRABAR, JOSHUA)
August 1, 2006 15 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by SARTOMER COMPANY, INC..(KIRCHER, PHILIP)
August 1, 2006 14 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP G. KIRCHER on behalf of SARTOMER COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service (KIRCHER, PHILIP)
July 31, 2006 13 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) from the Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that this action is transferred to the EDPA for coordinated or consoldiated pretrial proceedings assigned to the Honorable Timothy J. Savage: Gulf South Framing Supplies, Inc. v. Arkema, Inc., et al., ND-CA, 3:06-2323. (tjd)
July 25, 2006 12 Entry of Appearance by JOSEPH F. WAYLAND on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
July 25, 2006 11 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC..(MINER, AMY)
July 25, 2006 10 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY B. MINER on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service (MINER, AMY)
July 25, 2006 9 NOTICE of Appearance by WILSON M. BROWN, III on behalf of LUCITE INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service (BROWN, WILSON)
July 20, 2006 8 NOTICE of Appearance by H. LADDIE MONTAGUE, JR on behalf of PLAINTIFF with Certificate of Service (MONTAGUE, H.)
July 18, 2006 7 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DOMESTIC DEFTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS MOOT. APPLIES TO C.A. 06-469. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. 7/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, ) Modified on 7/19/2006 (sc, ).
July 18, 2006 6 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL BE PREPARED TO ADDRESS THE PENDING INDIRECT-PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REQUIRE PRESERVATION OF RECORDS AND TO APPOINT CO-LEAD COUNSEL AT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/18/06; 7/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(tjd)
July 18, 2006 5 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE AS RELATED TO MDL 1768. SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ON 7/17/06; 7/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 6 IN 06-CV-2624).(tjd)
July 17, 2006 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RUTHANNE GORDON on behalf of PLAINTIFF with Certificate of Service (GORDON, RUTHANNE)
July 12, 2006 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Peter E. Halle and J. Clayton Everett, Jr. on behalf of the DEGUSSA Defendants. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
June 30, 2006 Receipt of original record along with certified copy of docket entries received from the District of Tennessee c.a. 6-34 (Greeneville). Our case number 6-2867. (sc, )
June 28, 2006 2 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER THAT ALL PLEADINGS FILED IN THESE ACTIONS SHALL BEAR THE IDENTIFICATION "MDL DOCKET NO. 1768", ETC., COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY THROUGH ECF, ETC., SERVICE SHALL BE DEEMED SUFFICIENT IF MADE UPON ALL ATTORNEYS ON THE PANEL ATTORNEY SERVICE LIST, ETC., PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, COUNSEL FOR EACH PARTY SHALL DESIGNATE LIAISON COUNSEL, SUBJECT TO THE APPROVAL OF THE COURT, ETC., UPON REMAND OF ANY OF THESE ACTION, THE PARTIES SHALL PROVIDE THIS COURT COPIES OF ANY NECESSARY AND RELEVANT PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED, ETC., ALL DISCOVERY PROCEEDINGS IN THESE ACTIONS ARE STAYED, ETC., A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 16, 20065, AT 10:00AM, IN COURTROOM 9A, ETC., NO LATER THAN AUGUST 2, 2006, THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT PROPOSED CASE MENAGEMENT ORDER, ETC. APPLIES TO ALL ACTIONS. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. 6/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 21, 2006 1 Certified Copy of Transfer Order from the Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the two actions in this litigation pending outside the EDPA are transferred to the EDPA, assigned to the Honorable Timothy J. Savage for coordinated or consoldiated pretrial proceedings: EDPA, 6-469; 6-470; 6-560; 6-561; 6-956; NDCA 4:06-1253; EDTN 2:06-34. (sc, ) Modified on 6/22/2006 (sc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: METHYL METHACRYLATE (MMA) ANTITRUST LITIGATION - DIRECT PURCHASER ACTION FILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?