IN RE: PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION Featured Case

Case Number: 2:2006md01782
Filed: August 28, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JOHN P. FULLAM
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2009 124 PLAINTIFFS' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Renewed Motion to Lift Stay and Dismiss the Case. Certificate of Service. (Applies to C.A. 03-4731). (tjd)
December 10, 2009 123 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND DISMISS CASE IS GRANTED; THE REPLY BRIEF IS CONSIDERED FILED WITH THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 12/10/09; 12/10/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4731).(tjd)
December 9, 2009 122 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion to Lift Stay and Dismiss the Case filed by PLAINTIFF.Certificate of Service.(MONTAGUE, H.)
November 19, 2009 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re 120 MOTION Renewed Motion to Lift Stay and Dismiss the Case 2:03-4731 Bellevue Drug Co., et al. v. Advance PCS filed by ADVANCE PCS. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BIZAR, STEVEN) Modified on 11/20/2009 (tjd).
November 5, 2009 120 MOTION Renewed Motion to Lift Stay and Dismiss the Case 2:03-4731 Bellevue Drug Co., et al. v. Advance PCS filed by PLAINTIFF.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MONTAGUE, H.)
October 20, 2009 119 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 24 Notice of Appeal filed by ADVANCE PCS that the order of the said District Court entered on December 19, 2006 vacating the order of the District Court entered August 24, 2004 is vacated; the matter is remanded to the District Court with instructions to reinstate the August 24, 2004 order; All of the above in accordance with the opinion of this Court; Each side to bear its own costs. (Applies to C.A. 03-4731). (tjd)
October 13, 2009 118 Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (DELL'OSA, ROBERT) Modified on 10/15/2009 (tjd).
October 2, 2009 117 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF re 108 Notice (Other) North Jackson Pharmacy, Inc. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response Regarding Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Certificate of Service. (ROUCO, RICHARD) Modified on 10/5/2009 (tjd).
April 17, 2009 116 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KATHRYN C. HARR on behalf of IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARR, KATHRYN)
March 17, 2009 115 NOTICE of Change of Address by LANDON Y. JONES(JONES, LANDON)
February 18, 2009 114 BRADY CLASS PLAINTIFFS' Statement Filed Under Seal Re: Hydrogen Peroxide Opinion. (Applies to C.A. 03-4730). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
February 18, 2009 113 Featured Case ORDER THAT BRADY CLASS PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT RE: HYDROGEN PEROXIDE OPINION SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 2/18/09; 2/18/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730)(tjd)
February 9, 2009 112 MOTION FOR AN ORDER SEALING BRADY CLASS PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT RE: HYDROGEN PEROXIDE OPINION filed by PLAINTIFF.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(ap, )
February 9, 2009 111 MOTION to Seal Document 108 Notice (Other) Brady Class Plaintiffs' Statement Re Hydrogen Peroxide Opinion filed by PLAINTIFF.Certificate of Service and Proposed Order.(MONTAGUE, H.)
February 5, 2009 110 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF Notice of Firm Name Change (CORBITT, CRAIG)
January 29, 2009 109 NOTICE by ADVANCE PCS, CAREMARK, INC., CAREMARK RX INC., CAREMARK PCS of Withdrawal of the Appearances of Attorneys E. Dyhrkopp, V. Grimm, M. Martinez and S. Mendel. Certificate of Service. (RENDER, PAULA) Modified on 2/4/2009 (tjd).
January 15, 2009 108 NOTICE by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. of Supplemental Authority. Exhibits, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(DELL'OSA, ROBERT) Modified on 1/16/2009 (tjd).
July 1, 2008 107 NOTICE of Change of Address by OTHNI J. LATHRAM(LATHRAM, OTHNI)
April 30, 2008 106 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ROBERT ANDREW SANTILLO on behalf of PLAINTIFFS. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SANTILLO, ROBERT) Modified on 5/1/2008 (tjd).
April 28, 2008 105 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Brady Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Certificate of Service. (MONTAGUE, H.) Modified on 4/29/2008 (tjd).
April 24, 2008 104 NOTICE by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. of Supplemental Authority. Exhibit, Certificate of Service. (DELL'OSA, ROBERT) Modified on 4/25/2008 (tjd).
January 29, 2008 103 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. LUCHT, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 1/29/08;1/30/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-4114).(tjd)
January 29, 2008 Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 400 945417 for Christopher J. Lucht Pro Hac Vice. (Applies to C.A. 06-4114). (tjd)
January 28, 2008 102 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Christopher J. Lucht filed by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC..Certificate of Service.(DELL'OSA, ROBERT)
December 14, 2007 101 NOTICE by CAREMARK RX INC. re 100 Notice (Other), 99 Notice (Other) Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authorities. Certificate of Service. (RENDER, PAULA) Modified on 12/24/2007 (tjd).
November 29, 2007 100 NOTICE by PLAINTIFFS of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARR, KATHRYN) Modified on 11/30/2007 (tjd).
November 27, 2007 99 NOTICE by PLAINTIFFS of Supplemental Authority -- Three New Opinions Certifying Classes in Sherman Act Section 1 Litigation. Certificate of Service. (MONTAGUE, H.) Modified on 11/28/2007 (tjd).
November 5, 2007 98 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JOSEPH F. WAYLAND, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), IS GRANTED. APPLIES TO C.A. 06-4114. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM. 11/6/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, )
November 2, 2007 97 Response to the Brady Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Opinion by MERCK & CO., INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (DOCKERY, DANIEL)
October 30, 2007 96 Response (Joint) Response to the Brady Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Opinion re 95 Notice (Other) by CAREMARK RX INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., certificate of service. (RUGG, CHARLTON) Modified on 11/1/2007 (sc, ).
October 19, 2007 95 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Opinion. Exhibits, Certificate of Service. (MONTAGUE, H.) Modified on 10/22/2007 (tjd).
October 17, 2007 94 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARR, KATHRYN) Modified on 10/18/2007 (tjd, ).
October 8, 2007 93 NOTICE of Change of Address by PAULA W. RENDER(RENDER, PAULA)
October 8, 2007 92 NOTICE of Change of Address by PAULA W. RENDER(RENDER, PAULA)
September 6, 2007 91 NOTICE by PLAINTIFFS of Recent Authority. Exhibits, Certificate of Service. (MONTAGUE, H.) Modified on 9/7/2007 (tjd).
August 15, 2007 90 NOTICE by PLAINTIFFS Disclosure Statement Form. Certificate of Service. (CORBITT, CRAIG) Modified on 8/16/2007 (tjd).
August 8, 2007 89 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CVS Caremark Corporation with Certificate of Service by CAREMARK, INC., CAREMARK RX INC..(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
August 2, 2007 88 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by North Jackson Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARR, KATHRYN) Modified on 8/3/2007 (tjd).
July 19, 2007 87 Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority by CAREMARK RX, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (HARR, KATHRYN) Modified on 7/20/2007 (tjd).
July 19, 2007 86 Statement Brady Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Leegin and Rule of Reason by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. Certificate of Service. (TWERSKY, MARTIN) Modified on 7/20/2007 (tjd).
July 11, 2007 85 NOTICE by CAREMARK RX INC. re 21 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority (Leegin). Exhibits, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A# 2 Exhibit B)(RENDER, PAULA) Modified on 7/12/2007 (tjd).
June 11, 2007 84 PLAINTIFFS' Statement Re: Defendants Medco and Merk's Response to Proposed Class Certification Orders. Exhibit. (Applies to C.A. 03-4730). (tjd)
June 11, 2007 83 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS MEDCO AND MERCK'S RESPONSE TO PROPOSED CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER IS GRANTED AND THE STATEMENT ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT "A" TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION SHALL BE DEEMED FILED OF RECORD. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 6/11/07; 6/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730).(tjd)
June 11, 2007 82 Brady Plaintiffs' Response Regarding Submission of Supplemental Authority. Certificate of Service. (MONTAGUE, H.) Modified on 6/12/2007 (tjd).
June 6, 2007 81 NOTICE by Plaintiffs re 68 MOTION for Order for Permission to File Statement Regarding Defendants Medco and Merck's Response to Proposed Class Certification Order Notice of Filing of Proposed Order. Certificate of Service. (TWERSKY, MARTIN) Modified on 6/7/2007 (tjd).
June 5, 2007 80 Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority by CAREMARY RX, INC. and CAREMARK, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A# 2 Attachment B# 3 Certificate of Service) (SANTILLO, ROBERT) Modified on 6/6/2007 (tjd)
May 31, 2007 79 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF JEAN K. JANES AND MUCH SHELIST DENENBERG AMENT & RUBENSTEIN, P.C. TO WITHDRAW THEIR APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 5/31/07; 6/1/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730, 03-4731).(tjd)
May 30, 2007 78 Second Amended MOTION Re 73 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by PLAINTIFFS. Exhibits, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(JANES, JEAN) Modified on 5/31/2007 (tjd).
May 29, 2007 77 Amended MOTION re 73 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service.(JANES, JEAN) Modified on 5/30/2007 (tjd).
May 29, 2007 76 NOTICE by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. of Supplemental Authority. Certificate of Service. (DELL'OSA, ROBERT) Modified on 5/30/2007 (tjd).
May 25, 2007 75 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/15/07 before The Honoraable John P. Fullam. (tjd)
May 25, 2007 74 Report Of Notice of Supplemental Authority by CAREMARK, INC., CAREMARK RX INC.. (MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
May 25, 2007 73 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by PLAINTIFF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(JANES, JEAN)
May 15, 2007 72 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ARBITRATION PROVISION IN THE "PHARMACY PROVIDER AGREEMENT" SHALL NOT APPLY TO THE CLAIMS ASSERTED IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION BY ANY NAMED PLAINTIFF OR ANY PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBER THAT ENTERS INTO OR HAS ENTERED INTO SAID PHARMACY PROVIDER AGREEMENT WITH EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF CONTRACT STATUS BETWEEN NORTH JACKSON PHARMACY, INC. AND EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. DATED MAY 11, 2007 IS HEREBY WITHDRAWN AND THE MOTION AND ALL SUPPORTING PAPERS SUBMITTED SHALL BE REFILED WITH THE CLERK OF COURT UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 5/15/07; 5/16/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-4114).(tjd)
May 15, 2007 71 Minute Entry for proceeding held before The HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM : Oral Argument Re: Pending Motions held on 5/15/07. Court Reporter: Rosalind Burton-Hoop. (tjd)
May 15, 2007 70 SEALED DOCUMENT (DRAKE, RUSSELL) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (fh, ). Modified on 5/15/2007 (fh, ).
May 11, 2007 69 SEALED DOCUMENT(HARR, KATHRYN) Modified on 5/14/2007 (tjd). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (fh, ). Modified on 5/15/2007 (fh, ).
May 7, 2007 68 MOTION for Permission to File Statement Regarding Defendants Medco and Merck's Response to Proposed Class Certification Order filed by PLAINTIFFS. Exhibit, Certificate of Service. (TWERSKY, MARTIN) Modified on 5/8/2007 (tjd).
April 23, 2007 67 Defendants' Proposed Order Regarding Class Certification Pursuant to the Court's Order of February 21, 2007 filed by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (RUGG, CHARLTON) Modified on 4/24/2007 (tjd).
April 23, 2007 66 Objection in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposed Order filed by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (RUGG, CHARLTON) Modified on 4/24/2007 (tjd).
April 23, 2007 65 Response to Class Plaintiffs' Submissions of Proposed Class Certification Orders Pursuant to Court Order of February 21, 2007 filed by MERCK & CO., INC. and MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC. Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL) Modified on 4/24/2007 (tjd).
April 23, 2007 64 Defendants' Proposed Order Regarding Class Certification Pursuant to the Court's Order of February 21, 2007 filed by CAREMARK, INC., CAREMARK RX INC. Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (MARTINEZ, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/24/2007 (tjd).
April 23, 2007 63 Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Certification Order by CAREMARK, INC., CAREMARK RX INC. Certificate of Service. (MARTINEZ, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/24/2007 (tjd).
April 23, 2007 62 NOTICE of Hearing: ORAL ARGUMENT, re: PENDING MOTIONS SET FOR 5/15/2007, 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. (rbh)
April 20, 2007 61 Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Submission of Proposed Class Certification Order Pursuant to Court Order of February 21, 2007 by ADVANCE PCS, CAREMARK PCS. Certificate of Service. (MARTINEZ, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/23/2007 (tjd).
March 23, 2007 60 Statement Clarification Concerning Class Plaintiffs' Submission in Response to Court Order of February 21, 2007 by ADVANCE PCS, IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. Certificate of Service. (TWERSKY, MARTIN) Modified on 3/26/2007 (tjd).
March 22, 2007 59 Notice of Plaintiffs Mike's Medical Center Pharmacy, et al.'s Submission of Proposed Class Certification Order Pursuant to Court Order of February 21, 2007 with Certificate of Service by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. Certificate of Service. (CORBITT, CRAIG) Modified on 3/23/2007 (tjd).
March 22, 2007 58 NOTICE by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION Of Filing Proposed Class Certification Order (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Class Certification Order# 2 Certificate of Service)(SANTILLO, ROBERT)
March 22, 2007 57 Notice of Class Plaintiffs' Submission of Proposed Class Certification Order Pursuant to Court Order of February 21, 2007 filed by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION, MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC. Certificate of Service. (TWERSKY, MARTIN) Modified on 3/23/2007 (tjd).
March 22, 2007 56 Notice of Class Plaintiffs' Submission of Proposed Class Certification Order Pursuant to Court Order of February 21, 2007 filed by ADVANCE PCS, IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. Certificate of Service. (TWERSKY, MARTIN) Modified on 3/23/2007 (tjd).
March 6, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PLAINTIFF. (SEE PAPER #55 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 6, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PLAINTIFF. (SEE PAPER #54 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 6, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PLAINTIFF. (SEE PAPER #53 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 6, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PLAINTIFF. (SEE PAPER #52 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 6, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PLAINTIFF. (SEE PAPER #51 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 6, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PLAINTIFF. (SEE PAPER #50 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 6, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PLAINTIFF. (SEE PAPER #49 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 6, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PLAINTIFF. (SEE PAPER #48 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 6, 2007 55 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (JANES, JEAN) Modified on 3/7/2007 (tjd).
March 6, 2007 54 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (JANES, JEAN) Modified on 3/7/2007 (tjd).
March 6, 2007 53 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (JANES, JEAN) Modified on 3/7/2007 (tjd).
March 6, 2007 52 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (JANES, JEAN) Modified on 3/7/2007 (tjd).
March 6, 2007 51 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (JANES, JEAN) Modified on 3/7/2007 (tjd).
March 6, 2007 50 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (JANES, JEAN) Modified on 3/7/2007 (tjd).
March 6, 2007 49 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (JANES, JEAN) Modified on 3/7/2007 (tjd).
March 6, 2007 48 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PLAINTIFF. Certificate of Service. (JANES, JEAN) Modified on 3/7/2007 (tjd).
March 5, 2007 47 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ELIOT G. LONG on behalf of ADVANCE PCS. Certificate of Service. (LONG, ELIOT) Modified on 3/6/2007 (tjd).
March 5, 2007 46 NOTICE of Appearance by LANDON Y. JONES on behalf of CAREMARK, INC., CAREMARK RX INC. with Certificate of Service(JONES, LANDON)
February 21, 2007 45 PLAINTIFFS' Joint Response Filed Under Seal to Defendants Medco and Merck's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Applies to C.A. 03-4730, 06-4115). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
February 21, 2007 44 Certified Copy of Order from the USCA that the Motion by Appellant to Change Party Name and to Amend Caption to Reflect Coporate Name Change is Granted, etc. (Applies to C.A. 03-4731). (tjd)
February 21, 2007 43 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' JOINT RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MEDCO AND MERCK'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION INCLUDING THE EXHIBITS HERETO SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 2/21/07; 2/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730, 06-4115).(tjd) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2007 (tjd, ).
February 21, 2007 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL IN EACH OF THE MDL CASES FILE A PROPOSED CLASS-CERTIFICATION ORDER WHICH FULLY COMPLIES WITH FED.R.CIV.P. 23(c)(1)(B); PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL SPECIFY CLASSES AND/OR SUBCLASSES AND THE ANTITRUST INJURY ALLEGEDLY SUFFERED BY EACH SUCH CLASS OR SUBCLASS; PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO COMPLY WITH THE FOREGOING WITHIN 30 DAYS IN WHICH TO RESPOND IF CONSIDERED NECESSARY, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 2/21/07; 2/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730, 03-4731, 06-4112, 06-4114, 06-4115, 06-4305).(tjd)
February 15, 2007 41 MOTION FOR AN ORDER SEALING PLAINTIFFS' JOINT RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MEDCO AND MERCK'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730, 06-4115).(tjd)
February 15, 2007 40 Statement Plaintiff Mike's Medical Center Pharmacy and Daniel P. Donovan D/B/A West Marin Pharmacy's Separate Statement in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (CORBITT, CRAIG)
February 15, 2007 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION decertify the plaintiff class North Jackson Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.'s Motion to Decertify the North Jackson Plaintiffs' Class filed by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARR, KATHRYN)
February 15, 2007 38 NOTICE by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION re 21 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Memorandum of Caremark RX, Inc. and Caremark Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARR, KATHRYN)
February 15, 2007 37 MOTION for Order Sealing Plaintiffs' Joint Response to Defendants Medco and Merck's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION.Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(MONTAGUE, H.)
January 30, 2007 36 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH PLAINTIFFS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTIONS MAY FILE THEIR RESPONSIVE BRIEFS TO DEFENDANTS CAREMARK INC., CAREMARK RX, INC., AND EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDA OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS EXTENDED FROM FEBRUARY 1, 2007 TO FEBRUARY 15, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 1/29/07; 1/30/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-4114, 06-4305).(tjd) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2007 (tjd, ).
January 29, 2007 35 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 RE: MASTER DOCKET AND SEPARATE ACTION DOCKETS; COUNSEL IN THE COORDINATED ACTIONS SHALL PROMPTLY MAIL A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF(S) IN EACH SUCH SUBSEQUENTLY FILED OR TRANSFERRED ACTIONS AND TO COUNSEL FOR ANY DEFENDANTS IN EACH SUCH ACTION NOT ALREADY A PARTY TO ANY ACTION THEN COORDINATED; THE COURT DESIGNATES H. LADDIE MONTAGUE, JR. AND KENNETH I. TRUJILLO AS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF ALL PLAINTIFFS; EACH ATTORNEY NOT A MEMBER OF THE BAR OF THIS COURT WHO IS ACTING AS COUNSEL FOR A PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANT HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO PRACTICE BEFORE THE COURT IN CONNECTION WITH THESE PROCEEDINGS, PROVIDED THAT RULE 83.5 OF THE LOCAL RULES IS SATISFIED, ETC.; A COPY OF EACH ORDER IN ANY OF THE COORDINATED ACTIONS WILL PROVIDED TO PLAINTIFFS' LIAISON COUNSEL AND TO DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL OF RECORD; ANY PARTY SHALL EFFECT SERVICE OF ALL PAPERS FILED ON ALL PARTIES IN THE COORDINATED ACTION(S) UPON COUNSEL OF RECORD IN THE COORDINATED ACTIONS IN WHICH THE PAPERS ARE FILED AS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST, EXHIBIT "A", ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 1/29/07; 1/30/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730, 03-4731, 06-4112, 06-4114, 06-4115, 06-4305).(tjd) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2007 (tjd, ).
January 29, 2007 34 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH ALL PLAINTIFFS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTIONS MAY FILE THEIR RESPONSIVE BRIEFS TO DEFENDANTS MEDCO AND MERCK'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS EXTENDED FROM FEBRUARY 1, 2007 TO FEBRUARY 15, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 1/29/07; 1/29/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730, 06-4115).(tjd) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2007 (tjd, ).
January 29, 2007 33 STIPULATION Extending the Time Within Which Plaintiffs May File Their Responsive Briefs by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARR, KATHRYN)
January 29, 2007 32 NOTICE by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. Notice of Withdrawal for Peter E. Kazanoff (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RUGG, CHARLTON)
January 29, 2007 31 Proposed Case Management Plan Order No. 1 by ADVANCE PCS, CAREMARK RX INC., IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.. (MONTAGUE, H.)
January 26, 2007 30 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Medco and Merck's Supplemental Memo of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (MONTAGUE, H.)
January 24, 2007 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by RUSSELL J. DRAKE (DRAKE, RUSSELL)
January 24, 2007 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 24 Notice of Appeal filed by ADVANCE PCS. USCA Case Number 07-1151. (Applies to C.A. 03-4731). (tjd)
January 22, 2007 28 Defendants MERCK & CO., INC. and MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'s Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Applies to C.A. 03-4730, 06-4115). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd)
January 22, 2007 27 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MEDCO AND MERCK'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, INCLUDING ALL EXHIBITS THERETO, BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 1/22/07; 1/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730, 06-4115).(tjd) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2007 (tjd, ).
January 19, 2007 26 NOTICE by PLAINTIFF of Change of Firm (JANES, JEAN)
January 16, 2007 25 Clerk's Notice to USCA re 24 Notice of Appeal. (tjd)
January 16, 2007 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by ADVANCE PCS. Filing fee $ 455. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and PAULA W. RENDER. Certificate of Service. (For ECF Document See Paper # 20 in 06-md-1782). (tjd)
January 16, 2007 23 MOTION FOR AN ORDER SEALING DEFENDANTS MERCK & CO., INC. AND MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. EXHIBITS, PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730, 06-4115). (Attachments: # 1 ex a# 2 ex b)(tjd)
January 16, 2007 22 MOTION decertify the plaintiff class filed by EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, and C)(DELL'OSA, ROBERT)
January 16, 2007 21 NOTICE by CAREMARK, INC., CAREMARK RX INC. Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs North Jackson Pharmacy, Inc.'s and Big C's Motion for Class Certification (06-cv-04305) (MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
January 16, 2007 20 NOTICE by ADVANCE PCS of Appeal of Order in Bellevue v. AdvancePCS (RENDER, PAULA)
January 11, 2007 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH ALL DEFENDANTS MAY FILE THEIR SUPPLEMENTAL CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING HEREIN IS EXTENDED TO JANUARY 16, 2007; THE TIME WITHIN WHICH ALL PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE THEIR RESPONSIVE BRIEFS WILL ALSO BE EXTENDED TO FEBRUARY 1, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 1/11/07; 1/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS AND MAILED.(tjd)
December 20, 2006 18 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN I. TWERSKY on behalf of IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION with Certificate of Service (TWERSKY, MARTIN)
December 20, 2006 17 NOTICE of Appearance by H. LADDIE MONTAGUE, JR on behalf of IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION with Certificate of Service (MONTAGUE, H.)
December 18, 2006 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE ORDER OF 8/20/2004 ORDERING ARBITRATION AND ENTERING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION IS VACTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 12/18/06. 12/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4731). (tjd)
December 13, 2006 15 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 12/7/06 before the Honorable John P. Fullam. (tjd)
December 7, 2006 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN P. FULLAM re: Status Conference as to c.a. 03-4730 and 03-4731, held on 12/7/06. Court Reporter: Milahn Hull. (sc, ) Modified on 12/11/2006 (sc, ).
October 30, 2006 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG C. CORBITT on behalf of PLAINTIFF with Certificate of Service (CORBITT, CRAIG)
October 30, 2006 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG C. CORBITT on behalf of PLAINTIFF with Certificate of Service (CORBITT, CRAIG)
October 27, 2006 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT V. DELL'OSA on behalf of EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. with certificate of service (DELL'OSA, ROBERT)
October 25, 2006 10 Entry of Appearance by KATHRYN C. HARR on behalf of PLAINTIFFS NORTH JACKSON PHARMACY, INC. AND C&C INC. d/b/a BIG C DISCOUNT DRUGS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 cert of service)(tjd)
October 25, 2006 9 Entry of Appearance by IRA NEIL RICHARDS on behalf of PLAINTIFFS NORTH JACKSON PHARMACY, INC. AND C&C INC. d/b/a BIG C DISCOUNT DRUGS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Service)(tjd)
October 24, 2006 8 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE IS GRANTED; A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 7, 2006 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM NO. 15A. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 10/24/06; 10/24/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(tjd)
October 24, 2006 7 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER IS GRANTED; THE PRETRIAL DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE MARCH 8, 2006 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IN C.A. 03-4730 ARE CONTINUED UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 10/24/06; 10/24/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 03-4730).(tjd)
October 23, 2006 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH I. TRUJILLO on behalf of PLAINTIFFS NORTH JACKSON PHARMACY, INC. and C&C INC. d/b/a BIG DISCOUNT DRUGS, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 cert of service)(tjd)
October 23, 2006 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order in Brady Enter. Inc. v. Medco Health Solutions, Inc. filed by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION.Service List.(MONTAGUE, H.)
September 27, 2006 4 RESPONSE in Support re 3 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Lift Stay and Dismiss Case filed by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(JANES, JEAN)
September 27, 2006 3 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Lift Stay and Dismiss Case filed by IN RE PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(JANES, JEAN)
September 14, 2006 2 MOTION For Status Conference filed by PLAINTIFFS, Service List.(MONTAGUE, H.) Modified on 9/18/2006 (np).
August 25, 2006 1 Certified Copy of Transfer Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the EDPA are transferred to that district and, assigned to the Honorable John P. Fullam for corrdinated or consolidated pretrial proceeding with the actions pending there and listed on Schedule A: Applies to c.a. 03-4730, 03-4731. (sc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?