SNYDER v. MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Stacy Snyder alleged that Defendant Millersville University lowered Plaintiff's ratings in professionalism from superior to unsatisfactory and stripped her of her BSE degree and teaching certification based upon a photo of the Plaintiff that appeared on her MySpace web page.

Plaintiff: STACY SNYDER
Defendant: MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY and VILAS A. PRABHU
Case Number: 2:2007cv01660
Filed: April 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: PAUL S. DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, BEVERLY SCHNELLER, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, JUDITH WENRICH, VILAS A. PRABHU AND AGAINST STACY SNYDER. THE CLERK'S OFFICE SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/3/08. 12/3/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 3, 2008 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. RE: I RETURN A VERDICT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/3/08. 12/3/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 21, 2008 Filing 46 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STACY SNYDER. Certificate of Service (VOIGT, MARK)
May 21, 2008 Filing 45 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STACY SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix PDE-338C)(VOIGT, MARK)
May 20, 2008 Filing 44 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by JUDITH WENRICH, BEVERLY SCHNELLER, MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU. Cert of Service (KRAMER, BARRY)
May 9, 2008 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND: Non Jury Trial Day 2 held on 5/7/08. (fdc, )
May 9, 2008 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/6/08 before Judge DIAMOND. Court Reporter: JOHN STASNY. NON-JURY TRIAL (jl, )
May 9, 2008 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/7/08 before Judge DIAMOND. Court Reporter: JOHN STASNY. BENCH TRIAL (jl, )
May 7, 2008 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND: Non Jury Trial - Day 1 held on 5/7/08. (fdc, )
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/2/08.5/5/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
April 22, 2008 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Support re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUDITH WENRICH, BEVERLY SCHNELLER, MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU. (KRAMER, BARRY)
April 18, 2008 Filing 37 Certificate of Service RE: RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STACY SNYDER. (VOIGT, MARK) Modified on 4/21/2008 (nd).
April 18, 2008 Filing 36 Proposed Order RE: RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STACY SNYDER. (VOIGT, MARK) Modified on 4/21/2008 (nd).
April 18, 2008 Filing 35 Affidavits RE: RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's filed by STACY SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Snyder Aff.- Exhibits 1-11, # 2 Exhibit Snyder Aff. Exhibits 12-16) (VOIGT, MARK) Modified on 4/21/2008 (nd).
April 18, 2008 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's filed by STACY SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Buffington note, # 2 Errata Bray dep and exhibits, # 3 Errata Student teacher roster CVSD, # 4 Affidavit Exhibit E- Voigt affidavit, # 5 Errata Wenrich dep)(VOIGT, MARK)
April 11, 2008 Filing 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUDITH WENRICH, BEVERLY SCHNELLER, MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU.Memorandum, Declarations, Cert of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Errata, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(KRAMER, BARRY)
March 20, 2008 Filing 32 ANSWER to 31 Amended Complaint by JUDITH WENRICH, BEVERLY SCHNELLER, MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU.(KRAMER, BARRY)
March 18, 2008 Two (2) Original Summonses Issued as to JUDITH WENRICH, BEVERLY SCHNELLER. Forwarded To: Mark W. Voigt, Esq. on 3/18/08. (fdc)
March 18, 2008 Filing 31 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against JUDITH WENRICH, BEVERLY SCHNELLER, MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU, filed by STACY SNYDER, jury demand.(fdc, )
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, ATTACHED AS PART FIVE TO HER MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/18/08. 3/18/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT IF DEFENDANTS OPPOSE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THAT MOTION BY 5:00 PM ON 3/14/08. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/7/08. 3/10/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE UNTIL FRIDAY, APRIL 11, 2008 TO FILE ANY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OR OTHER DISPOSITIVE MOTION TOGETHER WITH SUPPORTING BRIEFS. RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE APRIL 18, 2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 03/06/08. 03/07/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.
March 6, 2008 Filing 27 First MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by STACY SNYDER.Memorandum, Cert of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Cert of Service, # 2 Errata Memo of Law, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Order re Motion, # 4 Errata Proposed Third Amended Complaint)(VOIGT, MARK)
February 28, 2008 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 2/26/08 (fdc, )
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT IF PLAINTIFF WISHES TO ADD DR. JUDITH WENRICH AS AN ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT, SHE SHALL FILE A MOTION TO THAT EFFECT. DEFENDANT NEED NOT RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S ONE-HUNDRED NINETEEN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS. THE LARGE NUMBER, NATURE, AND TIMING OF THE REQUESTS SUGGESTS THAT THEY ARE ABUSIVE. DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SET I INTERROGATORIES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/25/08. 2/25/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
February 15, 2008 Filing 24 ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint by J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (KRAMER, BARRY) Modified on 2/19/2008 (nd).
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/30/08.1/31/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 3/14/08, DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/18/08, PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/18/08, MOTIONS DUE BY 4/21/08, FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/30/08 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND, TRIAL DATE SET FOR 5/6/08 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/30/08. 1/31/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 7, 2008 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/15/07 before Judge DIAMOND. Court Reporter: JOHN STASNY. HEARING (jl, )
October 31, 2007 Filing 20 Memorandum re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by STACY SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Certificate of Service# 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(VOIGT, MARK)
October 22, 2007 ***Update Answer Deadline (fdc, )
October 17, 2007 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU.Memorandum, Cert of Service.(KRAMER, BARRY)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 5:00 PM ON 10/19/07. SIGNED BY JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/12/07. 10/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 12, 2007 Filing 17 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU filed by STACY SNYDER.(stb, )
October 8, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE by STACY SNYDER Second Amended Complaint (VOIGT, MARK) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE IN HARD COPY) Modified on 10/9/2007 (nd).
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART. SIGNED BY JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/17/07. 9/18/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 7, 2007 Filing 14 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(KRAMER, BARRY) Modified on 9/10/2007 (afm, ).
September 3, 2007 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by STACY SNYDER. (VOIGT, MARK)
September 3, 2007 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Memo of Law in Oppo to filed by STACY SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Memo of Law# 2 Errata Certificate of Service# 3 Errata Order)(VOIGT, MARK) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2007 (fdc, ).
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 5:00 PM ON 9/4/07. SIGNED BY JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/20/07. 8/21/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT TRANSFER SAID CASE FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE TO THE CURRENT DOCKET FOR FINAL DISPOSITION. SIGNED BY JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/20/07. 8/21/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. SIGNED BY JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/18/07. 6/19/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A SECOND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/15/07 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. SIGNED BY JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/13/07. 6/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 23, 2007 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU.Memorandum, Cert of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(KRAMER, BARRY)
May 13, 2007 Filing 6 Amended Complaint filed by STACY SNYDER against MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, DR. JANE S. BRAY and DR. VILAS A. PRABHU. (VOIGT, MARK) Modified on 5/14/2007 (le, ).
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR ANSWER, RESPONSE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY NOON ON 5/24/07. SIGNED BY JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/8/07. 5/8/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 7, 2007 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU. MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 5/7/2007, answer due 7/6/2007; J. BARRY GIRVIN waiver sent on 5/7/2007, answer due 7/6/2007; JANE S. BRAY waiver sent on 5/7/2007, answer due 7/6/2007; VILAS A. PRABHU waiver sent on 5/7/2007, answer due 7/6/2007. (KRAMER, BARRY)
May 7, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing:RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/25/2007 09:30 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(cj, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY N. KRAMER on behalf of MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU with cert of service(KRAMER, BARRY)
April 25, 2007 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STACY SNYDER. (ks, )
April 25, 2007 4 Summonses Issued as to MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY, J. BARRY GIRVIN, JANE S. BRAY, VILAS A. PRABHU. Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/25/07 (ks, )
April 25, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 938850.), filed by STACY SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet# 2 Case Mgmt. Track# 3 Designation Form)(ks, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNYDER v. MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY SNYDER
Represented By: MARK W. VOIGT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLERSVILLE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: BARRY N. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BARRY GIRVIN
Represented By: BARRY N. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE S. BRAY
Represented By: BARRY N. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VILAS A. PRABHU
Represented By: BARRY N. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?