SIMMS et al v. A.C. AND S. INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY) et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT W. SIMMS and RUTH ELAINE SIMMS
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY, A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, PLIBRICO COMPANY, T&N, PLC, CRANE CO., MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP., HONEYWELL CORP., NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY, DB RILEY, INC., CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, MACK TRUCKS, INC., GOULD PUMPS, INC., CATERPILLAR, INC., PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, BURNHAM CORPORATION, A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC., MAREMONT CORP., PROKO INDUSTRIES INC., KEELER-DORR-OLIVER BOILER COMPANY, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP., MORSE-DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, FERODO AMERICAN, INC., DEERE & CO., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY, AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., TDY INDUSTRIES, INC., UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY, DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY, DANA CORPORATION, FEDERAL MOGUL PRODUCTS, INC., FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC., H.B. FULLER COMPANY, VIACOM, INC., STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, HARBISON WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY, MCCORD CORPORATION, OKONITE COMPANY, PERKINS ENGINES, INC., GARLOCK, INC., QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., NOSROC CORP., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION, OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION, BMCE INC., REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, LIPE-AUTOMATION CORP., I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER), WABCO, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC., PORTER-HAYDEN COMPANY, KOHLER CO., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION, RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE, ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, OAKFABCO, INC., A.C. AND S. INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY), NATIONAL SERVICE INDUSTRIES, INC., A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC., GASKET HOLDINGS, INC., GOODYEAR CANADA, INC., WORTHINGTON CORPORATION, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY, PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION, INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY, INC., PACCAR, INC., PEERLESS HEATER CO. INC., CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC., KENTILE FLOORS, INC. and U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL)
Case Number: 2:2007cv66304
Filed: July 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP., ONLY, IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY CO-DEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE ALSO DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/2/2012. 11/3/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, )
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, ONLY, IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY CO-DEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE ALSO DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/31/2012. 11/2/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, )
January 5, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN M. KASMIR on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (KASMIR, JUSTIN)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A) (2); THAT THE CASES WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY ONLY" DOCKET; AND THAT EACH OF THESE CASES SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/1/2010. 6/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A) (2); THAT THE CASES WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY ONLY" DOCKET; AND THAT EACH OF THESE CASES SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/1/2010. 6/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CAPTIONED CASES ON 6/1/2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/2010. 5/5/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(SEE PAPER # 7201 IN 01-MD-875 FOR CASE LIST).(ah)
August 31, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD CEDRONE on behalf of FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION (CEDRONE, GERARD)
August 28, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF OLD COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS GOODYEAR CANADA, INC., GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY. DIANE POMPEI APPEARING FOR GOODYEAR CANADA, INC., AND GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY. PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB WITHDRAWS AS COUNSEL FOR GOODYEAR CANADA, INC., AND GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY. (er, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ON 8/25/2009 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND/OR CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE; ETC.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/6/2009. 8/7/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED. (amas)
July 27, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE by MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC. of Substitution of Attorney; Appearance of RUSSELL PEPE; Withdrawal of CLAUDE D. MONTGOMERY. (PEPE, RUSSELL) Modified on 7/29/2009 (md, ).
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ON TUESDAY, JULY 28, 2009 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND/OR CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE; ETC. 7/13/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kk, )
June 25, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(JONES, CHRISTI)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES. 6/02/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kmk)
July 16, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (jw, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jw, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 53 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMMS et al v. A.C. AND S. INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY
Represented By: ERICH GLEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIBRICO COMPANY
Represented By: ROY D. GOLDBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&N, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: RUSSELL A. PEPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB RILEY, INC.
Represented By: DONALD J. FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGOLEUM CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS A. RHATIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS J. MAIMONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: PAUL F. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM CORPORATION
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROKO INDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER-DORR-OLIVER BOILER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP.
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Represented By: COLLEEN M. CRONIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORSE-DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BRADLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Represented By: DIANE MICHELE POMPEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERODO AMERICAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEERE & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: JUSTIN M. KASMIR
Represented By: LARRY D. BLOOMSTEIN
Represented By: TERRANCE PATRICK FLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL MOGUL PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL T. LEWANDOWSKI
Represented By: JANINE MARIE GARGIULO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC.
Represented By: SUZANNE M. HALBARDIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BRADLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBISON WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCORD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKONITE COMPANY
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERKINS ENGINES, INC.
Represented By: PAUL F. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOSROC CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMCE INC.
Represented By: COLLEEN M. CRONIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY
Represented By: RAYMOND F. GEOFFREY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPE-AUTOMATION CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABCO
Represented By: ERICH GLEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT H. CASHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER-HAYDEN COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL T. LEWANDOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER CO.
Represented By: MARC SCOTT GAFFREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: ERICH GLEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION
Represented By: GERARD CEDRONE
Represented By: JOSEPH A. CHURGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION
Represented By: JOEL SLAWOTSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD H. RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. AND S. INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SERVICE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: DIANE MICHELE POMPEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GASKET HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL T. LEWANDOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.
Represented By: PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORTHINGTON CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTT H. CASHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION
Represented By: BARBARA J. BUBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BRADLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS HEATER CO. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENTILE FLOORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT W. SIMMS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH ELAINE SIMMS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?