WOODS et al v. A.C. AND S., INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY) et al
Plaintiff: HAROLD WOODS and FRANCISE WOODS
Defendant: A.C. AND S., INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY), VIACOM INC., MORSE-DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC., DEERE & CO., A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., GASKET HOLDINGS, INC., FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION, DB RILEY, INC., UNION CARBIDE, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, CRANE CO., PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY, OAKFABCO, INC., PORTER HAYDEN COMPANY, AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER), TDY INDUSTRIES, INC., HARBISON WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY, MAREMOUNT CORP., QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER CORP., BMCE INC., PACCAR, INC., J.P. INDUSTRIES, INC., U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL), DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY, MCCORD CORPORATION, MACK TRUCKS, INC., CATERPILLAR, INC., WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY, GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC., DANA CORPORATION, WORTHINGTON CORPORATION, GOODYEAR CANADA, INC., RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION, LIPE-AUTOMATION CORP., FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC., DAIMLER CHRYSLER CORPORATION, NOSROC CORP., COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY, PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION, GOULD PUMPS, INC., GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION, H.B. FULLER COMPANY, SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS INC., BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION, DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC., WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY, INC., REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, BURNHAM CORPORATION, A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC., PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC., OKONITE COMPANY, INC., AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, PERKINS ENGINES, INC., KOHLER CO., FORD MOTOR COMPANY INC., CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC., PROKO INDUSTRIES INC., NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY (NARCO), KEELER-DORR-OLIVER BOILER COMPANY, GARLOCK, INC., KENTILE FLOORS, INC., PLIBRICO COMPANY, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP. and T&N, PLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv66414
Filed: July 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ENTITLED ACTION BE, AND THE SAME HEREBY IS DISCONTINUED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP. AND THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY CO-DEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. THIS STIPULATION SHALL HAVE THE SAME FORCE AND EFFECT AS AN ORDER OF THIS HONORABLE COURT AND SHALL BE FILED OF RECORD. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/2/12. 11/5/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, ONLY, IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY CO-DEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE ALSO DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/31/2012. 11/2/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmf, )
January 11, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN M. KASMIR on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY INC. (KASMIR, JUSTIN)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A) (2); THAT THE CASES WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY ONLY" DOCKET; AND THAT EACH OF THESE CASES SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/1/2010. 6/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CAPTIONED CASES ON 6/1/2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/2010. 5/5/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(SEE PAPER # 7201 IN 01-MD-875 FOR CASE LIST).(ah)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT CONSENT TO THE SUBSITUTION OF MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM, ESQ. OF SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLP, AS ATTORNEYS FOR THE DEFT. FOSTER WHELLER, LLC IN ALL MATTERS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED DOCKET SHEET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/23/10. 3/24/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(er, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION AND ORDER THAT RICHARD ADAM SENZER AS COUNSEL OF RECORD IS WITHDRAWN AS COUNSEL AND AMIEL GROSS IS SUBSTITUTED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION IN ALL CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A". SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/19/10. 1/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
September 2, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. MAIMONE on behalf of MACK TRUCKS, INC. (MAIMONE, THOMAS)
August 31, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD CEDRONE on behalf of FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION (CEDRONE, GERARD)
August 28, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution by DIANE MICHELE POMPEI on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.(er, )
July 27, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE by MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC. of Substitution of Attorney; Appearance of RUSSELL PEPE; Withdrawal of CLAUDE D. MONTGOMERY. (PEPE, RUSSELL) Modified on 7/29/2009 (md, ).
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (wrd,)
July 16, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (tjd)
July 16, 2007 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (tjd)
July 16, 2007 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 53 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (tjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODS et al v. A.C. AND S., INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. AND S., INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BRADLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORSE-DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEERE & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: ERICH GLEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GASKET HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION
Represented By: GERARD CEDRONE
Represented By: JOSEPH A. CHURGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB RILEY, INC.
Represented By: DONALD J. FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: RUSSELL A. PEPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Represented By: ERIC JOHN SAUTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER HAYDEN COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. MCCANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBISON WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMOUNT CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL ALAN TANENBAUM
Represented By: JUDITH ANN LOCKHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMCE INC.
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGOLEUM CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS A. RHATIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCORD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS J. MAIMONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORTHINGTON CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTT H. CASHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.
Represented By: PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB
Represented By: DIANE MICHELE POMPEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD ADAM SENZER
Represented By: AMIEL GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPE-AUTOMATION CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC.
Represented By: SUZANNE M. HALBARDIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLER CHRYSLER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOSROC CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB
Represented By: DIANE MICHELE POMPEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Represented By: VERONICA LAVALLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS INC.
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT H. CASHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: COLLEEN DONNA GALLIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY
Represented By: RAYMOND F. GEOFFREY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKONITE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERKINS ENGINES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER CO.
Represented By: MARC SCOTT GAFFREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY INC.
Represented By: JUSTIN M. KASMIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROKO INDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY (NARCO)
Represented By: JAMES D. BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER-DORR-OLIVER BOILER COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD P. MARIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENTILE FLOORS, INC.
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIBRICO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP.
Represented By: MATTHEW ROBERT STRAUS
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&N, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD WOODS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISE WOODS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?