ANDERSON et al v. A C AND S INC et al
Plaintiff: WALTER EUGENE COLLATT, MARY BLAYLOCK, VERNELL BRADLEY, JANIS CHRISTIAN, VIRGINIA BURSE, ANNA BROWN, DIANNE WEST, ALAMAE HARRIS, JOEL RAY BISBEE, DARLENE GOODNIGHT, GEORGE EARL KIDDER, ALVIN F. KING, II, JAMES EDWARD BLAYLOCK, ROBERT E. WESTON, SARAH DANIELS, MacARTHUR BURCH, CHARLES EDWIN EDWARDS, DONNA MILLER, ALFRED BROWN, CATHY SNEED, LOURAH BIDDLE, EVELYN HOWELL, SR. BENNETT COFFEYCLAUDE, CHARLES A. FARROW, LEE JACKSONHOMER, JAMES GARNER, JULIE FOGLER, MARVIN JENKINS, CLARENCE A. JOHNSON, FRANKLIN HARRISJOHNNY, PEARLINE PHILLIPS, DENNIS LOWELL GRANT, REGINA COLLINS, RICKY ALLEN RENFRO, TAMMY NELSON, JOHN D, HOWELL, BILLY RUSSELL MITCHELL, BARBARA NARDUZZI, F. CRABTREEJOY, BRUCE E. COLLINS, DONALD WEST, JR. MAJOR COLEMAN, HERMAN WAYNE BUCK, DOROTHY JENNINGS, WILLIE MASON, CLARK MAE BRODNAX, ROBERT GREEN PLEASANT, LINDA EDWARDS, KAREN DILDY, GARY RALPH CHITWOOD, LILLIE RUTH STANLEY, JOYCE HENDERSON, TAD ELMER FURRER, RICKY G. TODD, LORETTA PATTERSON, JOHN HENRY BRODNAX, RENA FAYE GENTLE, TRUDY CARPENTER, ERVIN DALE COLLINS, JAMES CLENON DONALD, REAMEY S. KIDDER, FREDERICK G. KYLE, DEBBIE SMITH, VICKI RENEE DENHAM, WILLIE R. PARKS, JOHN OSCAR HUDSON, CHARLES EDWARD WHITMORE, SHELBY BOURLAND, ANDREW GREEN, JERRY MARLOE PIGUE, CHARLES HENRY HOLMON, JAMES ELI BARKLEY, ELIMISH PHILLIPS, MATTIE MASON, WILLIAM L. BINGHAM, LARRY ANTHONY SMITH, KATHY MITCHELL, DAISY PARKS, EDDIE L. HAMMOCK, NEDRA WYNONA GARNER, BEN F. MILLER, SARAH SMITH, CHARLENE ANDERSON, ALLEN T. SMITH, ALLEN HUGH GLADDEN, MARTIN BRADLEY, LINDA DANIELS, JOSEPH TUELL, F. G. KYLE, W.A. BURSE, MARY COLLATT, SHIRLEY NARAMORE, JOHN ROBERT HIXON, RONALD DOUGLAS GREEN, DELUNCIE JACKSON, WILHELMINA SMITH, PAT TODD, EULETA WARE, ANITA GLADDEN, GARY W. DICKINSON, PHYLLIS KYLE, JOYCE HIXON, JACK R. NARDUZZI, SR., SHIRLEY KING, ALVIN EARL DILDY, WILLIE STILLS, JR., KAREN GRANT, SR. EUGENE BIDDLE, McKINSEY PIGGEE, JR., DEWANNA WESTON, JAMES EARL HENDERSON, LEONARD GREEN, LORI HARRIS, DURLEY WINFREY, GEORGE DORRIS, GLEN DENHAM, FRANCES JACQUELYN ERMER, PHYLLIS TRAMMELL, DOROTHY DONALD, ROBERT LEE DISMUKE, STEVEN RAY BURKS, MARGARET KIDDER, CYNTHIA WINFREY, DIAN KYLEPHYLLIS, WARREN E. SMOKE, RONALD LEE NELSON, JOE T. NARAMORE, JAMES EDWARD BROWN, CHARLES ROBERT DANIELS, WILLIE LANE WASHINGTON, ANNA LAVONNE TUELL, MARY JOHNSON, PEGGY WASHINGTON, GLORIA JEAN DORRIS, EUGENE GOODNIGHT, FLOSSIE GREEN, RICHARD SEDRIC NORWOOD, LEVORN COLEMAN, TOMMY GENTLE, EARLINE PIGGEE, EUGENE A. WARE, PHYLLIS NORWOOD, OSSIE B. SMITH, MONA JOHNSON, ELBERT C. BROWN, GLENDA FURRER, WALTER LEE PATTERSON, LINDA COLLINS, JUDY CHITWOOD, WILLIAM HENRY CARPENTER, CLARENCE LEE ANDERSON, FRANCIS EUGENE BOURLAND, DEL DANIELS, DORIS LORETTA GREEN, OLA MAE BUCK, HAYNES KEITH LAYROCK, EDWAED RAY COOPER, DONNA PILGREEN, SHANNON BISBEE, ALLEN SIMPSON, BARBARA BARKLEY, EDWIN JENNINGS, MELVEN TRAMMELL, MARIC DANIELS, JR., DEBORAH WHITMORE, WILLIE LEE CHRISTIAN, CHARLES GEORGE SNEED, HAZEL DISMUKE, VICTOR ALAN FOGLER, LENA MARIE COOPER, MARY LAYROCK, MARIE BROWN, SIDNEY EVERETT PILGREEN, JIMMY VAN JOHNSON, SANDRA PLEASANT, MAXINE COFFEY, PAM HAMMOCK and JESSIE MAE JENKINS
Defendant: WEIL MCLAIN COMPANY, INC., AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., FEDERAL MOGUL PRODUCTS, INC., T&R ENVIRONMENT CORP., DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, PLIBRICO COMPANY, CRANE CO., A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC., MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, DANA CORPORATION, CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, BORG WARNER CORPORATION, LIPE AUTOMATION CORP., QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., CATERPILLAR, INC., BURNHAM CORPORATION, A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC., FELT PRODUCTS MFG. CO., WORTHINGTON CORPORATION, CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, MAREMONT CORP, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, INC., DB RILEY, INC., FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION, DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY, FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC., NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY, HONEYWELL CORP, PERKINS ENGINE, INC., H.B. FULLER COMPANY, CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION, MCCORD CORPORATION, A.C. AND S. INC., INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, OKONITE COMPANY, INC., AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY, NOSROC CORP., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., PROKO INDUSTRIES, INC., RHONE POULENC, KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION, BMCE INC., INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, DEERE & CO., MOOG AUTOMOTIVE, PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION, I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, WABCO, UNION CARBIDE, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP., KEELER DORR OLIVER BOILER COMPANY, DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC., FERODO AMERICAN INC., KOHLER CO., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GARLOCK, INC., HARBISON WALKER REFRACTIES COMPANY, AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., U.S. RUBBER COMPANY, RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION, MACK TRUCKS, INC., MORSE DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC., PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY, ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, OAKFABCO, INC., GASKET HOLDINGS, INC., PORTER HAYDEN COMPANY, PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, OWENS ILLINOIS, INC., PFIZER, INC., STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC., TDY INDUSTRIES, INC., J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY, PACCAR, INC., GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC., KENTILE FLOORS, INC. and VIACOM INC.
Case Number: 2:2007cv66402
Filed: July 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP., ONLY, IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY CO-DEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE ALSO DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/2/2012. 11/3/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, )
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT WHEREAS NO PARTY HERETO IS AN INFANT, INCOMPETENT PERSON FOR WHOM A COMMITTEE HAS BEEN APPOINTED OR CONSERVATEE AND NO PERSON NOT A PARTY HAS AN INTERST IN THE SUBJECT MATTER OF THIS ACTION, THE ABOVE ENTITLED ACTION BE, AND THE SAME HEREBY IS DISCONTINUED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTERST BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC. AND THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY CODEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/31/12. 11/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 11/1/2012 (jaa, ).
July 16, 2010 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE. (PASCARELLA, LISA) Modified on 7/19/2010 (jaa, ).
July 16, 2010 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.. COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE.(PASCARELLA, LISA) Modified on 7/19/2010 (jaa, ).
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A) (2); THAT THE CASES WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY ONLY" DOCKET; AND THAT EACH OF THESE CASES SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/1/2010. 6/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CAPTIONED CASES ON 6/1/2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/2010. 5/5/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(SEE PAPER # 7201 IN 01-MD-875 FOR CASE LIST).(ah)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT CONSENT TO THE SUBSITUTION OF MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM, ESQ. OF SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLP, AS ATTORNEYS FOR THE DEFT. FOSTER WHELLER, LLC IN ALL MATTERS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED DOCKET SHEET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/23/10. 3/24/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(er, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD CEDRONE on behalf of FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION (CEDRONE, GERARD)
August 28, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Substitution by DIANE MICHELE POMPEI on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.(er, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ON 8/25/2009 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND/OR CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/6/2009. 8/7/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ccg, )
July 24, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE by MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC. of Substitution of Attorney; Appearance of RUSSELL PEPE; Withdrawal of CLAUDE D. MONTGOMERY (PEPE, RUSSELL) Modified on 7/28/2009 (md).
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ON 7/28/2009 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND/OR CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/8/2009. 7/13/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, )
June 25, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(JONES, CHRISTI)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(lisad, )
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERD THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jl, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (gn, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 53 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (gn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON et al v. A C AND S INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL MCLAIN COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL MOGUL PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&R ENVIRONMENT CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIBRICO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: RUSSELL A. PEPE
Represented By: JONATHAN GLENN KORTMANSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL ALAN TANENBAUM
Represented By: JUDITH ANN LOCKHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGOLEUM CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS A. RHATIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPE AUTOMATION CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: O. DANIEL ANSA
Represented By: DIANE MICHELE POMPEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM CORPORATION
Represented By: MATTHEW ROBERT STRAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELT PRODUCTS MFG. CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORTHINGTON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: ELLIOT JORDAN ZUCKER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: TERRANCE PATRICK FLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.
Represented By: PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB
Represented By: DIANE MICHELE POMPEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB RILEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION
Represented By: GERARD CEDRONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC.
Represented By: SUZANNE M. HALBARDIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES D. BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERKINS ENGINE, INC.
Represented By: O. DANIEL ANSA
Represented By: DIANE MICHELE POMPEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Represented By: VERONICA LAVALLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCORD CORPORATION
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. AND S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKONITE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Represented By: ERIC JOHN SAUTER
Represented By: COLLEEN M. CRONIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY J. MCHUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOSROC CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROKO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHONE POULENC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMCE INC.
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. MCCANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEERE & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOOG AUTOMOTIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Represented By: BARBARA J. BUBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY
Represented By: RAYMOND F. GEOFFREY, III
Represented By: ROBERT M. ROLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP.
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Represented By: COLLEEN M. CRONIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER DORR OLIVER BOILER COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD P. MARIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERODO AMERICAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBISON WALKER REFRACTIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: LISA M. PASCARELLA
Represented By: ERICH GLEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. RUBBER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD ADAM SENZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORSE DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GASKET HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER HAYDEN COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. MCCANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW ROBERT STRAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB
Represented By: DIANE MICHELE POMPEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENTILE FLOORS, INC.
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BRADLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER EUGENE COLLATT
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY BLAYLOCK
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERNELL BRADLEY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANIS CHRISTIAN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA BURSE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA BROWN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNE WEST
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAMAE HARRIS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL RAY BISBEE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE GOODNIGHT
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE EARL KIDDER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVIN F. KING, II
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES EDWARD BLAYLOCK
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. WESTON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH DANIELS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacARTHUR BURCH
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES EDWIN EDWARDS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA MILLER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED BROWN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY SNEED
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOURAH BIDDLE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN HOWELL
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SR. BENNETT COFFEYCLAUDE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES A. FARROW
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEE JACKSONHOMER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GARNER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE FOGLER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARVIN JENKINS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARENCE A. JOHNSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN HARRISJOHNNY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEARLINE PHILLIPS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS LOWELL GRANT
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA COLLINS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY ALLEN RENFRO
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY NELSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN D, HOWELL
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY RUSSELL MITCHELL
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA NARDUZZI
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. CRABTREEJOY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE E. COLLINS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD WEST
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JR. MAJOR COLEMAN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERMAN WAYNE BUCK
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY JENNINGS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE MASON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARK MAE BRODNAX
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT GREEN PLEASANT
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA EDWARDS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN DILDY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY RALPH CHITWOOD
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LILLIE RUTH STANLEY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE HENDERSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAD ELMER FURRER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY G. TODD
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORETTA PATTERSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HENRY BRODNAX
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENA FAYE GENTLE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUDY CARPENTER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERVIN DALE COLLINS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CLENON DONALD
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REAMEY S. KIDDER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK G. KYLE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBBIE SMITH
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI RENEE DENHAM
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE R. PARKS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN OSCAR HUDSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES EDWARD WHITMORE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELBY BOURLAND
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW GREEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY MARLOE PIGUE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES HENRY HOLMON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ELI BARKLEY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIMISH PHILLIPS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTIE MASON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. BINGHAM
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY ANTHONY SMITH
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY MITCHELL
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAISY PARKS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE L. HAMMOCK
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEDRA WYNONA GARNER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEN F. MILLER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH SMITH
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE ANDERSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN T. SMITH
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN HUGH GLADDEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN BRADLEY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA DANIELS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH TUELL
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. G. KYLE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.A. BURSE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY COLLATT
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY NARAMORE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ROBERT HIXON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD DOUGLAS GREEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELUNCIE JACKSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILHELMINA SMITH
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAT TODD
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EULETA WARE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANITA GLADDEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY W. DICKINSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS KYLE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE HIXON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK R. NARDUZZI, SR.
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY KING
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVIN EARL DILDY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE STILLS, JR.
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN GRANT
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SR. EUGENE BIDDLE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKINSEY PIGGEE, JR.
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEWANNA WESTON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES EARL HENDERSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD GREEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI HARRIS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DURLEY WINFREY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE DORRIS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN DENHAM
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES JACQUELYN ERMER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS TRAMMELL
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY DONALD
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LEE DISMUKE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN RAY BURKS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET KIDDER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA WINFREY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIAN KYLEPHYLLIS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARREN E. SMOKE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD LEE NELSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE T. NARAMORE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES EDWARD BROWN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES ROBERT DANIELS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE LANE WASHINGTON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA LAVONNE TUELL
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY JOHNSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY WASHINGTON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA JEAN DORRIS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE GOODNIGHT
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOSSIE GREEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SEDRIC NORWOOD
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEVORN COLEMAN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY GENTLE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARLINE PIGGEE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE A. WARE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS NORWOOD
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSSIE B. SMITH
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONA JOHNSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELBERT C. BROWN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDA FURRER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER LEE PATTERSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA COLLINS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY CHITWOOD
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HENRY CARPENTER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARENCE LEE ANDERSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS EUGENE BOURLAND
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEL DANIELS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORIS LORETTA GREEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLA MAE BUCK
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAYNES KEITH LAYROCK
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWAED RAY COOPER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA PILGREEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON BISBEE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN SIMPSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA BARKLEY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN JENNINGS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVEN TRAMMELL
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIC DANIELS, JR.
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH WHITMORE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE LEE CHRISTIAN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES GEORGE SNEED
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAZEL DISMUKE
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR ALAN FOGLER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENA MARIE COOPER
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY LAYROCK
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE BROWN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDNEY EVERETT PILGREEN
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY VAN JOHNSON
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA PLEASANT
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXINE COFFEY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAM HAMMOCK
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSIE MAE JENKINS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?