EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED v. SAPIENT Featured Case

Plaintiff Explorologist Ltd. alleged that Defendant Brian Sapient a/k/a Brian J. Cutler d/b/a Rational Response Squad for infringing British copyright law. Defendant allegedly uploaded to YouTube a sequence of images entitled "James Randi exposes Uri Geller and Peter Popoff," which included portions of the film "Dr Hughes."

Plaintiff: EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED
Defendant: BRIAN SAPIENT
Case Number: 2:2007cv01848
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the U.S.
Presiding Judge: M. FAITH ANGELL
Presiding Judge: LOUIS H. POLLAK
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 07/14/08. 7/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (db,)
July 11, 2008 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER: Settlement Conference held on 7/11/08. (gn, )
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER THAT THE CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON PLFF'S MOTON TO DISMISS AND DEFT'S MOTION TO AMEND WILL E SCHEDULED, IF NECESSARY, AFTER SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS HAVE BEEN COMPLETED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 6/3/08. ) 6/4/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
May 22, 2008 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Certificate of Service (REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Reply Brief)(COOPER, CHAD) Modified on 5/27/2008 (afm, ).
May 21, 2008 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to FRCP 33, 34 and LRCP 26.1(g) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(FRANK, ALAN)
May 6, 2008 Filing 62 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to FRCP 33, 34 and LRCP 26.1(g) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, CHAD)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET DEFT'S REPLY AS FILED AS OF 3/17/08. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 3/18/08. ) 3/20/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT I BE RECUSED FROM THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER AND THAT THIS CASE SHALL BE REMOVED FROM MY DOCKET AND TRANSFERRED TO THE DOCKET OF THE HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 3/17/08. )3/18/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
March 17, 2008 Filing 61 Reply Brief in support of deft's motion to amend pursuant to FRCP 13 and 15, filed by deft BRIAN SAPIENT, Certificate of Service. (gn, )
March 17, 2008 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief (uncontested as to motion to file reply) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Certificate of Concurrence, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Reply Brief)(COOPER, CHAD)
March 10, 2008 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(WINELANDER, RICHARD)
March 7, 2008 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re 52 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Dismiss filed by BRIAN SAPIENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exs. A-C)(COOPER, CHAD)
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT THE TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WHICH WAS SCHEDULED FOR 3/18/08 IS CANCELLED. THE IN-PERSON CONFERENCE WHICH WAS SCHEDULED FOR 3/6/08, IS CONTINUED, AND IT WILL NOW TAKE PLACE ON 3/18/08 AT 10:30AM IN COURTROOM 7 (COURT OF APPEALS COURTROOM), SECOND FLOOR, ROBERT N.C. NIX SR., FED BLDG. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 2/25/08. ) 2/26/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
February 22, 2008 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Brief, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer w/ Counterclaims, # 4 Exhibit Exs. B-G to Motion)(COOPER, CHAD)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT AN IN-PERSON CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 3/6/08 AT 11:00AM IN COURTROOM 7 IN THE ROBERT N.C. NIX, SR. FEDERAL BLDG. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 2/19/08. ) 2/21/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
February 19, 2008 Filing 52 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Dismiss filed by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED..Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(WINELANDER, RICHARD)
February 15, 2008 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 2/15/08 (gn, )
February 15, 2008 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED..Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(WINELANDER, RICHARD)
February 8, 2008 Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing: A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 2/15/2008 AT 10:30 AM.(gn, )
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL (3) WEEK EXTENSION UNTIL 2/21/08 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 1/30/08. ) 1/31/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT PLFF'S COUNSEL SHALL PRODUCE MR. URI GELLER INPHILA., PA FOR MR. GELLER'S DEPOSITION BEFORE THE CLOSE OF FACT-BASED DISCOVERY, WHICH IS 3/17/08. SHOULD MR. GELLER NOT BE PRODUCED INPHILA FOR HIS DEPOSITION DURING THIS TIME PERIOD, HE WILL NOT BE A WITNESS AT THE TRIAL OF THIS MATTER. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 1/28/08. ) 1/29/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 46 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF FILED BY MOVANTS GOOGLE, INC., COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION, INC., AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES, ASSOCIATION OF RESEARCH LIBRARIES and SPECIAL LIBRARIES ASSOCIATION AND PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (AMICUS BRIEF ATTACHED)(mbh, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on British Copyright Law filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Brief, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Appendix Part 1, # 4 Appendix Part 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits 4-10)(COOPER, CHAD) ( Exhibit 6 in hard copy CD Disk) Modified on 1/15/2008 (gn, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES ARE TO WORK TOGETHER TO COMPLETE ALL FACT BASED DISCOVERY, APART FROM EXPERT DISCOVERY, BUT INCLUDING THE EXCHANING OF SELF-EXECTUING DISLOSURES, PROPOUNDING AND RESPONDING TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES, AND THE JOINDER OF NEW PARTIES, NO LATER THAN 3/17/2007. A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/18/2008 10:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CONFERENCE CALL TO 215-597-6079.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 12/18/2007. 12/20/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ap, )
December 20, 2007 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK: In-Person Conference held on 12/18/2007. (ap, )
December 10, 2007 Filing 42 Disclosure with US Mail by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED.(WINELANDER, RICHARD)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER THAT DEFT'S UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED AND DEFT IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PAERS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S 10/25/07 ORDER ON OR BEFORE 1/14/08. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 12/4/07. ) 12/5/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
November 29, 2007 Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by BRIAN SAPIENT with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (COOPER, CHAD) Modified on 11/30/2007 (nd).
November 21, 2007 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Uncontested) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, CHAD)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS IN THIS ACTION HAVING BEEN GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART BY THE HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 10/25/07, THE STAY OF THIS MATTER IS LIFTED. THE TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WHICH WAS SCHEDULED FOR 11/5/07 IS CONTINUED, AND AN IN-PERSON RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/18/07 AT 10:30AM IN COURTROOM 7. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 11/5/07. ) 11/6/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) Modified on 1/30/2008 (afm, ).
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR RE-FILINGS PURSUANT TO THE 10/25/07 MEMORANDUM/ORDER IS 11/29/07. THIS MEMORANDUM/ORDER WAS DOCKETED AND FORWARDED TO COUNSEL ON 10/29/07. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 11/1/07. ) 11/2/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
November 1, 2007 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge LOUIS H. POLLAK : Oral Argument held on 10/24/07. Argued Sur: Deft's motion to dismiss. ESR Reporter: Megan McDevitt. (gn, )
October 29, 2007 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, AS TO DEFT'S ARGUMENT REGARDING THE PLACE ON INFRINGEMENT, IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND DEFT IS GRANTED LEAVE TO RE-FILE THAT MOTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ABOVE WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER. DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED, AND THAT CLAIM IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; PLFF MAY RE-PLEAD, AS SOON AS SPECIFIED ABOVE, WITHIN 30 DAYS. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS, DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 10/25/07. ) 10/29/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WILL BE HELD ON 10/24/07 AT 2:14PM IN COURTROOM 16-B. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 10/11/07. )10/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
September 20, 2007 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Address by CHAD COOPER(COOPER, CHAD)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT THE TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WHICH WAS SCHEDULED FOR 9/20/07 IS CONTINUED AND IT WILL NOW TAKE PLACED ON 11/5/07 AT 2:00PM TO DETERMINE THE STATUS OF THE CASE AND HOW BEST TO PROCEED TOWARDS ITS RESOLUTION. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 9/19/07. ) 9/20/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
July 18, 2007 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge M. FAITH ANGELL : Pretrial Conference held on 7/18/07 (gn, )
July 18, 2007 Filing 30 Reply Brief in support of deft's motion to dismiss pusuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6 filed by deft BRIAN SAPIENT, Certificate of Service. (gn, )
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED, AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE REPLY MEMORANDUM IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 7/17/07. ) 7/19/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER SHALL BE STAYED UNTIL 9/17/07, PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 9/20/2007 AT 02:00 PM. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 7/18/07. ) 7/19/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
July 9, 2007 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief (uncontested as to motion to file reply) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service (REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED).Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Reply Brief# 3 Appendix of Foreign Authorities)(COOPER, CHAD) Modified on 7/10/2007 (afm, ).
June 28, 2007 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Foreign Authorities# 2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(WINELANDER, RICHARD)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MARCIA HOFMANN ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BRIAN SPAIANT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 6/12/07. 6/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stb, )
June 13, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL W. SILVER on behalf of BRIAN SAPIENT with Certificate of Service(SILVER, SAMUEL)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT TH APPLICATION OF JASON SCHULTZ, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF DEFT BRIAN SAPENT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 6/12/07. ) 6/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CORYNNE MCSHERRY, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 6/12/07. ) 6/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KURT OPSAHL, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF DEFT BRIAN SAPIENT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 6/12/07. ) 6/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 20 Request for Judicial Notice in support of deft Brian Sapient's motion to dismiss, filed by deft BRIAN SAPIENT, Brief, Certificate of Service and Exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Brief# 2 Proposed Order# 3 Exhibits)(gn, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Brief, REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT, APPENDIX AND Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Request for Oral Argument# 3 Appendix Foreign Authorities)(COOPER, CHAD) Modified on 6/12/2007 (afm, ).
June 7, 2007 Filing 18 APPLICATION BY DEFT BRIAN SAPIENT FOR PRO HAC VICE OF KURT OPSAHL, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICAATE OF SERVICE. (gn, ) ( DUPLICATE FILING - FILED IN ERROR ) Modified on 6/7/2007 (gn, ).
June 7, 2007 Filing 17 APPLICATION BY DEFT BRIAN SAPIENT FOR PRO HAC VICE OF MARCIA HOFMANN, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, ) ( DUPLIATE FILING - FILED IN ERROR ) Modified on 6/7/2007 (gn, ).
June 7, 2007 Filing 16 APPLICATION BY DEFT BRIAN SAPIENT FOR PRO HAC VICE OF JASON SCHULTZ, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, ) ( DUPLICATE FILING - FILED IN ERROR ) Modified on 6/7/2007 (gn, ).
June 7, 2007 Filing 15 APPLICATION by deft BRIAN SAPIENT for pro hac vice of CORYNNE McSHERRY, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, ) ( FILED IN ERROR DUPLICATE FILING) Modified on 6/7/2007 (gn, ).
June 7, 2007 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Kurt Opsahl (on behalf of Defendant) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, CHAD)
June 7, 2007 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Marcia Hofmann (on behalf of Defendant) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, CHAD)
June 7, 2007 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jason Schultz (on behalf of Defendant) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Ceritifcate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, CHAD)
June 7, 2007 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Corynne McSherry (on behalf of Defendant) filed by BRIAN SAPIENT.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, CHAD)
May 30, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHAD COOPER on behalf of BRIAN SAPIENT with Certificate of Service(COOPER, CHAD)
May 23, 2007 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against deft BRIAN SAPIENT with jury demand, filed by plff EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED, Certificate of Service.(gn, )
May 21, 2007 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED re 7 Order,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Certificate of Service regarding Court Order dated May 18, 2007 (FRANK, ALAN)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN THIS MATTER WILL BE HELD ON 7/18/2007 AT 11:40 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELLIN COURTROOM 7 IN THE ROBERT N.C. NIX FEDERAL BUILDING. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/18/07. )5/21/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE M. FAITH ANGELL, MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT PURPOSES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO UTILIZATION OF FRCP 16 MANAGEMENT PROCEDURES, RESOLUTION OF ALL DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.; AND SEEKING THE CONSENT OF THE PARTIES FOR FINAL RESOLUTION OF THE CASE BY FINAL JUDGMENT BY THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 5/16/07. ) 5/17/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND.(gn, )
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RICHARD WINELANDER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 5/10/07. ) 5/14/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(gn, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED re: Scott Segal served Summons and Complaint upon BRIAN SAPIENT by Served personally upon the Defendant. BRIAN SAPIENT served on 5/11/2007, answer due 5/31/2007. (FRANK, ALAN)
May 7, 2007 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED.(tj, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD WINELANDER SEEKING TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED, Certificate of Service. (Receipt #939141 Fee Paid $40.00) (tj, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN SAPIENT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 939142.), filed by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet# 2 Designatino Form# 3 Tracking Form)(tj, )
May 7, 2007 Summons Issued; 1 Mailed to counsel 5/8/07 as to BRIAN SAPIENT. (tj, )
May 7, 2007 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED. (tj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED v. SAPIENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXPLOROLOGIST LIMITED
Represented By: RICHARD WINELANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN SAPIENT
Represented By: SAMUEL W. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?