TOLL BROS. INC. v. CENTURY SURETY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TOLL BROS. INC.
Defendant: ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY and ABC CORPS. 1-100
Counter Claimant: ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY
Counter Defendant: TOLL BROS. INC.
Case Number: 2:2007cv01296
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: LINDA K. CARACAPPA
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B. TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER THAT THE COURT'S 6/17/13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS VACATED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO TOLL'S DEFENSE CLAIM IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF FEES AND COSTS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 4/29/15. 4/29/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT TOLL'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED AND SSEX'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. A TELECONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 6/26/2013 AT 11:00 AM. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/17/13. 6/18/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON 7/6/2011 AT 11:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/24/11. 6/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY SHALL MAKE AVAILABLE FOR DEPOSITION A CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER OR RISK THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 4/6/11. 4/8/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOLL BROS. INC. v. CENTURY SURETY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOLL BROS. INC.
Represented By: LIZANNE V. HACKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GEORGE T. MCCOOL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GEORGE T. MCCOOL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: TOLL BROS. INC.
Represented By: LIZANNE V. HACKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?