SEGAL et al v. STRAUSSER ENTERPRISES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH SEGAL, ADAM SEGAL and SEGAL AND MOREL, INC.
Defendant: STRAUSSER ENTERPRISES, INC., GARY STRAUSSER and LEONARD MELLON
Case Number: 2:2007cv04647
Filed: November 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: JAMES KNOLL GARDNER
Presiding Judge: HENRY S. PERKIN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER THAT STRAUSSER DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY (ECF DOCKET NO. 427 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/24/19. 10/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEYS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER OF 6/12/2019 THAT AFTER REVIEWING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC NOS. 394 & 397), ALL SUPPORTING AND OPPOSING PAPERS, AND FOR THE REASONS MORE FULLY STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/12/19. 6/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(DT)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 OPINION/ORDER THAT THE STRAUSSER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF TAX RETURNS OF MR. SEGAL AND THE TRUST IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 8/8/13. 8/8/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 OPINION/ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL THE STRAUSSER DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PROVIDED TO THEM BY LAFAYETTE BANK IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 2/10/12. 2/10/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ky, )
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT LEONARD MELLON, ESQUIRE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S OPINION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT MELLON SHALL HAVE UNTIL 9/1/2011 TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 8/11/2011. 8/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stwe, )
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM/ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' LETTER MOTION #195 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 3/1/11. 3/2/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT PLAINTIFFS' DECEMBER 1, 2010 LETTER MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 3/1/11. 3/2/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO QUASH ARE GRANTED IN PART; ALL REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS ARE DENIED; AND DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF THE SUBPOENA IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 10/7/10. 10/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY LITIGATION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 11/19/09. 11/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEGAL et al v. STRAUSSER ENTERPRISES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH SEGAL
Represented By: BRIAN S. PASZAMANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM SEGAL
Represented By: BRIAN S. PASZAMANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEGAL AND MOREL, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN S. PASZAMANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRAUSSER ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY STRAUSSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONARD MELLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?